This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/18/2022 at 18:54:18 (UTC).

Percy et al v. F & E Maintenance Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/21/2021 Percy filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against F E Maintenance Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas G. Garaufis and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02194

  • Filing Date:

    04/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G. Garaufis

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Defendants

Falconhead Capital

Forsythe Plumbing & Heating Corp

Fdm Group Inc

Fitch Group Inc

Forest Laboratories Inc

Fit Pregnancy Magazine

Five Star Electric

Forte Remodeling Inc

Fojp Service Corp

Flushing Asphalt

F X Fowle Architects

Family Services Network Of New York

Farrell Fritz Pc

Flagship Brewing Co

Faust Goetz Schenker Blee Llp

First American International Bank

Fifth Avenue Counseling Ctr

Fazio Construction

Formica Construction Co Inc

Family & Salute Magazines

1,171 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

James M. Kernan

Attorney at Kernan Professional Group, LLP

26 Broadway, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#18

#17

#16

#15

14 #1

attachment

#14

13 #1

Exhibit June 1, 2021 letter from James M. Kernan

#13

#11

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #3

Declaration

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Attachment 1

#1

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCases associated. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #18 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Jones, Vasean) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #11 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYEDC-14600520. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) DECLARATION re #11 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by James M. Kernan (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Alexander Gormakh on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Gormakh, Eugene) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Ross on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Ross, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketORDER: Attorney Kernan's request to extend the deadline to show cause by thirty days is DENIED. A limited extension to June 21 is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/11/2021. (Baron, Laura) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Letter by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation (Attachments: #1 attachment) (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Letter Letter to the Court by Galaxy General Contracting Corp (Attachments: #1 Exhibit June 1, 2021 letter from James M. Kernan) (Doyle, Michael) (Entered: 06/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the removed actions are remanded to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County; the federal actions are dismissed with prejudice; requests for attorneys' fees and costs by the Defendants in the removed actions are granted, and Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Brenna B. Mahoney, Chief Deputy Clerk on May 28, 2021. