This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 02/15/2023 at 14:46:34 (UTC).

Percy et al v. Children's Law Ctr, et al

Case Summary

On 04/20/2021 Percy filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against Children's Law Ctr,. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Nicholas G. Garaufis and Sanket J. Bulsara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02175

  • Filing Date:

    04/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Nicholas G. Garaufis

Referral Judge

Sanket J. Bulsara

 

Party Details

Defendants

Christie's Inc.

Chimpanzee Productions Inc

Chinses American Planning

China Construction America

Christian Cultural Center

Chinatown Cardiology

Chimera Securities, LLC

China Press

Chosen People Ministries

Chldrn's And Women's Physicians Of West

China Laws & Technology Inc

Christian Faith Fellowship

Choice Personnel Inc

Choice Products

Chilmark Builders Inc

Children's Law Ctr,

Christ Church United Methodist Nyc

Chips Technology Group LLC

Coldlion Technologies LLC

495 More Parties Available

 

Court Documents

25 #1

Attachment

#25

(#25) Letter by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

1 #3

Declaration

1 #2

Attachment 1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14392728 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Declaration) (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

#30

(#30) MANDATE of USCA as to #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation, Albert E. Percy. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the orders of the District Court are AFFIRMED. Issued as Mandate: 12/27/2022. USCA# 21-1578. (VJ) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

#29

(#29) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #23 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYEDC-14600466. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#28

(#28) DECLARATION re #23 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by James M. Kernan (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Alexander Gormakh on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Gormakh, Eugene) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#26

(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Ross on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Ross, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

