This case was last updated from PACER on 04/16/2019 at 07:47:41 (UTC).

Albrecht et al v. Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 02/15/2019 Albrecht filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, South Dakota District. The Judge overseeing this case is Karen E. Schreier. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:19-CV-04032

  • Filing Date:

    02/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    South Dakota District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Karen E. Schreier

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alex Albrecht

Elizabeth Albrecht

Defendant

Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Molly K. Beck

Attorney at Fuller & Williamson, LLP

7521 S. Louise Ave.

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Eric T. Preheim

Attorney at Fuller & Williamson, LLP

7521 S. Louise Ave.

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Derek A. Nelsen

Attorney at Fuller & Williamson, LLP

7521 S. Louise Ave.

Sioux Falls, SD 57108

Defendant Attorneys

Tracye L. Sherrill

Attorney at Lynn, Jackson, Shultz & Lebrun, P.C.

110 N. Minnesota Ave., Ste. 400

Sioux Falls, SD 57104

Jeffery D. Collins

Attorney at Lynn, Jackson, Shultz & Lebrun, PC

909 Saint Joseph Street, Suite 800, 342-2592, Fax: 342-5185

Rapid City, SD 57701-3301

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Derek A. Nelsen on behalf of Alex Albrecht, Elizabeth Albrecht. (Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#10

(#10) Filed in error: CERTIFICATE of Clerk (SLW) Modified on 4/8/2019 (SLW). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#9

(#9) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 04/05/2019. (SAC) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint

8 #2

Exhibit 2 Plaintiffs Property Disclosure

8 #1

Exhibit 1 Plaintiffs Insurance Policy

8 #9

Exhibit 9 Defendants December 14, 2016 Letter

8 #10

Exhibit 10 Plaintiffs December 15, 2016 Letter

8 #7

Exhibit 7 Stephen Landons Letter of July 28, 2016

8 #8

Exhibit 8 Plaintiffs December 9, 2016 Letter

8 #5

Exhibit 5 -- Defendants December 7, 2017 Letter

8 #6

Exhibit 6 -- Defendants August 25, 2016 Letter

8 #3

Exhibit 3 Water Repair Estimate

8 #4

Exhibit 4 Plaintiffs Answer to Attorney Kings Complaint

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-2991238) filed by Elizabeth Albrecht, Alex Albrecht in shell case on 2/15/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint) (DJP) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

8 #11

Exhibit 11 Defendants December 16, 2016 Letter

#8

(#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Plaintiffs Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 Plaintiffs Property Disclosure, #3 Exhibit 3 Water Repair Estimate, #4 Exhibit 4 Plaintiffs Answer to Attorney Kings Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Defendants December 7, 2017 Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - Defendants August 25, 2016 Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 Stephen Landons Letter of July 28, 2016, #8 Exhibit 8 Plaintiffs December 9, 2016 Letter, #9 Exhibit 9 Defendants December 14, 2016 Letter, #10 Exhibit 10 Plaintiffs December 15, 2016 Letter, #11 Exhibit 11 Defendants December 16, 2016 Letter) (Sherrill, Tracye) Modified exhibit description on 4/8/2019 (SRA). (Entered: 04/05/2019)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery D. Collins on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Collins, Jeffery) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Derek A. Nelsen on behalf of Alex Albrecht, Elizabeth Albrecht. (Nelsen, Derek) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE of Filing Error: #10 Certificate of Clerk was filed in error and should be disregarded. (SLW) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) Filed in error: CERTIFICATE of Clerk (SLW) Modified on 4/8/2019 (SLW). (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) ORDER for Discovery Report and Scheduling Information. Signed by U.S. District Judge Karen E. Schreier on 04/05/2019. (SAC) (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Plaintiffs Insurance Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 Plaintiffs Property Disclosure, #3 Exhibit 3 Water Repair Estimate, #4 Exhibit 4 Plaintiffs Answer to Attorney Kings Complaint, #5 Exhibit 5 - Defendants December 7, 2017 Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - Defendants August 25, 2016 Letter, #7 Exhibit 7 Stephen Landons Letter of July 28, 2016, #8 Exhibit 8 Plaintiffs December 9, 2016 Letter, #9 Exhibit 9 Defendants December 14, 2016 Letter, #10 Exhibit 10 Plaintiffs December 15, 2016 Letter, #11 Exhibit 11 Defendants December 16, 2016 Letter) (Sherrill, Tracye) Modified exhibit description on 4/8/2019 (SRA). (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffery D. Collins on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Collins, Jeffery) (Entered: 04/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company Second. (Sherrill, Tracye) (Entered: 03/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company Unopposed. (Sherrill, Tracye) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Tracye L. Sherrill on behalf of Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Sherrill, Tracye) (Entered: 03/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed as to #1 Complaint, #2 Summons Issued Acknowledgement filed by Alex Albrecht, Elizabeth Albrecht. (Preheim, Eric) (Entered: 02/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Allstate Property and Casualty Insurance Company. Electronic Summons, AO85 form and and one Rule 73 memo delivered to plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 AO85)(DJP) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, ($400 fee paid, receipt# 0869-2991238) filed by Elizabeth Albrecht, Alex Albrecht in shell case on 2/15/19. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - State Court Complaint) (DJP) (Entered: 02/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.