This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/07/2022 at 01:06:39 (UTC).

Albert Nicholas Horvath v. Rivian Automotive, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On March 22, 2022, Albert Nicholas Horvath, individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), represented by Stephen Gerard Larson of Larson LLP, filed a class action lawsuit against Rivian Automotive, Inc., Robert J. Scaringe (“Scaringe”), Claire McDonough (“McDonough”), Jeffrey R. Baker (“Baker”), Jiten Behl and others (collectively, “Defendants”), seeking compensatory damages, costs of litigation, among other reliefs, for the Defendants’ alleged wrongful acts and omissions. This case was filed in the U.S. District Court in the Central District of California with Judges R. Gary Klausner and Charles F. Eick presiding. 

Plaintiffs bring this class action under Rule 23 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure.

In the complaint, the Plaintiffs alleged that “[t]his is a federal securities class action on behalf of a class (the ‘Class’) of all persons and entities who purchased Rivian common stock between November 10, 2021, and March 10, 2022, inclusive (the ‘Class Period’), and all persons and entities who purchased Rivian common stock pursuant and/or traceable to the Registration Statement (defined below) issued in connection with Rivian’s November 2021 initial public offering (the ‘IPO’).”

The Plaintiffs also alleged that “Rivian, a Delaware corporation with principal executive offices in Irvine, California, designs, develops, and manufactures electric vehicles (‘EVs’), including an electric SUV (the ‘R1S’) and an electric pickup truck (the ‘R1T’). On October 1, 2021, Rivian filed a registration statement for the IPO on Form S-1, which, after several amendments, was declared effective on November 9, 2021 (the ‘Registration Statement’). On November 9, 2021, Rivian issued the prospectus for the IPO on Form 424B4, which incorporated and formed part of the Registration Statement.”

The Plaintiffs further alleged that “[i]n connection with the IPO, Rivian offered and sold 175,950,000 shares of its common stock at a price to the public of $78.00 per share, which included the exercise in full by the IPO underwriters of their option to purchase an additional 22,950,000 shares of the Company’s common stock. The gross proceeds to the Company from the IPO were $13,724,100,000, before deducting underwriting discounts and commissions, and estimated offering expenses payable by the Company. As a result of Defendants’ wrongful acts and omissions, and the decline in the market value of the Company’s common stock when the truth was revealed, Plaintiff and other members of the Class have suffered significant damages.”

The Plaintiffs laid down four claims for relief. The first two claims deal with the alleged violation of Section 10(b), Section 20(a) of the Exchange Act, and SEC Rule 10b-5. The last two claims deal with the alleged violation of Section 11 and Section 15 of the Securities Act. 

In the prayer for relief, the Plaintiff requested the court for compensatory damages and equitable relief in favor of Plaintiff and other members of the Class against all Defendants, and such further relief as the court may deem just and proper.

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:22-CV-00444

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Finance - Security/Commodity/Exchange

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

R. Gary Klausner

Referral Judge

Charles F. Eick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Albert Nicholas Horvath

Defendants

Rivian Automotive, Inc.

Robert J. Scaringe

Claire McDonough

Jeffrey R. Baker

Jiten Behl

Karen Boone

Sanford Schwartz

Rose Marcario

Peter Krawiec

Jay Flatley

Pamela Thomas Graham

Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC

Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC

J.P. Morgan Securities LLC

Barclays Capital Inc.

Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.

Allen & Company LLC

BofA Securities, Inc.