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Foursquare Labs Inc, Fourth Floor Fashion, Fourth Street Inn LLC, Fox Horan & Camerini, Fox News Network LLC, Foxy Machine, Fpa Billing Dept, Fporter Recovery Services, Fps Contracting Inc, Framan Mechanical Inc, Frame Store, Francis Levien Gymnasium, Franciscan Community Ctr, Franco Belli Plumbing & Heating, Frank M Debono Construction, Frankel Associates, Franklin & Lennon Paint Co, Franklin Immediate, Franklin Templeton Investments, Franklin Weinrib Rudell Vssll, Frank's Home Improvement, Fratello Construction Company, Frauscher Sensor Tech Usa Inc, Frazer And Feldman Llp, Frbny, Fred Alger Management Inc, Fred Smith Plumbing & Heating, Fredante Construction, Freddys Home Improvement, Frederick Wildman And Sons, Free Country, Free Hill Hogan & Mahar, Freedman And Co Cpa Pc, Freelance Recruiter, Freeport Screen & Stamping Inc, Freidman & James, Frekhtman & Assoc, French & Casey Llp, French Mission To Un, French Sole Comfort, Frenco Architectual Metal, Frendel Brown & Weissman, Frenkel Benefits LLC, Frenkel Herschkowitz Shafran, Fresh Air Fund, Fresh Meadow Country Club, Fresh Meadow Electrical Contractors LLC, Fresh Meadow Mechanical Corp, Freshdirect, Fried, Frank, Harris Shriver And Jacobs, Friedland Properties Inc, Friedman & Anspach, Friedman Kaplan, Friedman Llp, Friedman Management Corp, Friedwald Ctr For Rehab And Nursing LLC, Friends Academy, Friends Of The High Line Inc, Friends Of The Queensway, Frigid Solutions, Frog Design Inc, Frontier Kemper Construction Inc, Frontier Soloutions Inc, Fross Zelnick Lehrman And Zissu Pc, Fs, Fsg Electric, Fsi Architechtural, Fti Consulting (Sc) Inc, Fudge Foundation, Fujifilm U.S.A Inc, Fulcrum Group, Full Circle Construction, Full Picture, Full Service Contracting Inc, Fulton Commons Care Ctr LLC, Fulton Rowe & Hart, Funaro Co, Fund E-Z Development Corp, Funfest NY, Fung's Construction Inc, Funtime Amusements Inc, Furey Furey Leverage Manzione, Furman Kornfeld & Brennan, Furniture Rental Assoc Inc,, Fusco Brandenstein & Rada, Fusebox Inc, Fusion Telecomm Intl Inc, Future Star Day Camps, Future Tech Consultants Inc, Fx Collaborative, Fxcm Inc, Fxfowle Architects, G & FAST Electric Incorporated, G & M Mechanical Inc, G G Engineering, G M Major Holding Inc, G R Reid Assoc Llp, G4s Secure Integration LLC, Ga Fleet Assoc, Gabbe Group, Gabe Construction Corp, Gabellini Sheppard Assoc Llp, Gabriels Technology Solutions, Gabsy Hotel, Gace Consulting, Gair Gair Conason Rubinowitz, Gal Manufacturing Corp, Gala, Galaxy General Contracting Corp, Gallery 57 Dental LLC, Gallery System Inc, Gallet Dreyer & Berkey Llp, Gallivant Times Square, Gallo Vitucci Klar, Galvin Bros., Inc/Madhue Contracting Inc, Gamco Corp, Game Sportswear Ltd, Gandhi Consulting Engrs Archt, Ganer & Ganer LLC, Ganfer Shore Law Office, Gannon Vitolo Contracting LLC, Garage Management Corp, Garan Incorporated, Garden Care Ctr, Garden City Country Club, Garden City Dermatology Pc, Garden City Dialysis, Garden City Group LLC, Garden City Hotel, Garden City Park Water/Fire District, Garden City Pool, Garden City Surgery Ctr, Garden Of Eden Home For Adults, Gardiner And Theobald Inc, Garfunkel Wild & Travis, Garganigo Goldsmith & Weiss, Garland Publishing, Garrison Institute, Garrison Properties LLC, Garrity Graham Murphy Garofalo, Gartner & Bloom, Gary B Pillersdorf Law Offices, Gary Plastics Packaging Corp, Gary S Mayerson & Assoc, Gary Tsirelman Law Office, Gas Turbine Controls, Gaskets R Us, Gasper Accardi, Gastonwhite, Gastrointestinal Associates, Gate Hotel Jfk Airport, Gateway Arms Realty Corp, Gateway Demo/Civil Corp, Gateway School Of New York, Gatti Industries Ii Inc, Gazebo Contracting Inc, Gbg Usa Inc, Gccom Cons Co, Gcs Computers Inc, Gcs Software LLC, Gdc Properties LLC, Gdhd, Gds Development, Gell & Gell, Geller And