This case was last updated from PACER on 07/29/2021 at 19:47:02 (UTC).

Percy et al v. S & E Azrlliant P C et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Percy filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against E Azrlliant P C. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas G. Garaufis and Roanne L. Mann. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02313

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G. Garaufis

Referral Judge

Roanne L. Mann

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives

Defendants

S & E Azrlliant P C

Stealth Contracting Inc

Soil Mechanics Drilling Corp

Schulte Roth And Zabel Llp

Safecon Builders Corp.

Torre Lentz Gamell Gary

Selectric Electrical Contractors

Tomco Mechanical

Tri Borough Scaffolding-Hstng

South Queens Dialysis Ctr

Schlesinger Gannon & Lazetera

Skyline Engineering, LLC

Tan Architect, P.C.

The Dulanski Group

Spring O'brien & Co

Suite LLC

South Bronx Health Ctr

Staten Island University Hospital

Sloss Eckhouse Law

955 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James M. Kernan

Attorney at Kernan Professional Group, LLP

26 Broadway, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Other Attorneys

Eugene Alexander Gormakh

Attorney at Law Offices Of Michael S. Ross

60 East 42Nd Street, Forty-Seventh Floor, New York, Ste Forty-Seventh Floor

New York, NY 10165

Michael S. Ross

One Grand Central Place, 60 East 42Nd Street, 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10165

 

Court Documents

#46

(#46) MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the reasons stated below, each of the Removed Actions is REMANDED to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County and each of the Federal Actions is DISMISSED with prejudice. Requests made by counsel in the Removed Actions for attorneys fees and costs are GRANTED. Attorney James M. Kernan, counsel for the Class Representatives, is ORDERED to show cause within two weeks of the date of this Order, in writing, as to why he should not be referred to the Disciplinary Committee for this District in connection with his conduct in these lawsuits. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/27/2021. (Certified copy of Order mailed to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County, County Clerk, 200 Elizabeth St #4, Utica, NY 13501, Docket No. EFCA 2020-1276) (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

#51

(#51) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #46 Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Terminate Motions,,, by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYEDC-14600554. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#50

(#50) DECLARATION re #46 Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Terminate Motions,,, by James M. Kernan (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#47

(#47) CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the removed actions are remanded to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County; the federal actions are dismissed with prejudice; requests for attorneys' fees and costs by the Defendants in the removed actions are granted, and Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Brenna B. Mahoney, Chief Deputy Clerk on May 28, 2021. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

43 #4

#2 Attachment to Memorandum-Schedule of Actions

43 #2

Memorandum

#36

No Description Available

#32

No Description Available

#31

No Description Available

#26

No Description Available

#21

No Description Available

#15

No Description Available

#14

No Description Available

#12

No Description Available

#11

No Description Available

#9

No Description Available

#6

(#6) Sandhu Contracting Inc, Sandow, Sands Atlantic Beach, Sands Point Ctr For Health-Rhb, Sandspoint Capital Advisors LLC, Sanford Heisler Sharp Llp, Sanitary District No. 2, Sankel Skurman & Mccartin Llp., Sanocki Newman & Turret, Sans Consulting Services, Inc., Sans Souci Rehab & Nursing Ctr, Santiago Betes & Son Inc., Sapphire Center For Nurse-Rhb, Sapphire, Sarabeth's, Sarah Neuman Ctr, Saratoga Family Inn-Hms, Sarkissian Mason, Satin Fine Foods, Inc, Satnaam International Construction Corp., Sato Construction Co.Inc., Satori Consulting, Savant Consulting Group Inc, Savills Studley, Inc., Savin Engineers and Savoy Brass Mfg added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#2

