This case was last updated from PACER on 08/16/2021 at 19:22:36 (UTC).

Percy et al v. P & H Painting Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/27/2021 Percy filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against P H Painting Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas G. Garaufis and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02314

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G. Garaufis

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives

Defendants

P & H Painting Inc

Petrie Division

Paco Group Inc

Robert B Samuels Inc

Professional Data Systems

Parkview Care & Rehab Ctr

Paul Wilmot Communications

Portigon

Russo & Keane

Radiology Associates-Brooklyn

Reich And Tang

Picco Construction

Restorative Medicine Pc Judith

Planet Mechanical

Pegram Enterprises

Pmx Agency Inc.

Pegalis & Erickson

Parker New York

Protege Partners

735 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James M. Kernan

Attorney at Kernan Professional Group, LLP

26 Broadway, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

Other Attorneys

Peter C. Merani

Attorney at Peter C. Merani, PC

1001 Avenue Of The Americas, Ste 1800

New York, NY 10018

Eugene Alexander Gormakh

Attorney at Law Offices Of Michael S. Ross

60 East 42Nd Street, Forty-Seventh Floor, New York, Ste Forty-Seventh Floor

New York, NY 10165

Michael S. Ross

One Grand Central Place, 60 East 42Nd Street, 47Th Floor

New York, NY 10165

 

Court Documents

#48

(#48) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #38 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYEDC-14599550. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#47

(#47) DECLARATION re #38 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by James M. Kernan (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#46

(#46) NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Alexander Gormakh on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Gormakh, Eugene) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#45

(#45) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Ross on behalf of James M. Kernan (notification declined or already on case) (Ross, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

44 #12

EXHIBIT L - OIG referral of Percy Jobs & Careers to the NY State AG

44 #11

EXHIBIT K - Purported Notice of Settlement

44 #10

EXHIBIT J - City's cease-and-desist letter, dated July 24, 2020

44 #9

EXHIBIT I - Kernan's Discipline in KY, WV, and PA

#38

(#47) DECLARATION re #38 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by James M. Kernan (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#7

(#7) Pci Homecare Group, Pear Core Solutions, Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Brtz, Pearl Meyer And Partners, Pearland, Pearls Construction LLC, Pearson, Peckar & Abramson A Pro Corp, Peckham Industries, Peconic Bay Medical Center, Pediatric Hospital, Peduto Construction Corporation, Peepels Mechanical Corp, Pegalis & Erickson, Pegram Enterprises, Pei Architects, Pei Cobb Freed-Partners Archt, Pei Partnership, Pelham Parkway Dialysis Ctr, Pelham Pkwy Nursing Home, Pelli Clarke Pelli Architects, Pen Enterprises, Pena & Kahn and Penguin Random House added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#6

(#6) Paterno Asphalt Corp, Path Medical, Pathology & Laboratory Medical, Pathways To Housing, Patients Medical Pc, Patriot Electric Corp, Patterson Belknap Webb-Tyler, Patton Eakins Lipsett Martin, Pau/Practice For Architecture & Urbanism, Paul A Castrucci Architect, Pau/Practice For Architecture & Urbanism, Paul Bunyon Tree Care, Paul Dicpinigaitis Md, Paul J. Scariano Inc., Paul Labrecque Salon, Paul Michael Marketing Svc, Paul Weiss, Paul Wilmot Communications, Paws To The Pavement, Pazer & Epstein, Pb Contracting, Pc Consulting Management Corp, Pc Richard And Son and Pccs added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#5

(#5) Paris Health Club, Park Ave International Inc, Park Ave. International Contracting Corporation, Park Avenue Extended Care, Park Avenue Post Inc, Park Developers & Builders, Park East Construction Corporation, Park Hudson Intl LLC, Park Pediatrics, Park Ridge Medical Ctr, Park Slope Day Camp, Park Terrace Care Ctr, Parkchester Medical, Parker Institute, Parker New York, Parkermeridien, Parkview Care & Rehab Ctr, Pars International Corp, Parsons Brinckerhoff, Partners Ellenberg, Partners In Care, Partnership For Nyc, Pat Corsetti Inc. and Pat Fay added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#4

