This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/08/2022 at 20:11:25 (UTC).

Percy et al v. D & D Metal Work Inc et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Percy filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against D D Metal Work Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas G. Garaufis and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02182

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G. Garaufis

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives

Defendants

D & F Development Group

D & D Metal Work Inc

Delta

Eng-Wong, Taub & Associates

Elli NY Design Corp / Metropolitan Realty LLC

Ensome Builders Inc

Downtown Medical Assoc

Eckenfelder Engineering Dba Brown And Caldwell

Duke On 42nd Street Theatre

Dealogic LLC

Elysabeth Kleinhans Theatrical

East Woods Discovery Camp

Dexterity Inc

Eastone 26 Ave LLC

Edi Construction Inc

Exterminare Pest Control

Eldor Electric LLC

E Cook Industries

Elizabeth Seton Children's Ctr

718 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

James M. Kernan

Attorney at Kernan Professional Group, LLP

26 Broadway, 19Th Floor

New York, NY 10004

 

Court Documents

#37

#36

#35

#34

#33

32 #5

EXHIBIT E - Percy affidavit

32 #3

EXHIBIT C - 1977 dismissal of Percy v. Brennan

32 #2

EXHIBIT B - purported state court complaints

#28

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #4

Related Case Statement

1 #3

Declaration

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Attachment 1

#1

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCases associated. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #37 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Jones, Vasean) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#37) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #28 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYEDC-14600486. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#36) DECLARATION re #28 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by James M. Kernan (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#35) DECLARATION re #28 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by James M. Kernan (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#34) NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Alexander Gormakh on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Gormakh, Eugene) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#33) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Ross on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Ross, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketORDER: Attorney Kernan's request to extend the deadline to show cause by thirty days is DENIED. A limited extension to June 21 is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/11/2021. (Baron, Laura) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#32) DECLARATION re #31 Letter of Kami Z. Barker, dated June 11, 2021 by City of New York (Attachments: #1 EXHIBIT A - May 27, 2020 letter, #2 EXHIBIT B - purported state court complaints, #3 EXHIBIT C - 1977 dismissal of Percy v. Brennan, #4 EXHIBIT D - SDNY February 20, 2018 decision, #5 EXHIBIT E - Percy affidavit, #6 EXHIBIT F- SDNY February 23, 2018 decision, #7 EXHIBIT G - Public Records Search Results, #8 EXHIBIT H - Kernan's Disciplinary Decision, #9 EXHIBIT I - Kernan's Discipline in KY, WV, and PA, #10 EXHIBIT J - City's cease-and-desist letter, dated July 24, 2020, #11 EXHIBIT K - Purported Notice of Settlement, #12 EXHIBIT L - OIG referral of Percy Jobs & Careers to the NY State AG) (Barker, Kami) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#31) Letter supporting the referral of plaintiff's counsel, James Kernan, to the disciplinary committee by City of New York (Barker, Kami) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Danbro Distributors, Daniel Gale Real Estate Inc, Dannell Maguire, Dannon Company, D'annunzio & Sons Inc, Danny And Nicole, Dantona Industries, Dap, D'arcambal Ousley-Cuyler Burk, Darcon Construction Corp, Darger Errante Yavitz-Blau Llp, Dasilva Architects P C, Data Art, Data Industries Ltd, Datacom Technology Group Inc., Dataforms, Dataiku Inc, Datalot Inc, Dattner Architects D.P.C., Daughters Of Jacob, Dave Heiner Associates, Dave Restoration and Davellino Cons. Inc. added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Daedalus Technology Group Inc, Dagher Engineering, Dagny Enterprises LLC, Dai & Assoc, Daikin Applied, Dallas County Comm Clg / Eastfield Clg, Dal-Tile Corporation, Dalton Greiner Hartman Maher And Co LLC, Damato Lynch, Damcosoft Inc, Damian Family Care Ctr, Dan Endara, Dan Klores Assoc Inc, Dana Farber Cancer Institute and Danadams added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO ADD PARTIES - It is the responsibility of Counsel to add all Parties to their docket sheet. Parties can be added using the event Utility Events Add Parties (under Other Documents) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) D & W Central Station and D A Collins Construction Co added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) D & J Concrete Corp. and D & S Restoration Inc added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against D & D Metal Work Inc, D & F Development Group filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14393234 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Declaration, #4 Related Case Statement) (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives is a litigant