Mizuho Securities USA LLC

16 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Stephen Gerard Larson

Attorney at Larson LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 4400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Darren J Check

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer and Check LLP

280 King Of Prussia Road

Radnor, PA 19087

Karissa J Sauder

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer and Check LLP

280 King Of Prussia Road

Randor, PA 19087

Naumon A. Amjed

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer and Check LLP

280 King Of Prussia Road

Radnor, PA 19087

Paul Anthony Rigali

Attorney at Larson LLP

555 South Flower Street Suite 4400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Ryan T. Degnan

Attorney at Kessler Topaz Meltzer and Check LLP

280 King Of Prussia Road

Radnor, PA 19087

Steven E Bledsoe

Attorney at Larson LLP

600 Anton Boulevard Suite 1270

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Defendant Attorneys

Boris Feldman

Attorney at Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

855 Main Street

Redwood City, CA 94063

Doru Gavril

Attorney at Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

855 Main Street

Redwood City, CA 94063

Elise Mercedes Lopez

Attorney at Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

855 Main Street

Redwood City, CA 94063

Jennifer Loeb

Attorney at Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer

2710 Sand Hill Road

Menlo Park, CA 94025

Olivia Rosen

Attorney at Freshfields Bruckhaus Deringer US LLP

855 Main Street

Redwood City, CA 94063

Darrell S. Cafasso

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

51 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Alexander K Talarides

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

The Orrick Building, 405 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

James N Kramer

Attorney at Orrick Herrington and Sutcliffe LLP

Orrick Building, 405 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105-2669

Other Attorneys

Benjamin Heikali

Attorney at Faruqi and Faruqi LLP

10866 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 1470

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Brett M Middleton

Attorney at Johnson Fistel LLP

501 West Broadway Suite 800

San Diego, CA 92101

 

Court Documents

#54

(#54) NOTICE of Change of address by Boris Feldman attorney for Defendants Jeffrey R. Baker, Jiten Behl, Karen Boone, Jay Flatley, Peter Krawiec, Rose Marcario, Claire McDonough, Rivian Automotive, Inc., Robert J. Scaringe, Sanford Schwartz, Pamela Thomas Graham. Changing attorneys address to 855 Main Street, Redwood City, CA 94063. Filed by Defendants Jeffrey R. Baker, Jiten Behl, Karen Boone, Jay Flatley, Peter Krawiec, Rose Marcario, Claire McDonough, Rivian Automotive, Inc., Robert J. Scaringe, Sanford Schwartz, Pamela Thomas Graham. (Feldman, Boris) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

#53

(#53) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner granting #50 Non-Resident Attorney Darrell S Cafasso APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants, designating Kevin M Askew as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

#52

(#52) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: denying #47 Non-Resident Attorney Darrell S Cafasso APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants. Pursuant to L.R. 83-2.1.3.4; Local Counsel does not maintain office in District. (jp) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

50 #1

[Proposed] Order

50 #50

Main Document

47 #3

New Jersey Certificate of Good Standing

47 #2

New York Certificate of Good Standing

47 #1

[Proposed] Order

47 #47

Main Document

7 #3

Pennsylvania Certificate of Good Standing

7 #7

Main Document

#6

(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul Anthony Rigali counsel for Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath. Adding Paul A. Rigali as counsel of record for Albert Nicholas Horvath for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath. (Attorney Paul Anthony Rigali added to party Albert Nicholas Horvath(pty:pla))(Rigali, Paul) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath. Related Case(s): 2:22-cv-01524 RGK(Ex) (Larson, Stephen) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#4

(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath, identifying Albert Nicholas Horvath, Rivian Automotive, Inc., Robert J. Scaringe, Claire McDonough, Jeffrey R. Baker, Jiten Behl, Karen Boone, Sanford Schwartz, Rose Marcario, Peter Krawiec, Jay Flatley, Pamela Thomas-Graham, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Allen & Company LLC, BofA Securities, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Sandler & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, Wedbush Securities Inc., Academy Securities, Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Siebert Williams Shank & Co., LLC, Tigress Financial Partners, LLC. (Larson, Stephen) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath. (Larson, Stephen) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath. (Larson, Stephen) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

