This case was last updated from PACER on 11/08/2020 at 09:17:15 (UTC).

Alberto-Toledo v. Washington County et al

Case Summary

On 09/09/2020 Alberto-Toledo filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against Washington County. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Oregon District. The Judge overseeing this case is Mark D. Clarke. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-01557

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Oregon District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mark D. Clarke

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Uriel Alberto-Toledo

Hillsboro, OR 97123

Defendants

Caprice Massey

Pat Garrett

Karlyn Degman

Washington County

Andrew Pulver

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER TO AMEND: Within thirty days from the date of this Order, plaintiff must file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to do so will result in dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 11/2/2020 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/2/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#7

(#7) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IFP AND TO COLLECT FILING FEE: Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #1 is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that the Washington County Sheriff or his designee shall collect from plaintiff's prison trust account the $350.00 filing fee and shall forward payments to the Clerk of the Court. Signed on 11/2/2020 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed to Pro Se party and Washington County Sheriff on 11/2/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

(#5) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/9/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#4

(#4) Declaration of Uriel Alberto-Toledo. Filed by Uriel Alberto-Toledo. (Related document(s): Motion for Order to Show Cause, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #3 .) (dsg) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#3

(#3) Motion for Order to Show Cause and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Titled, "Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order." Filed by Uriel Alberto-Toledo. (dsg) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#2

(#2) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Uriel Alberto-Toledo against Karlyn Degman, Pat Garrett, Caprice Massey, Andrew Pulver, Washington County. (dsg) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

#1

(#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Uriel Alberto-Toledo. (dsg) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER TO AMEND: Within thirty days from the date of this Order, plaintiff must file an amended complaint curing the deficiencies. Plaintiff is advised that the failure to do so will result in dismissal of this proceeding. Signed on 11/2/2020 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 11/2/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED IFP AND TO COLLECT FILING FEE: Plaintiff's Application for Leave to Proceed IFP #1 is GRANTED. IT IS ORDERED that the Washington County Sheriff or his designee shall collect from plaintiff's prison trust account the $350.00 filing fee and shall forward payments to the Clerk of the Court. Signed on 11/2/2020 by Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed to Pro Se party and Washington County Sheriff on 11/2/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Individual Party Consent to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge. (dsg) (Entered: 09/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Magistrate Judge Mark D. Clarke. (Mailed to Pro Se party on 9/9/2020.) (dsg) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Declaration of Uriel Alberto-Toledo. Filed by Uriel Alberto-Toledo. (Related document(s): Motion for Order to Show Cause, Motion for Temporary Restraining Order #3 .) (dsg) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Motion for Order to Show Cause and Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. Titled, "Order to Show Cause and Temporary Restraining Order." Filed by Uriel Alberto-Toledo. (dsg) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. In forma pauperis pending. Filed by Uriel Alberto-Toledo against Karlyn Degman, Pat Garrett, Caprice Massey, Andrew Pulver, Washington County. (dsg) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Uriel Alberto-Toledo. (dsg) (Entered: 09/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less