This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 11/26/2021 at 09:45:56 (UTC).

Albert et al v. Nurture Inc.

Case Summary

On September 27, 2021, Meagan Albert, Angela Arrowsmith, Elizabeth Austin, Alyssa Megan Barb, Courtney Barron, and others (collectively, “Plaintiffs”), individually and on behalf of others similarly situated, represented by Ian Wise Sloss of Silver Golub & Teitell LLP, filed a class action lawsuit against Nurture, Inc. (“Defendant”), seeking declaratory reliefs and damages among other reliefs for the alleged negligence of the Defendant in manufacturing baby products. This case was filed in the United States District Court in the Southern District of New York.

 

In the complaint, the Plaintiffs alleged that, “On February 4, 2021, the Subcommittee on Economic and Consumer Policy Committee on Oversight and Reform of the U.S. House of Representatives released a staff report which detailed an investigation that revealed that Defendant’s baby foods were contaminated with significant levels of toxic heavy metals, including arsenic, lead, cadmium, and mercury” and “Despite knowingly manufacturing and selling baby foods that contain toxic heavy metals, Defendant did not disclose these facts to consumers through any of its branding, advertising, or labeling.”

 

The Plaintiffs further alleged that, “Defendant did not disclose the presence of toxic heavy metals in its baby foods with the intent that Plaintiffs and Class members would purchase its baby foods as they knew the presence of toxic heavy metals was material to purchasers of baby foods, including Plaintiffs and Class members, and that Plaintiffs and Class members would not purchase its baby foods if they knew that Defendant knowingly sold baby foods containing toxic heavy metals.”

 

The Plaintiffs also alleged that, “Instead, as a result of Defendant’s misrepresentation, Plaintiffs and Class members suffered monetary losses in that (1) the actual value of the merchandise they received was less than the value of the merchandise as represented denying them of the benefit of their bargain; and (2) Plaintiffs and Class members paid more than the fair market value of the merchandise they received causing them out-of-pocket damages.”

 

There are sixty-one claims for relief laid down by the Plaintiffs on behalf of the Plaintiffs and the Nationwide Class. The first claim is for the alleged breach of implied warranty of merchantability. The second claim is for the alleged violation of Magnuson-Moss Warranty Act. The third claim is for the alleged breach of express warranty. The fourth and fifth claims are for alleged violations of Alabama Deceptive Trade Practices Act. In the same manner, the other claims are for alleged violations of the trade practices and consumer protection act of Alaska, Arizona, Arkansas, California, Colorado, Connecticut, Delaware, District of Columbia, Florida, Georgia, Hawaii, Idaho, Illinois, Indiana, Iowa, Kansas, Kentucky, Louisiana, Maine, Maryland, Massachusetts, Michigan, Minnesota, Mississippi, Missouri, Montana, Nebraska, Nevada, New Hampshire, New Jersey, New Mexico, New York, North Carolina, North Dakota, Ohio, Oklahoma, Oregon, Pennsylvania, Rhode Island, South Carolina, South Dakota, Tennessee, Texas, Utah, Vermont, Virginia, Washington, West Virginia, Wisconsin, and Wyoming where the Plaintiffs and the class resided.

 

In its prayer for relief, the Plaintiffs requested the Court to certify this action as a class action lawsuit, and designate the Plaintiffs as the Class representatives. Further, the Plaintiffs requested the Court for a judgement in favour of the Plaintiffs and the Class, and an award of damages, reasonable attorneys' fees, costs, and any other relief the Court deems just.

 

This case summary may not reflect the current position of the parties to this litigation or the status of this case. Sign up to view the latest case updates and court documents.



Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-08030

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Mary Kay Vyskocil

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEAGAN ALBERT

ANGELA ARROWSMITH

ELIZABETH AUSTIN

ALYSSA MEGAN BARB

COURTNEY BARRON

ASHLEY BAXTER

BRITTANY BENNETT

CRYSTAL BRINIG

AUGUSTINA BRIONES

CAMARIE BROOMFIELD

ANA BUTKUS

MAYELIN CARRANZA

SAMANTHA CLARK

MELANIE COLE

KIMBERLY CONWAY

MICHELLE CORBETT

ANGELA COX

BRANDY DAVIS

KALEY DEFORD

CHELZY DESVIGNE

55 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Steven Lawrence Bloch

Attorney at Silver Golub & Teitell LLP

184 Atlantic Street

Stamford, CT 06901

Ian Wise Sloss

Attorney at Silver Golub & Teitell LLP

184 Atlantic Street

Stamford, CT 06901

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

#12

(#15) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (73 in 1:21-cv-01217-MKV) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Melissa S. Weiner and Michael Reese as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Melissa Emert, Annick M. Persinger, Jason P. Sultzer, Charles E. Schaffer, and Rachel Soffin as Interim Executive Committee members. . Document filed by Jessica Strobel. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01217-MKV et al..(Reese, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