Company LLC, Gem Hotel, Gem Quality Corporation, Gemco Restorations, Gemini Security Services, Gem Quality Corpporation, Gemveto Co Inc, Gener8 Maritime Inc, General Atlantic LLC, General Bearing Corp, General Construction Corp, General Electrical Contracting, General Fireproof Door Inc, General Foundries Inc, General Human Outreach Inc, General Refinery, General Services Administration (Gsa), Generation Ready Inc, Genesis Architectural, Genesis Design & Construction, Geneva Worldwide Inc, Gennus Corp, Genpact Limited, Genpak LLC, Genrus Corp, Gensler, Gentile Pismeny And Brengal Llp, Geodesign Inc, Geodesign Inc, Geoffrey D Menin Pc, Geomatrix Services Inc, George A Fuller Co Inc, George Auto Rental Corp, George Breslaw & Sons, George Little Management, George Weiss Inc, Geotechnical Engineering Services PC, Geotext Translations Inc, Geppetto Group, Gerald & Lawrence Blumberg, Gerald Karikari Pc Law Ofc, Gerald W Lynch Theater At John, Gerber Life Insurance Company, Gerety Building & Restoration, Gerindustries Gerindustries, Gerlach Frames Inc, Gerner Kronick Valcarcel Archt, Gersh Agency NY Inc, Gershbaum & Weisz Pc, Gerson Lehrman Group Inc, Gersowitz Libo & Korek Pc, Gerstman LLC, Getinge Usa Sales LLC, Getman & Sweeney PLLC, Gettry Marcus, Gf55 Partners, Gfi Capital Resources Group Inc, Gfk, Gfl, Ghostery Inc, Ghwa, Gi Energy, Giachetti Plumbing, Gianfia Corp, Giansia New Hampton, Giant Magazine, Giants Engineering, Gibbons Esposito & Boyce Engrs, Gibney Anthony Flaherty Law, Gibney Dance, Gibney, Anthony And Flaherty, Gibraltar Transmissions, Gifts Software Inc, Gig Werks, Gilbane Building Company, Gil Bar Industries, Gilbride Tusa Last & Spellane, Gilder Gagnon Howe And Co, Gillman Consulting Inc, Gilloco Construction Inc, Gilmartin Poster & Shafto Llp, Gilsanz Murray Stefick Llp, Gilston Electrical Contracting, Gin Lane Media, Giordano Builders, Giorgio Armani Corporation, Giraldi Media, Girl Be Heard, Girl Scouts Of The Usa, Girls Write Now Inc, Glacier Films, Gladding Mcbean, Gladstein Reif & Meginniss, Glassbox Digital, Glassesusa LLC, Glen Cove Hospital, Glen Cove Mansion Hotel Cnfrnc, Glen Head Country Club, Glen Oaks Village Owners Inc, Glengariff Corp, Glenhaven Organization, Glenwood Mason Supply Co Inc, Glickman Engineering, Glissen Chemical Co Inc, Glm Security & Sound, Global Advertising Strategies, Global Bmu LLC, Global Brands Group, Global Capital Advisors LLC, Global Carpet & Upholstery, Global Credit Svc Inc, Global Deposition Svc Inc, Global Electrical Contracting, Global Equipment Company Inc, Global Holdings Management Group, Global Industries, Global Kids Inc, Global Liquid Markets, Global Medical Transcription, Global Pediatrics P C, Global Sales Ltd, Global Sourcing & Design, Global Strategy Group LLC, Global Technology, Global Vision Magazine, Global Vision Mktng & Design, Global X Management Co LLC, Glocap, Gluck+ Architecture, Gluckman Mayner, Gm Data Communications Inc, Gmj Contracting, Gmp LLC, Go! New York, Gocard, Godinger Silver Art Co Ltd, Godiva Chocolatier Inc, Godosky & Gentile Pc, Godwin Inc, Gogorilla Media, Gogotech, Goidel & Siegel Llp, Gold Crest Care Ctr, Gold Service Movers Inc, Gold Start Electrical Inc, Goldberg & Lindenberg Pc, Goldberg Segalla, Goldberg Weprin & Ustin, Goldberger Co, Goldcrest Post Productions, Golden Care, Golden Chocolate Inc, Golden Krust Caribbean Bakery Inc, Golden Oldies Ltd, Golden Rothschild Spagnola Pc, Golden Touch Imports Inc, Goldengate Nurses, Goldenhearts Elderly Care Services, Goldfarb & Fleece, Goldfarb