1 #1

Plaintiff's Certification

1 #1

Main Document

81 More Documents Available
View All Documents

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) NOTICE of Change of address by Boris Feldman attorney for Defendants Jeffrey R. Baker, Jiten Behl, Karen Boone, Jay Flatley, Peter Krawiec, Rose Marcario, Claire McDonough, Rivian Automotive, Inc., Robert J. Scaringe, Sanford Schwartz, Pamela Thomas Graham. Changing attorneys address to 855 Main Street, Redwood City, CA 94063. Filed by Defendants Jeffrey R. Baker, Jiten Behl, Karen Boone, Jay Flatley, Peter Krawiec, Rose Marcario, Claire McDonough, Rivian Automotive, Inc., Robert J. Scaringe, Sanford Schwartz, Pamela Thomas Graham. (Feldman, Boris) (Entered: 06/02/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner granting #50 Non-Resident Attorney Darrell S Cafasso APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants, designating Kevin M Askew as local counsel. (jp) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner: denying #47 Non-Resident Attorney Darrell S Cafasso APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants. Pursuant to L.R. 83-2.1.3.4; Local Counsel does not maintain office in District. (jp) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ORDER by Judge R. Gary Klausner denying #45 Non-Resident Attorney Darrell S Cafasso APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants. Pursuant to L.R. 83-2.1.3.4; Local Counsel does not maintain office in District. (jp) (Entered: 05/31/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Darrell S. Cafasso to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Academy Securities, Inc., Allen and Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, BofA Securities, Inc., C.L. King and Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs and Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley and Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Sandler and Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Robert W. Baird and Co. Incorporated, Samuel A. Ramirez and Company, Inc., Siebert Williams Shank and Co., LLC, Tigress Financial Partners, LLC, Wedbush Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 5/20/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-33335788) filed by Underwriter Defendants Academy Securities, Inc., Allen and Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, BofA Securities, Inc., C.L. King and Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs and Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley and Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Sandler and Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Robert W. Baird and Co. Incorporated, Samuel A. Ramirez and Company, Inc., Siebert Williams Shank and Co., LLC, Tigress Financial Partners, LLC, Wedbush Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order) (Askew, Kevin) (Entered: 05/26/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin M Askew on behalf of Defendants Academy Securities, Inc., Allen and Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, BofA Securities, Inc., C.L. King and Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs and Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley and Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Sandler and Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Robert W. Baird and Co. Incorporated, Samuel A. Ramirez and Company, Inc., Siebert Williams Shank and Co., LLC, Tigress Financial Partners, LLC, Wedbush Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC (Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Academy Securities, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Allen and Company LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Barclays Capital Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Blaylock Van, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party BofA Securities, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party C.L. King and Associates, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Cabrera Capital Markets LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Deutsche Bank Securities Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Goldman Sachs and Co. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party J.P. Morgan Securities LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Loop Capital Markets LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Mizuho Securities USA LLC (pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Morgan Stanley and Co. LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Nomura Securities International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Piper Sandler and Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party RBC Capital Markets, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Robert W. Baird and Co. Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Samuel A. Ramirez and Company, Inc. (pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Siebert Williams Shank and Co., LLC (pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Tigress Financial Partners, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Wedbush Securities Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin M Askew added to party Wells Fargo Securities, LLC(pty:dft))(Askew, Kevin) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Darrell S. Cafasso to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Academy Securities, Inc., Allen and Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, BofA Securities, Inc., C.L. King and Associates, Inc., Ca #47 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. The language Underwriter Defendants is the only party listed on proposed order. (lt) (Entered: 05/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Darrell S. Cafasso to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Academy Securities, Inc., Allen and Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, BofA Securities, Inc., C.L. King and Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs and Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley and Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Sandler and Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Robert W. Baird and Co. Incorporated, Samuel A. Ramirez and Company, Inc., Siebert Williams Shank and Co., LLC, Tigress Financial Partners, LLC, Wedbush Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Previously