#13

(#13) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sloss, Ian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

#14

(#14) ORDER: This action was referred to me as related to In re Nurture Baby Food Litigation, No. 21- cv-1217-MKV. Pursuant to the Order of Consolidation entered in that case [ECF No. 47], any actions assigned to me asserting consumer-protection type claims against Nurture, Inc. that arise from the same factual allegations as the consolidated actionsthat Nurtures baby food products are and were tainted with toxic heavy metalsshall be consolidated for all purposes with the consolidated actions. The Complaint in this action asserts only consumer-protection type cases against Nurture based on the same factual allegations as the consolidated actions. [See generally ECF No. 1.] Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action shall be consolidated with In re Nurture Baby Food Litigation, No. 21-cv-1217-MKV. The deadlines set forth in the Order of Consolidation govern. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 10/20/2021) (tg) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: (73 in 1:21-cv-01217-MKV) MOTION to Appoint Counsel Melissa S. Weiner and Michael Reese as Interim Co-Lead Counsel and Melissa Emert, Annick M. Persinger, Jason P. Sultzer, Charles E. Schaffer, and Rachel Soffin as Interim Executive Committee members. . Document filed by Jessica Strobel. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:21-cv-01217-MKV et al..(Reese, Michael) (Entered: 10/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER: This action was referred to me as related to In re Nurture Baby Food Litigation, No. 21- cv-1217-MKV. Pursuant to the Order of Consolidation entered in that case [ECF No. 47], any actions assigned to me asserting consumer-protection type claims against Nurture, Inc. that arise from the same factual allegations as the consolidated actionsthat Nurtures baby food products are and were tainted with toxic heavy metalsshall be consolidated for all purposes with the consolidated actions. The Complaint in this action asserts only consumer-protection type cases against Nurture based on the same factual allegations as the consolidated actions. [See generally ECF No. 1.] Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this action shall be consolidated with In re Nurture Baby Food Litigation, No. 21-cv-1217-MKV. The deadlines set forth in the Order of Consolidation govern. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil on 10/20/2021) (tg) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketCONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:21-cv-01217-MKV.. (tg) (Entered: 10/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sloss, Ian) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #12 Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (aea) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Mary Kay Vyskocil. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketCASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:21-cv-01217-MKV. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#12) PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Meagan Albert, Angela Arrowsmith, Elizabeth Austin, Alyssa Megan Barb, Courtney Barron, Ashley Baxter, Brittany Bennett, Crystal Brinig, Augustina Briones, Camarie Broomfield, Ana Butkus, Mayelin Carranza, Samantha Clark, Melanie Cole, Kimberly Conway, Michelle Corbett, Angela Cox, Brandy Davis, Kaley Deford, Chelzy Desvigne, Brittany Distaso, Alana Doyeto, Sudipta Dutta, Samantha Edwards, Ayame Tatiana Galassini, Marcela Garcia, Kelsey Glennon, Christina Gordon, Austin Gundersen, Shannon Herrington, Amanda Hill, Lillian Hinkle, Amanda Hobbs-Rogers, Yuhwa Jang, Rebecca Keeton, Sara