(#2) S & J Sheet Metal Supply Inc, S & L Aerospace Metals LLC, S & P Construction Management Inc, S 9 Architecture & Engrng Pc, S B Technology, S D Warren Co, S Difazio Industries Inc, S Donadic Woodworking Inc, S Hellman Co, S I Engineering Pc, S I Mental Health Soc Inc, S J Electric Inc, S K P Intl Inc, S M Tam Architect PLLC and S Nassau Community Hospital added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #51 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Jones, Vasean) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #46 Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Terminate Motions,,, by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYEDC-14600554. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) DECLARATION re #46 Memorandum & Opinion,,,, Terminate Motions,,, by James M. Kernan (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Alexander Gormakh on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Gormakh, Eugene) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Ross on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Ross, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the removed actions are remanded to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County; the federal actions are dismissed with prejudice; requests for attorneys' fees and costs by the Defendants in the removed actions are granted, and Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Brenna B. Mahoney, Chief Deputy Clerk on May 28, 2021. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) MEMORANDUM & ORDER, For the reasons stated below, each of the Removed Actions is REMANDED to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County and each of the Federal Actions is DISMISSED with prejudice. Requests made by counsel in the Removed Actions for attorneys fees and costs are GRANTED. Attorney James M. Kernan, counsel for the Class Representatives, is ORDERED to show cause within two weeks of the date of this Order, in writing, as to why he should not be referred to the Disciplinary Committee for this District in connection with his conduct in these lawsuits. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 5/27/2021. (Certified copy of Order mailed to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County, County Clerk, 200 Elizabeth St #4, Utica, NY 13501, Docket No. EFCA 2020-1276) (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 05/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) Proposed Summons. by Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives (Kernan, James) (Entered: 05/14/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • DocketORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis for all further proceedings. Judge William F. Kuntz, II no longer assigned to case Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Ordered by Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie on 5/12/2021. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Savvy Renovation, Sawhorse Inc, Sb Consulting, Sb New York Inc., Sblm Architects, Scalamandre Construction/Oliveira (Jv), Scaran Development Corp, Scaran, Scarola Malone & Zubatov Lip, Schaefer Machine Co Inc, Schaffer Schonholz & Drossman, Schaller & Weber Inc., Schiavetti Corgan Di Edwards, Schildwachter Oil, Schindler Cohen & Hochman, Schindler Elevator Corporation, Schlam Stone & Dolan, Schlesinger Gannon & Lazetera, Schlesinger Gannon, Schmelkin Associates, Schnader Harrison Segal And Lewis Llp, Schneider Buchel Llp, Schneider Schecter-Yoss Cpas and Schoeman Updike Kaufman-Gerber added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Sandhu Contracting Inc, Sandow, Sands Atlantic Beach, Sands Point Ctr For Health-Rhb, Sandspoint Capital Advisors LLC, Sanford Heisler Sharp Llp, Sanitary District No. 2, Sankel Skurman & Mccartin Llp., Sanocki Newman & Turret, Sans Consulting Services, Inc., Sans Souci Rehab & Nursing Ctr, Santiago Betes & Son Inc., Sapphire Center For Nurse-Rhb, Sapphire, Sarabeth's, Sarah Neuman Ctr, Saratoga Family Inn-Hms, Sarkissian Mason, Satin Fine Foods, Inc, Satnaam International Construction Corp., Sato Construction Co.Inc., Satori Consulting, Savant Consulting Group Inc, Savills Studley, Inc., Savin Engineers and Savoy Brass Mfg added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Saint Josephs Medical Center, Saint Mary's University Of Minnesota, Sajiun Electric, Inc., Saks Fifth Avenue LLC, Sa-Lakeland LLC, Salamon Engineering Group, Salem Hills, Salenger & Sack Kimmel Bavaro, Saleselement, Salesian Missions, Salisbury & Ryan Llp, Salon Marrow Dyckman Newman, Sam Schwartz Engineering Dpc, Samanna La, Samaritan Daytop Village, Samaritans 24 Hour Suicide, Samco Electric Corporation, Samuel A. Ramirez And Company, Inc., Samuel Field Ym & Ywha Inc., Samuel French Inc, Samuel-Bertha Schulman Rehab, Sanb Management, Sanctuary For Families Inc, Sandata Holdings, Inc., Sandeep Singh Dba J & N Cons. and Sanders Firm added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Sabina Contracting, Sacco & Fillas Llp, Sachs Insights Inc, Sacks & Sacks, Sadis & Goldberg Llp., Sadsa, Safe Con Builders, Safe Horizon Inc., Safeco Cons., Safecon Builders Corp., Safecon Inc., Safety Environmental Co., Safety Marking, Inc, Safety Works Inc., Safeway Fire And Protection Co., Safra, Sage Realty Corporation, Sage Services Advocacy, Sage Systems Inc., Sageview Consulting, Sai Ji Plumbing, Sai Ram Petroleum Inc, Saicon Consultants Inc, Saint Dominic's Home and Saint John's Riverside Hospital added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) S Rothschild & Co Inc, S T S Contractors, S&P Construction, S&S Kings Corp., S. Saltzman, S9 Architecture & Engineering, Saad Construction Inc., Saatchi And Saatchi Worldwide and Sabin, Bermant And Guld Llp. added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) S & J Sheet Metal Supply Inc, S & L Aerospace Metals LLC, S & P Construction Management Inc, S 9 Architecture & Engrng Pc, S B Technology, S D Warren Co, S Difazio Industries Inc, S Donadic Woodworking Inc, S Hellman Co, S I Engineering Pc, S I Mental Health Soc Inc, S J Electric Inc, S K P Intl Inc, S M Tam Architect PLLC and S Nassau Community Hospital added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge William F. Kuntz, II and Magistrate Judge Roanne L. Mann. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketIncorrect Case/Document/Entry Information. Civil Cover Sheet is incorrect, does not match Defendant on Caption or Complaint. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against S & E Azrlliant P C filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14414525 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration) (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives is a litigant

Latest cases where SUITE is a litigant

Latest cases where Staten Island University Hospital is a litigant