Paid on 5/20/2022, Receipt No. ACACDC-33335788) filed by Underwriter Defendants Academy Securities, Inc., Allen and Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, BofA Securities, Inc., C.L. King and Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs and Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley and Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Sandler and Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Robert W. Baird and Co. Incorporated, Samuel A. Ramirez and Company, Inc., Siebert Williams Shank and Co., LLC, Tigress Financial Partners, LLC, Wedbush Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 [Proposed] Order, #2 New York Certificate of Good Standing, #3 New Jersey Certificate of Good Standing) (Kramer, James) (Entered: 05/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Darrell S. Cafasso to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Academy Securities, Inc., Allen and Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., C.L. King and Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Marke #45 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 5-4.3.4 Application not hand-signed. Local Rule 83-2.1.3.4 Local counsel does not maintain an office within the District. Proposed order should have list of represented parties attached. Other error(s) with document(s): Please note that electronic, image or stamp signatures are not allowed for either applicant or local counsel. See Instructions for Applicants (1). (lt) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Darrell S. Cafasso to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Academy Securities, Inc., Allen and Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., C.L. King and Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs and Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley and Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Sandler and Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Robert W. Baird and Co. Incorporated, Samuel A. Ramirez and Company, Inc., Siebert Williams Shank and Co., LLC, Tigress Financial Partners, LLC, Wedbush Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-33335788) filed by Underwriter Defendants Academy Securities, Inc., Allen and Company LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., BofA Securities, Inc., C.L. King and Associates, Inc., Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Goldman Sachs and Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Loop Capital Markets LLC, Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Morgan Stanley and Co. LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Sandler and Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Robert W. Baird and Co. Incorporated, Samuel A. Ramirez and Company, Inc., Siebert Williams Shank and Co., LLC, Tigress Financial Partners, LLC, Wedbush Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Securities, LLC. (Attachments: #1 New York Certificate of Good Standing, #2 New Jersey Certificate of Good Standiing, #3 [Proposed] Order) (Kramer, James) (Entered: 05/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
34 More Docket Entries
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 3/23/2022, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 13] NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap) Modified on 3/23/2022 (ghap). (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ghap) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ryan T. Degnan to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32994053) filed by Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath. (Attachments: #1 New Jersey Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Pennsylvania Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Proposed Order) (Rigali, Paul) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Naumon A. Amjed to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $500 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-32993957) filed by Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath. (Attachments: #1 Delaware Certificate of Good Standing, #2 New York Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Pennsylvania Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order) (Rigali, Paul) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Paul Anthony Rigali counsel for Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath. Adding Paul A. Rigali as counsel of record for Albert Nicholas Horvath for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath. (Attorney Paul Anthony Rigali added to party Albert Nicholas Horvath(pty:pla))(Rigali, Paul) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath. Related Case(s): 2:22-cv-01524 RGK(Ex) (Larson, Stephen) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath, identifying Albert Nicholas Horvath, Rivian Automotive, Inc., Robert J. Scaringe, Claire McDonough, Jeffrey R. Baker, Jiten Behl, Karen Boone, Sanford Schwartz, Rose Marcario, Peter Krawiec, Jay Flatley, Pamela Thomas-Graham, Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, Goldman Sachs & Co. LLC, J.P. Morgan Securities LLC, Barclays Capital Inc., Deutsche Bank Securities Inc., Allen & Company LLC, BofA Securities, Inc., Mizuho Securities USA LLC, Wells Fargo Securities, LLC, Nomura Securities International, Inc., Piper Sandler & Co., RBC Capital Markets, LLC, Robert W. Baird & Co. Incorporated, Wedbush Securities Inc., Academy Securities, Inc., Blaylock Van, LLC, Cabrera Capital Markets LLC, C.L. King & Associates, Inc., Loop Capital Markets LLC, Samuel A. Ramirez & Company, Inc., Siebert Williams Shank & Co., LLC, Tigress Financial Partners, LLC. (Larson, Stephen) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath. (Larson, Stephen) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath. (Larson, Stephen) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-32991918 - Fee: $402, filed by Plaintiff Albert Nicholas Horvath. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiff's Certification) (Attorney Stephen Gerard Larson added to party Albert Nicholas Horvath(pty:pla))(Larson, Stephen) (Entered: 03/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Mizuho Securities USA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where RIVIAN AUTOMOTIVE, LLC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Allen Law Corp is a litigant

Latest cases where BofA Securities, Inc. is a litigant