Kilburn, Sarah Knaapen, Karleen Kozaczka, April Lockhart, Andrew Lohse, Lori Ann Louis, Samantha Lui, Ashley Martinez, Elizabeth McDowell, Lori-Ann McKenzie-Henry, Janice Taina Mercado Guadalupe, Lyrik Merlin, Loukevia Moore, Andrea Mozo, Leah Ostapchenko, Corinthea Pangelinan, Mia Pelletier, Ashley Pierce, Janinne Price, Debbie Reed, Kassandra Romero, Maggie Rouse, Bridget Salopek, Lea Santos, Amanda Schram, Porsche Stokes, Rachel Stratton, Ashley Swenningson, Margo Tezeno, Shiloh Thomas, Casey Tisdale, Rachael Treetop, Sonja Renee Twiggs, Brittany Wallace, Natalie Williams, Amber Wright, Retrena Younge, Charisse Zapata, Christen Zulli. Related Document Number: #8 ..(Bloch, Steven) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#11) DECLARATION of Aaron Zigler in Support re: #8 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Silver Golub & Teitell LLP and Zigler Law Group as Interim Co-Lead Counsel.. Document filed by Meagan Albert, Angela Arrowsmith, Elizabeth Austin, Alyssa Megan Barb, Courtney Barron, Ashley Baxter, Brittany Bennett, Crystal Brinig, Augustina Briones, Camarie Broomfield, Ana Butkus, Mayelin Carranza, Samantha Clark, Melanie Cole, Kimberly Conway, Michelle Corbett, Angela Cox, Brandy Davis, Kaley Deford, Chelzy Desvigne, Brittany Distaso, Alana Doyeto, Sudipta Dutta, Samantha Edwards, Ayame Tatiana Galassini, Marcela Garcia, Kelsey Glennon, Christina Gordon, Austin Gundersen, Shannon Herrington, Amanda Hill, Lillian Hinkle, Amanda Hobbs-Rogers, Yuhwa Jang, Rebecca Keeton, Sara Kilburn, Sarah Knaapen, Karleen Kozaczka, April Lockhart, Andrew Lohse, Lori Ann Louis, Samantha Lui, Ashley Martinez, Elizabeth McDowell, Lori-Ann McKenzie-Henry, Janice Taina Mercado Guadalupe, Lyrik Merlin, Loukevia Moore, Andrea Mozo, Leah Ostapchenko, Corinthea Pangelinan, Mia Pelletier, Ashley Pierce, Janinne Price, Debbie Reed, Kassandra Romero, Maggie Rouse, Bridget Salopek, Lea Santos, Amanda Schram, Porsche Stokes, Rachel Stratton, Ashley Swenningson, Margo Tezeno, Shiloh Thomas, Casey Tisdale, Rachael Treetop, Sonja Renee Twiggs, Brittany Wallace, Natalie Williams, Amber Wright, Retrena Younge, Charisse Zapata, Christen Zulli..(Bloch, Steven) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (jgo) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketCASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(jgo) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Ian Wise Sloss. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: all of the Plaintiffs. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (jgo) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Ian Wise Sloss. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Citizenship Defendant code 1 (Citizen of This State); County code Westchester; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 4 (Incorporated/Principal Place of Business-This State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Ian Wise Sloss to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the incorrect Courthouse Assignment code was selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NURTURE, INC., re: #1 Complaint,,,,,. Document filed by MEAGAN ALBERT, ANGELA ARROWSMITH, ELIZABETH AUSTIN, ALYSSA MEGAN BARB, COURTNEY BARRON, ASHLEY BAXTER, BRITTANY BENNETT, CRYSTAL BRINIG, AUGUSTINA BRIONES, CAMARIE BROOMFIELD, ANA BUTKUS, MAYELIN CARRANZA, SAMANTHA CLARK, MELANIE COLE, KIMBERLY CONWAY, MICHELLE CORBETT, ANGELA COX, BRANDY DAVIS, KALEY DEFORD, CHELZY DESVIGNE, BRITTANY DISTASO, ALANA DOYETO, SUDIPTA DUTTA, SAMANTHA EDWARDS, AYAME TATIANA GALASSINI, MARCELA GARCIA, KELSEY GLENNON, CHRISTINA GORDON, AUSTIN GUNDERSEN, SHANNON HERRINGTON, AMANDA HILL, LILLIAN HINKLE, AMANDA HOBBS-ROGERS, YUHWA JANG, REBECCA KEETON, SARA KILBURN, SARAH KNAAPEN, KARLEEN KOZACZKA, APRIL