Abrandt Salzman, Goldfarb Properties, Goldfinger & Lassar Iwyrs, Goldilocks Films, Goldin Capital Management Lp, Goldman & Young Group, Goldman Copeland Assoc, Goldstein & Co, Goldstein & Greenlaw, Goldstein & Lee P C, Goldstein Rikon Rikon, Goldstein Siegel Herman Md Pc, Golenbock Eiseman Assor Bel, Golf Club Of Purchase, Golf Pro Delivered, Golfer Mag, Gombert Industries Inc, Good, Good Shepherd Services, Goodkind Group LLC, Goodmart LLC, Google, Gorayeb & Assoc, Gordon H Smith Corp, Gordon Herlands, Gorlick Kravitz & Lishaus Pc, Goshow Architects, Goss & Goss Custom Metal, Gotham, Gotham Co Inc, Gotham Consulting Partners LLC, Gotham Hotel, Gotham Organization, Gotham Per Diem Inc, Gotham Soccer League, Gotham Technical Training Corp, Gotham Yellow LLC, Gould Paper Corporation, Gourmet Boutique LLC, Government, Gowanus Expressway Project, Gpi - Greenman Pedersen Inc, Gpm Lawn Sprinkler Parts, Grace Community Church, Grace Engineering, Grace Industries Inc, Grace Institute, Grace Lutheran Pre School, Grace Plaza Nurse & Rehab Ctr, Grace Plaza Of Great Neck Inc, Gracepoint Gospel Fellowship, Graciano Corp, Grade Architects, Gradient, Grado Labs Inc, Graduate Center Foundation Inc, Grady Levkov And Company Inc, Grady S Cold Brew, Graham Windham, Gramercy Cardiac Diagnostic, Gramercy Group Inc, Gramercy Jewelry Mfg Inc, Gramercy Mri Diagnostic Rdlgy, Gramercy Park Physicians, Gramercy Surgery Ctr, Grammercy, Grand Basket Co Inc, Grand Builder Contracting Inc, Grand Central Neighborhood, Grand Hyatt New York, Grand Manor Nurse & Rehab Ctr, Grand Mechanical Corp, Grand Mini Mart, Grand Prix New York, Grand Street Guild Hdfc LLC, Grandma Moses Properties Co, Granite Construction Northeast Inc, Granoff Walker & Forlenza, Grant & Eisenhofer Pa, Graphic Management Partners, Graphic Systems Group, Graphic Visions Group, Graphite Metallizing Corp, Graubard Miller, Gravitas Technology, Gray Krauss, Graystone Construction Manag, Great American Restoration Svc, Great Atlantic Construction Spe LLC, Great Construction & Renovation, Great Eastern Energy, Great Eastern Maintenance Svc, Great Eastern Metals, Great Forest, Great Jones Spa, Great Neck Medical Group, Great Neck Obstetrics, Great Neck Saw Mfrs Inc, Great Small Works Inc, Greater Hudson Bank, Greater New York Mutual Insura, Greater NY Endoscopy Surgical, Greater Ridgewood Youth Council, Greater Talent Network Inc, Greater Than One Inc, Greco Roman Design Corp, Greeley & Hansen Engineers, Green Asphalt, Green Builders Group NY Corp, Green Chimneys Childrens Services Inc, Green Field Construction Group, Green Island Group Corp, Green Key Temp LLC, Green NY Corp, Green Pro Cleaning Mntnc Inc, Greenacres Press Inc, Greenberg Kirshenbaum Inc, Greenberg Trager & Herbst, Greenburgh 11 Union Free School District, Greenburgh Health Ctr, Greencard Pictures LLC, Greenfield Industries Inc, Greenfield Stein & Senior, Greenman Pedersen Inc, Greenstein & Millbauer Llp, Greenwich House, Greg Beeche Logistic LLC, Gregory Hotel New York, Gregory M Longworth & Assoc, Gregory P Joseph Law Ofc LLC, Gregory P Joseph Law Ofc LLC, Grenadier Corp, Gretel Inc, Grey & Grey LLC,, Greymart Metal Co, Greystar, Greystone And Co Inc, Gridspan Corporation, Griffin Dewatering NE LLC, Griffon Associates, Grimm Artisanal Ales, Grimshaw Architect Pc, Grindstone Brewing Co LLC, Grok, Grosvenor Realty Group LLC, Groton Partners, Grotto Plumbing, Groundwater Press Assoc, Group Health Dental, Group Iii Inc, Group J Inc, Groupm Worldwide Inc, Grove Press Editorial Pblcty, Grownyc, Growth Products LLC and Grp Financial Services added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Forum Personnel, Fos Development Corp, Foster + Partners, Foto-Care Ltd, Fotopoulos Rosenblatt & Green, Foundation For Research-Sex, Fountain House Inc, Four Seasons Dialysis Ctr, Four Seasons Hotel New York, Four Star General Cleaning Svc, Four Tribes Construction Services LLC and Four Winds Hospital added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Kiyo A. Matsumoto and Magistrate Judge Peggy Kuo. