This case was last updated from PACER on 07/12/2020 at 15:51:23 (UTC).

Albright v. American Greetings Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 07/19/2019 Albright filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against American Greetings Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Elaine E. Bucklo and Mary M. Rowland. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-04853

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Elaine E. Bucklo

Mary M. Rowland

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Laurie A Albright

Defendants

New Albertson's, Inc. d/b/a Jewel-Osco

Richard Carlson

American Greetings Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Jeffrey R. Kulwin

Attorney at Kulwin, Masciopinto & Kulwin, LLP

161 North Clark Street, Suite 2500

Chicago, IL 60601

Defendant Attorneys

Robert Steven Tengesdal

Attorney at Bollinger Connolly Krause LLC

500 West Madison Street, Suite 2430

Chicago, IL 60661

Anthony Michael Delongis

Attorney at Bollinger Connolly Krause, Llc

500 W. Madison Street, #2430

Chicago, IL 60661

Ryan Scott Burandt

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

111 East Wacker, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60601

Brianna Marie Skelly

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

111 East Wacker Dr., Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60601

John Michael Riccione

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

111 East Wacker Drive, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60601

Rachel L Schaller

Attorney at Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP

111 East Wacker Drive, Suite 2800

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Laurie A Albright. New Albertson's, Inc. d/b/a Jewel-Osco waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Kulwin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

#14

(#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Reassignment status hearing set for 9/26/19 at 10:30am in courtroom 1225. Parties are directed to review Judge Rowland's Standing Order on Cases Reassigned to Judge Mary M. Rowland, on the Court's website at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. On or before 9/19/19, counsel shall confer, prepare, and file a joint status report, not to exceed five pages. The report shall provide the information listed in the "Initial Status Report for Reassigned Case," a link to which is provided in the Standing Order on Cases Reassigned to Judge Mary M. Rowland. If a status report was previously ordered by the prior District Judge, parties may file the form of the status report previously ordered. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

#13

(#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: This case has been reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Therefore, in light of the reassignment, all pending dates before this court are stricken. Parties to take note of Judge Rowland's standing order posted on her page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

#12

(#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Richard Carlson. Richard Carlson waiver sent on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Delongis, Anthony) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#11

(#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Richard Carlson by Anthony Michael Delongis (Delongis, Anthony) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Richard Carlson by Robert Steven Tengesdal (Tengesdal, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Greetings Corporation by Ryan Scott Burandt (Burandt, Ryan) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Greetings Corporation by Brianna Marie Skelly (Skelly, Brianna) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Greetings Corporation by Rachel L Schaller (Schaller, Rachel) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#6

(#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Greetings Corporation by John Michael Riccione (Riccione, John) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

#5

(#5) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0024 Pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been randomly selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Mary M. Rowland's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order shall not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/22/2019.(rp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

#3

(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 11/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 11/4/2019. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

#2

(#2) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Laurie A Albright; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16049531. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kulwin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Laurie A Albright. New Albertson's, Inc. d/b/a Jewel-Osco waiver sent on 7/26/2019, answer due 9/24/2019. (Kulwin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 09/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Mary M. Rowland: Reassignment status hearing set for 9/26/19 at 10:30am in courtroom 1225. Parties are directed to review Judge Rowland's Standing Order on Cases Reassigned to Judge Mary M. Rowland, on the Court's website at https://www.ilnd.uscourts.gov/. On or before 9/19/19, counsel shall confer, prepare, and file a joint status report, not to exceed five pages. The report shall provide the information listed in the "Initial Status Report for Reassigned Case," a link to which is provided in the Standing Order on Cases Reassigned to Judge Mary M. Rowland. If a status report was previously ordered by the prior District Judge, parties may file the form of the status report previously ordered. Mailed notice. (dm, ) (Entered: 09/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: This case has been reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland. Therefore, in light of the reassignment, all pending dates before this court are stricken. Parties to take note of Judge Rowland's standing order posted on her page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice. (mgh, ) (Entered: 09/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Richard Carlson. Richard Carlson waiver sent on 7/23/2019, answer due 9/23/2019. (Delongis, Anthony) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Richard Carlson by Anthony Michael Delongis (Delongis, Anthony) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Richard Carlson by Robert Steven Tengesdal (Tengesdal, Robert) (Entered: 08/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Greetings Corporation by Ryan Scott Burandt (Burandt, Ryan) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Greetings Corporation by Brianna Marie Skelly (Skelly, Brianna) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Greetings Corporation by Rachel L Schaller (Schaller, Rachel) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant American Greetings Corporation by John Michael Riccione (Riccione, John) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: GENERAL ORDER 19-0024 Pursuant to the Executive Committee Order entered on August 9, 2019 the civil cases on the attached list have been randomly selected for reassignment to form the initial calendar of the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; therefore IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the attached list of 342 cases be reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all parties affected by this Order must review the Honorable Mary M. Rowland's webpage on the Court's website for the purpose of reviewing instructions regarding scheduling and case management procedures; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that any civil case that has been reassigned pursuant to this Order shall not be randomly reassigned to create the initial calendar of a new district judge for twelve months from the date of this Order; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's civil case assignment system during the next business day, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases; and IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to add the Honorable Mary M. Rowland to the Court's criminal case assignment system thirty days from the entry of this Order, so that she shall receive a full share of such cases. Case reassigned to the Honorable Mary M. Rowland for all further proceedings. Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 8/22/2019.(rp, ) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Laurie A Albright. American Greetings Corporation waiver sent on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Kulwin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo: Scheduling conference set for 11/7/2019 at 09:30 AM. Rule 26(f) planning report re MIDP due 11/4/2019. The report must comply with the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot program of the district court. The report form can be found on Judge Bucklo's page at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (reg) (Entered: 08/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (gcy, ) (Entered: 07/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Elaine E. Bucklo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. Case assignment: Random assignment. (td, ) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT filed by Laurie A Albright; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16049531. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kulwin, Jeffrey) (Entered: 07/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where American Greetings Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases where NEW ALBERTSON'S INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Brianna Marie Skelly

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robert Steven Tengesdal