LOCKHART, ANDREW LOHSE, LORI ANN LOUIS, SAMANTHA LUI, ASHLEY MARTINEZ, ELIZABETH MCDOWELL, LORI-ANN MCKENZIE-HENRY, JANICE TAINA MERCADO GUADALUPE, LYRIK MERLIN, LOUKEVIA MOORE, ANDREA MOZO, LEAH OSTAPCHENKO, CORINTHEA PANGELINAN, MIA PELLETIER, ASHLEY PIERCE, JANINNE PRICE, DEBBIE REED, KASSANDRA ROMERO, MAGGIE ROUSE, BRIDGET SALOPEK, LEA SANTOS, AMANDA SCHRAM, PORSCHE STOKES, RACHEL STRATTON, ASHLEY SWENNINGSON, MARGO TEZENO, SHILOH THOMAS, CASEY TISDALE, RACHAEL TREETOP, SONJA RENEE TWIGGS, BRITTANY WALLACE, NATALIE WILLIAMS, AMBER WRIGHT, RETRENA YOUNGE, CHARISSE ZAPATA, CHRISTEN ZULLI..(Sloss, Ian) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#4) STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 21-cv-01217. Document filed by MEAGAN ALBERT, ANGELA ARROWSMITH, ELIZABETH AUSTIN, ALYSSA MEGAN BARB, COURTNEY BARRON, ASHLEY BAXTER, BRITTANY BENNETT, CRYSTAL BRINIG, AUGUSTINA BRIONES, CAMARIE BROOMFIELD, ANA BUTKUS, MAYELIN CARRANZA, SAMANTHA CLARK, MELANIE COLE, KIMBERLY CONWAY, MICHELLE CORBETT, ANGELA COX, BRANDY DAVIS, KALEY DEFORD, CHELZY DESVIGNE, BRITTANY DISTASO, ALANA DOYETO, SUDIPTA DUTTA, SAMANTHA EDWARDS, AYAME TATIANA GALASSINI, MARCELA GARCIA, KELSEY GLENNON, CHRISTINA GORDON, AUSTIN GUNDERSEN, SHANNON HERRINGTON, AMANDA HILL, LILLIAN HINKLE, AMANDA HOBBS-ROGERS, YUHWA JANG, REBECCA KEETON, SARA KILBURN, SARAH KNAAPEN, KARLEEN KOZACZKA, APRIL LOCKHART, ANDREW LOHSE, LORI ANN LOUIS, SAMANTHA LUI, ASHLEY MARTINEZ, ELIZABETH MCDOWELL, LORI-ANN MCKENZIE-HENRY, JANICE TAINA MERCADO GUADALUPE, LYRIK MERLIN, LOUKEVIA MOORE, ANDREA MOZO, LEAH OSTAPCHENKO, CORINTHEA PANGELINAN, MIA PELLETIER, ASHLEY PIERCE, JANINNE PRICE, DEBBIE REED, KASSANDRA ROMERO, MAGGIE ROUSE, BRIDGET SALOPEK, LEA SANTOS, AMANDA SCHRAM, PORSCHE STOKES, RACHEL STRATTON, ASHLEY SWENNINGSON, MARGO TEZENO, SHILOH THOMAS, CASEY TISDALE, RACHAEL TREETOP, SONJA RENEE TWIGGS, BRITTANY WALLACE, NATALIE WILLIAMS, AMBER WRIGHT, RETRENA YOUNGE, CHARISSE ZAPATA, CHRISTEN ZULLI..(Sloss, Ian) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • Docket(#3) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sloss, Ian) Modified on 9/28/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sloss, Ian) Modified on 9/28/2021 (jgo). (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Nurture Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25117225)Document filed by LILLIAN HINKLE, SHANNON HERRINGTON, RACHEL STRATTON, CHELZY DESVIGNE, NATALIE WILLIAMS, ASHLEY BAXTER, AYAME TATIANA GALASSINI, ANGELA COX, AMBER WRIGHT, KIMBERLY CONWAY, ASHLEY MARTINEZ, JANINNE PRICE, CHARISSE ZAPATA, MARCELA GARCIA, KASSANDRA ROMERO, AMANDA SCHRAM, KALEY DEFORD, AUGUSTINA BRIONES, AMANDA HILL, YUHWA JANG, CAMARIE BROOMFIELD, LYRIK MERLIN, MARGO TEZENO, CHRISTINA GORDON, ANDREA MOZO, KARLEEN KOZACZKA, ASHLEY SWENNINGSON, MAGGIE ROUSE, ANDREW LOHSE, ANA BUTKUS, MELANIE COLE, CORINTHEA PANGELINAN, LEA SANTOS, DEBBIE REED, RETRENA YOUNGE, SHILOH THOMAS, ELIZABETH MCDOWELL, BRANDY DAVIS, PORSCHE STOKES, ASHLEY PIERCE, CASEY TISDALE, BRITTANY WALLACE, RACHAEL TREETOP, MEAGAN ALBERT, MICHELLE CORBETT, AUSTIN GUNDERSEN, SAMANTHA EDWARDS, KELSEY GLENNON, CHRISTEN ZULLI, APRIL LOCKHART, SAMANTHA CLARK, SONJA RENEE TWIGGS, BRIDGET SALOPEK, LOUKEVIA MOORE, SUDIPTA DUTTA, MIA PELLETIER, BRITTANY DISTASO, LORI ANN LOUIS, LORI-ANN MCKENZIE-HENRY, ALANA DOYETO, MAYELIN CARRANZA, COURTNEY BARRON, ANGELA ARROWSMITH, REBECCA KEETON, CRYSTAL BRINIG, LEAH OSTAPCHENKO, JANICE TAINA MERCADO GUADALUPE, BRITTANY BENNETT, SARAH KNAAPEN, ELIZABETH AUSTIN, AMANDA HOBBS-ROGERS, SARA KILBURN, SAMANTHA LUI, ALYSSA MEGAN BARB..(Sloss, Ian) (Entered: 09/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ian Wise Sloss

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Steven Bloch