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) F M Brush Co Inc, F X Fowle Architects, F & F Roofing Co, F & S General Construction Inc, F C Sturtevant Co, F Chau & Assoc Llp, F Schumacher And Co, F&T Group, F I Electrical Corp, Fab Con Machinery Devmnt Corp, Fabiani Cohen & Hall Llp, Fabric Resources Ltd, Factory 360, Factory Pr LLC, Facts On File, Faculty Practice Assoc, Fader, Fagenson & Puglisi, Fahrenheit 212 LLC, Fair Way Plbg & Htg Cooling, Faircom New York, Fairdinkum Consulting, Fairfax & Sammons Architects, Fairfield Refrigeration And Cooling Equi, Faith Construction Inc, Faithful+Gould, Inc, Falcon Electrical Contracting Corp, Falcone's Cookie Land Ltd, Falconhead Capital, Falidas Associates, Fames Chocolate, Families On The Move Of Nyc, Family & Salute Magazines, Family And Children's Assn, Family Care Certified Services Of Nassau, Family Center For Autism, Family Health Assoc, Family Health Ctr Ntwrk Luth, Family Home Improvement Corp, Family Medical Practice, Family Residence, Family Services Network Of New York, Fancy Foods Inc, Fanning Electric Co Inc, Far Rockaway Treatment Ctr, Farenga Brothers Funeral Hm, Farfield Co, Farkouh Furman & Faccio, Farley Sales Installations Inc, Farmingdale Senior High School, Farragut Builders Ii Inc, Farrand Control Div, Farrell Fritz Pc, Fashion Avenue News Magazine, Fashion Institute Of Technolog, Fashion Market Magazine Group, Fat Cat, Fathom Communications, Fauna Food Corp, Fauna Food Corp, Faust Goetz Schenker Blee Llp, Favorite Plastics, Fax On File, Faxa Inc, Fay Kaplun & Marcin Llp, Fazio Construction, Faztec Industries Inc, Fcb Worldwide, Fcs Group LLC, Fda, Fdm Group Inc, Fedcap, Feder Kaszovitz Llp, Federal Aviation Admin, Federal Defender Of New York, Federal Defenders, Federal Express Corporation, Federal Home Loan Bank Of New York, Federal Reserve, Federal Yellow Book, Fedex Corporation, Fegs, Feinstein Iron Works Inc, Felix Storch Inc, Feminist Press, Fenestra America LLC, Fensterstock & Partners Llp, Fenway Golf Club Inc, Ferber Chan Esner & Coller, Ferguson & Shamamian Archt, Ferrara Bakery & Cafe, Ferraro & Wyatt, Ferrell Calvillo Communication, Ferro Kuba Mangano Skylyar Pc, Ferrod Associates Inc, Fetal Evaluation, Fetner Properties, Fgi Corp, Fgph Corp, Fhi 360, Fiberall Corp, Fiberwave Technologies, Fiction Magazine, Fidelis Care, Fidelis Contracting Inc, Fidelus Technologies, Fiducial, Fiduciary Trust Company Intern, Fiedler Co Inc, Fiedlis Contracting Inc, Field Library, Field Thomas, Fieldston Clothes Inc, Fieldstone Lodge, Fieldvision Services Inc, Fiera Capital Inc, Fifth Avenue Counseling Ctr, Fifth Avenue Digital, Fig Press, Figliulo & Partners, Filco Carting Corp, File Stream Inc, Film Movement LLC, Film Payroll Svc, Film Rise, Fin & Brew, Final Cut Usa, Final Frame, Final Push Construction Inc, Finance, Financial Clinic The, Financial Information Forum, Financial Press Corp, Finback Brewery, Fine Communications, Fine Sheer Industries Inc, Fine Star Electric, Finest Air