This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/18/2023 at 17:39:03 (UTC).

Albert v. Whirlpool Corporation

Case Summary

On 01/17/2023 Albert filed a Property - Personal Property Product Liability lawsuit against Whirlpool Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Minnesota District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Donovan W. Frank and David T. Schultz. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:23-CV-00126

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Personal Property Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Donovan W. Frank

Referral Judge

David T. Schultz

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Amy Albert

Defendant

Whirlpool Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Benjamin C Sorenson

Attorney at Yost & Baill. LLP

220 South 6Th St., Suite 2050

Minneapolis, MN 55402

David J Yarosh

Attorney at Yost & Baill, LLP

220 S 6Th St Ste 2050

Mpls, MN 55402

Defendant Attorney

Autumn C Gear

Attorney at Barnes & Thornburg LLP

225 South Sixth Street, Suite 2800

Minneapolis, MN 55402-4662

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Exhibit(s) A - Albert 2022.12.21 Complaint

1 #2

Exhibit(s) B - State notice of removal

1 #3

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

#2

(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Whirlpool Corporation. (Gear, Autumn) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

#4

(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Gear, Autumn) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

#5

(#5) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/25/2023. (TJB) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

#6

(#6) PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP by Amy Albert. (Yarosh, David) Modified text on 2/2/2023 (CLK). (Entered: 02/01/2023)

#7

(#7) ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 3/7/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/7/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (TJB) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

7 #1

Consent Form

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • Docket(#8) (Text-Only) ORDER Cancelling Deadline & Hearing. Pretrial conference on 3/14/23 is cancelled. Ordered by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/22/2023. (TJB) Modified text on 2/23/2023 (TJB). (Entered: 02/22/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER/NOTICE FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Parties are directed to Meet and Confer by 3/7/2023. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 3/7/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 3/14/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 2/7/2023. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (TJB) (Entered: 02/07/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP by Amy Albert. (Yarosh, David) Modified text on 2/2/2023 (CLK). (Entered: 02/01/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER FOR PARTY TO FILE DOCUMENT/RESPOND TO COURT. Signed by Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz on 1/25/2023. (TJB) (Entered: 01/25/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint filed by Whirlpool Corporation. (Gear, Autumn) (Entered: 01/23/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • Docket(#3) (Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Donovan W. Frank per Civil (3rd/4th Master) list, referred to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Please use case number 23-cv-00126 DWF/DTS.Notice: All Nongovernmental Corporate Parties must file a #Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. (MTB) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Parent corporation, publicly held corporation owning 10 percent or more of its stock, or subsidiary reported for Whirlpool Corporation. (Gear, Autumn) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Isanti County District Court, case number Pending (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-10013768) filed by Whirlpool Corporation. No summons requested. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit(s) A - Albert 2022.12.21 Complaint, #2 Exhibit(s) B - State notice of removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Gear, Autumn) (Entered: 01/17/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less