(#4) Palace Electrical Contractors, Paladin Consulting-Programming, Palante Electrical Contractors, Palard Realty Corp, Palatine Industries, Paletot Ltd., Pall Aeropower Corporation, Pall Biomedical Inc, Pall Corporation, Pallotta Health Solution, Palm Tree Center For Nursing And Rehab, Palma Settimi Inc, Pam Air Conditioning, Panhandle Ironworks LLC, Panoramic Hudson LLC, Panteris & Panteris Llp, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Par Plumbing Co., Paraco Gas Corporation, Paradigm Services Inc, Paradise Plastics, Paradox Resolution LLC, Paralegal Support Svc Inc, Parc and Parfums Givenchy Inc added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#3

(#3) P & K Contracting Inc, P & T Ii Contracting Corp, P And L Development LLC, P C Rosenberg & Estis Attorney, P E Guerin Inc, P M D Promotion, P M Pediatrics, P Peugeot Watches, P M Pediatrics, P Peugeot Watches, P S Business Management, Pace University, Pacific Transglobal, Pack America Corp, Paco Group Inc, Pacoa, Paddle Eight, Padilla Construction Service, Paduano & Weintraub Llp, Paerdegat Kid Sports & Child, Pagny, Paige Ai, Pain D' Avignon, Paint Tech Painting Inc, Painting & Decorating B F and Pal Environmental Safety Corporation added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

1 #2

Declaration

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against P & H Painting Inc filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14414671 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration) (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