Inc, Finish Line Collision Inc, Finishing Trade, Finivation Software, Finn Partners, Inc, Finsbury Solutions, Finsoft Consultants, Fire Alarm Electrical Corp, Fire Hydrant Parts Brooklyn, Firmenich Inc, Firmenich Incorporated, First American International Bank, First Amern Title Ins Co Of NY, First Class Management Co, First Construction Group, First Data Corporation, First Derivatives Us Inc, First Eagle Investment Management LLC, First Hand, First Investors Corp, First Medcare, First Medical Immediate Med Cr, First Protocol Inc, First Quality Enterprises Inc, First Response Advantage Inc, First Run Features, First Spice Mixing Co, First Spring Corporation, First Standard Construction, First Star Automotive, First2print, Fischer & Makooi Architects, Fischer Bros, Fisher Marantz Stone Inc, Fit Pregnancy Magazine, Fitapelli & Schaffer Llp Nyc, Fitch Group Inc, Fitzgerald & Fitzgerald, Fitzgerald Cantor Brokerage Lp, Fitzpatrick Cella Et Al, Five A Incentive Planners Inc, Five Boroughs Brewing, Five O'clock Club, Five Star Contracting Companies Inc, Five Star Electric, Five Star Products Inc, Fj Sciame Construction, Fja, Fjc Security Services, Flaggstaff Technology Group Inc, Flagship Brewing Co, Flagship One Inc, Flash Electronics Inc, Flashpoint Medica, Flat Iron Hotel, Flatbush Development Corp, Flaxmove Moving Co, Fleet Wash, Fleetwood Lock Co Inc, Fleurchem Inc, Flex Construction, Flicker Garelick & Assoc, Flight Path, Flint & Steel, Flintlock Construction Svc LLC, Floating Hospital Inc, Floracon LLC, Florence E Smith, Florida Safety Contractors Inc, Flushing Asphalt, Flushing Bank, Flushing Commons LLC, Flushing Hospital Medical Center, Flushing Savings Bank, Fm Office Express, Fmc Engineering P C, Fmcp, Fna Engineering Services PC, Focus Construction Group, Focus Group, Fogarty Finger Architecture Interiors, Fojp Service Corp, Foley And Lardner, Foley Inc, Folia, Fong & Wong Pc, Fong Inn Too, Food Bank For New York City, Foodmatch, Foong & Mak, Foot Locker, Foothold Technology, Forchelli Curto Deegan, Ford And Harrison, Ford Foundation, Ford Models Inc, Fordham Marble Co Inc, Fordham University, Foreht Last Landau Katz Attys, Foresight Theatrical LLC, Forest City Ratner Companies LLC, Forest Hills Financial Group, Forest Hills Orthopedic Group, Forest Laboratories Inc, Forest View Nursing Home Inc, Forestdale, Formed Plastics Inc, Formica Construction Co Inc, Formula Public Relations, Formulated Solutions LLC, Forrest Solutions Inc, Forrester Fence Co Inc, Forsman & Bodenfors, Forsythe Cosmetic Group Ltd, Forsythe Cosmetic Group Ltd, Forsythe Plumbing & Heating Corp, Fort Cica Roofing & Gen Contrs, Fort Greene Senior Council, Fort Schuyler House Inc, Fort Tryon Overlook Property Owner LLC, Fort Tyron Nursing Home, Forte Construction Corp, Forte Remodeling Inc, Fortis Property Group and Fortress Investment Group LLC added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADD PARTIES - It is the responsibility of Counsel to add all Parties to their docket sheet. Parties can be added using the event Utility Events Add Parties (under Other Documents) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) F D R Svc Corp and F I Electric added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against F & E Maintenance Inc filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14396072 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration) (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Five Star Electric is a litigant

Latest cases where Fitch Group Inc is a litigant