61 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCases associated. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #48 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Jones, Vasean) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#48) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #38 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYEDC-14599550. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) DECLARATION re #38 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by James M. Kernan (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Alexander Gormakh on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Gormakh, Eugene) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Ross on behalf of James M. Kernan (notification declined or already on case) (Ross, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketORDER: Attorney Kernan's request to extend the deadline to show cause by thirty days is DENIED. A limited extension to June 21 is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/11/2021. (Baron, Laura) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#44) DECLARATION re #43 Letter Kami Z. Barker Declaration, dated June 11, 2021 by City of New York (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A - May 27, 2020 letter, #2 EXHIBIT B - purported state court complaints, #3 EXHIBIT C - 1977 dismissal of Percy v. Brennan, #4 EXHIBIT D - SDNY February 20, 2018 decision, #5 EXHIBIT E - Percy affidavit, #6 EXHIBIT F- SDNY February 23, 2018 decision, #7 EXHIBIT G - Public Records Search Results, #8 EXHIBIT H - Kernan's Disciplinary Decision, #9 EXHIBIT I - Kernan's Discipline in KY, WV, and PA, #10 EXHIBIT J - City's cease-and-desist letter, dated July 24, 2020, #11 EXHIBIT K - Purported Notice of Settlement, #12 EXHIBIT L - OIG referral of Percy Jobs & Careers to the NY State AG) (Barker, Kami) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#43) Letter amicus submission supporting the Court's referral of James Kernan to the disciplinary committee by City of New York (Barker, Kami) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#42) Letter MOTION for Sanctions by Peter Merani Law Office. (Merani, Peter) Modified on 6/11/2021 to correct filing party. (Guzzi, Roseann). (Entered: 06/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
37 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) Pharmaceutical Media Inc, Phelps Hospital Robotics, Phelps Memorial Hospital, Philip Habib & Assoc, Philip Morris International Inc., Philip Weintraub, Phillip Nizer Law Firm, Phillips & Assoc, Phillips & Co Pc, Phillips Group, Phillips Krantz & Assoc, Phipps Construction Inc, Physique 57, Pi Capital Partners, Pibly Residential Program Inc, Picciano & Scahill Pc, Picco Construction, Picis, Pico Electronics Inc, Piece Management, Pierre Michel Inc, Pierre Toussaint Family Health, Pillinger Miller Tarallo Lip, Pillori Associates and Pillsbury added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Perl & Asch, Perlman And Perlman Esquires, Permadur Ind. Inc., Permal Group Inc., Permission Data, Pernod Ricard Usa LLC, Perry Consulting, Person Centered Care Services, Personal Touch, Pesach Tikvah Door Of Hope, Peter F Poon Architects, Peter J Catanzaro Inc, Peter J Kelley & Assoc, Peter Merani Law Office, Peter Pennoyer Architects, Peter Scalamandre & Sons, Petersan Group, Petracca & Sons, Petrie Division, Petrillo Stone Corp, Petrovano & Assoc, Petsky Prunier LLC, Pfizer Inc., Pg Drywall and Pharmaceutical Media Inc added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Peninsula Counseling Ctr, Peninsula General Nursing Home, Penn Plaza Consultants Group, Penta City Gr. Jv, Pentegra Retirement Services, Pentland Usa, Penton Learning, People Care Inc, Perciballi Industries Inc, Percy Uris Natatorium, Perecman Firm PLLC, Perella Weinberg Partners Lp, Perelson Weiner Llp Certified, Peretz Mirgang & Co Llp, Perfectaire Co Inc, Perfection Drywall Tapers Inc, Perfetto Contracting Company, Perfetto Enterprises Company Inc, Performance Health, Performance Logic Inc, Perkan Concrete Corp, Perkins & Will and Perkins Eastman Architects added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Pci Homecare Group, Pear Core Solutions, Pearl Cohen Zedek Latzer Brtz, Pearl Meyer And Partners, Pearland, Pearls Construction LLC, Pearson, Peckar & Abramson A Pro Corp, Peckham Industries, Peconic Bay Medical Center, Pediatric Hospital, Peduto Construction Corporation, Peepels Mechanical Corp, Pegalis & Erickson, Pegram Enterprises, Pei Architects, Pei Cobb Freed-Partners Archt, Pei Partnership, Pelham Parkway Dialysis Ctr, Pelham Pkwy Nursing Home, Pelli Clarke Pelli Architects, Pen Enterprises, Pena & Kahn and Penguin Random House added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Paterno Asphalt Corp, Path Medical, Pathology & Laboratory Medical, Pathways To Housing, Patients Medical Pc, Patriot Electric Corp, Patterson Belknap Webb-Tyler, Patton Eakins Lipsett Martin, Pau/Practice For Architecture & Urbanism, Paul A Castrucci Architect, Pau/Practice For Architecture & Urbanism, Paul Bunyon Tree Care, Paul Dicpinigaitis Md, Paul J. Scariano Inc., Paul Labrecque Salon, Paul Michael Marketing Svc, Paul Weiss, Paul Wilmot Communications, Paws To The Pavement, Pazer & Epstein, Pb Contracting, Pc Consulting Management Corp, Pc Richard And Son and Pccs added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Paris Health Club, Park Ave International Inc, Park Ave. International Contracting Corporation, Park Avenue Extended Care, Park Avenue Post Inc, Park Developers & Builders, Park East Construction Corporation, Park Hudson Intl LLC, Park Pediatrics, Park Ridge Medical Ctr, Park Slope Day Camp, Park Terrace Care Ctr, Parkchester Medical, Parker Institute, Parker New York, Parkermeridien, Parkview Care & Rehab Ctr, Pars International Corp, Parsons Brinckerhoff, Partners Ellenberg, Partners In Care, Partnership For Nyc, Pat Corsetti Inc. and Pat Fay added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Palace Electrical Contractors, Paladin Consulting-Programming, Palante Electrical Contractors, Palard Realty Corp, Palatine Industries, Paletot Ltd., Pall Aeropower Corporation, Pall Biomedical Inc, Pall Corporation, Pallotta Health Solution, Palm Tree Center For Nursing And Rehab, Palma Settimi Inc, Pam Air Conditioning, Panhandle Ironworks LLC, Panoramic Hudson LLC, Panteris & Panteris Llp, Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Par Plumbing Co., Paraco Gas Corporation, Paradigm Services Inc, Paradise Plastics, Paradox Resolution LLC, Paralegal Support Svc Inc, Parc and Parfums Givenchy Inc added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) P & K Contracting Inc, P & T Ii Contracting Corp, P And L Development LLC, P C Rosenberg & Estis Attorney, P E Guerin Inc, P M D Promotion, P M Pediatrics, P Peugeot Watches, P M Pediatrics, P Peugeot Watches, P S Business Management, Pace University, Pacific Transglobal, Pack America Corp, Paco Group Inc, Pacoa, Paddle Eight, Padilla Construction Service, Paduano & Weintraub Llp, Paerdegat Kid Sports & Child, Pagny, Paige Ai, Pain D' Avignon, Paint Tech Painting Inc, Painting & Decorating B F and Pal Environmental Safety Corporation added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. by Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against P & H Painting Inc filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14414671 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration) (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives is a litigant