#24

#23

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MANDATE of USCA as to #29 Notice of Appeal filed by Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation, Albert E. Percy. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that the orders of the District Court are AFFIRMED. Issued as Mandate: 12/27/2022. USCA# 21-1578. (VJ) (Entered: 01/27/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketCases associated. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 08/10/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketElectronic Index to Record on Appeal sent to US Court of Appeals. #29 Notice of Appeal Documents are available via Pacer. For docket entries without a hyperlink or for documents under seal, contact the court and we'll arrange for the document(s) to be made available to you. (Jones, Vasean) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #23 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ANYEDC-14600466. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) DECLARATION re #23 Memorandum & Opinion,,, by James M. Kernan (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of Appearance by Eugene Alexander Gormakh on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Gormakh, Eugene) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) NOTICE of Appearance by Michael S. Ross on behalf of James M. Kernan (aty to be noticed) (Ross, Michael) (Entered: 06/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketORDER: Attorney Kernan's request to extend the deadline to show cause by thirty days is DENIED. A limited extension to June 21 is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 6/11/2021. (Baron, Laura) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) Letter by Albert E. Percy, Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation (Attachments: #1 Attachment) (Kernan, James) (Entered: 06/09/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CLERK'S JUDGMENT that the removed actions are remanded to New York Supreme Court, Oneida County; the federal actions are dismissed with prejudice; requests for attorneys' fees and costs by the Defendants in the removed actions are granted, and Judgment is entered in favor of Defendants. Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Brenna B. Mahoney, Chief Deputy Clerk on May 28, 2021. (Lee, Tiffeny) (Entered: 05/28/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketNotice of Related Case: The Civil Cover Sheet filed in this civil action indicates a related case. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Columbia Softball Field, Columbia University, Columbiadoctors Medical Group, Columbiadoctors Nurse, Columbus Avenue Consulting LLC, Columbus Medical Inst Of NY, Comcast Spotlight, Inc., Comfort Bedding Inc., Comixology, Comlab Systems, Command Financial Press, Command Security Corporation, Commentary Magazine, Commerce Electrical Contracting Corp, Commercial Building Mntnc, Commercial Fence & Railing, Commercial Tenant Svc Inc, Committee Of Interns And Residen, Commodore Maintenance, Common Ground Community Hdfc, Communications Plus Digital, Communicator Inc, Community Access, Community Action For Human Services, Community Cardiology Pc, Community Consultation Ctr, Community Electric Inc and Community Health Ctr-Richmond added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Cold Spring Construction Company, Cold Spring Hls Ctr For Nursing, Coldlion Technologies LLC, Cole Mechanical Corp, Cole Partners Inc, Coleman Brandworx, Coleman Country Day Camp, Coler Goldwater Specialty Hosp, Colgate-Palmolive Company, Colina Bay, Inc, Collaborative Construction, Collazo Carling & Mish, Collective 545 Broadway, LLC, Collectivei, Colleran O'hara & Mills, Collibra Inc, Collier Halpern Newberg, Collins Aerospace, Collis Roofing Inc, Colon & Rectal Surgical, Colonial Construction Co Inc, Colonial Consulting LLC, Colonial Electric, Colonial Tag & Label Co, Colony Electric Inc, Colour Matters, Columbia Artist, Columbia Artists Managmnt Inc, Columbia Cascade Co and Columbia Cascade Company added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Cncl On Accreditation For Chldrn And Fml, Cng, Cny, Cny Builders LLC, Co 3, Coachman Family Ctr, Coastal Contracting Corp, Coastal Pipeline Products Corp, Coatue Management, Cobble Hill Health Ctr, Cobite, Coca Cola, Cocentrix Corp, Co-Collective LLC, Cocooning Electronics Ltd, Code And Theory LLC, Coffee Distribution Corp, Cognito Americas LLC, Cognito Inc, Cohen & Frankel Llp, Cohen & Slamowitz, Cohen Childrens Medical Center, Cohen Clair Lans Greifer, Cohen Hochman & Allen, Cohen Hurkin Ehrenfeld, Cohen Kuhn & Assoc, Cohen Weiss And Simon Llp, Cohen Weiss Simon, Cohens Tauber Spivac Wagner and Cohnreznick Llp added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Cl An Druaidh/The Druid Press, Clara Barton High School, Clare Medical, Claridge's Hotel Ltd, Clarient Group, Clarion Partners, LLC, Clark Construction Group, Clark Gagliardi Miller, Clark Investigations & Scrty, Classic Harbor Line, Classic Heights Realty LLC, Classic Home Care Inc, Classic Sports Floors, Classic Stage Co, Classpass, Clay LLC, Clayman & Rosenberg, Clayton Dubilier Rice LLC, Clean Air Quality Svc Inc, Clean Earth Dredging Technologies, Clean Machine Car Wash-Detail, Cleaning Guru, Cleantech, Clear It Out Contr LLC, Clear It Out Contracting LLC, Clevertech, Click Model Management Inc, Clickdaily Inc, Clifford Chance, Clifton Budd & Demaria Llp, Clifton Ornamental Metal & Glass, Cline Davis And Mann LLC, Clinical Pain Advisor, Clinical Resources Network LLC, Clinical Systems Inc, Clinton Management, Clio Awards, Clotho Corp, Cloud 9 Technologies LLC, Cloud Dx, Clove Lakes Health Care And Rehab, Clove Lakes Health Care-Rehab, Clover Wire Forming Co Inc, Club Demonstration Svc, Club Fit, Club Julians Inc, Club Quarters Grand Central, Cluen Corp, Cluster Inc, Cm & Assoc Constr Mgmt LLC, Cm & E Con Inc, Cm Almy Inc, Cmc Rebar, Cmd, Cmem, Cmg Group LLC, Cmgrp, Inc., Cmp Builders Corp Inc., Cmp Healthcare Media and Cmp Publications added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Christophe & Assoc., Christopher Chang Law Offices, Christopher Rosekrans Law, Christopher V Papa Architect, Chromalloy, Chs Services, Chubb, Church, Church Of Christ International, Church Pension Group, Church Street Boxing Gym, Cibc, Cid Construction, Cindy E Levitz Lic Acpnctrst, Cintalta Cons. Corp, Cintra Software & Svc Inc, Circa Brewing Co, Circuit Breaker Sales Ne Inc, Cis, Cision, Citadel Construction Corp, Citadines Connect Fifth Avenue, Citi Wide Harm Reduction, Citibank, National Association, Citigroup Incorporated, Citimed PLLC, Citixsys Technologies, Citizen General Construction Inc, Citizen M Hotel New York, Citnalta Construction Corp, Citrin Cooperman And Company, Llp, Citroen Wolf Communications, City Choice, City Harvest, Inc., City Journal, City M D, City Of Middletown, City Of New York, City Of New York Department Of Parks & Recreation, City Of NY Conflicts Of Intererest, City Of NY Department Of Parks & Recreation Capitalprojects, City Of Yonkers, City Prints LLC, City School District Of New Rochelle, City Sounds Of NY, City Suites LLC, City Translation Ctr, City Univ Of NY Dept Of Design & Mgmt Procurement, City University Of New York, City View Masonry Corp, City Wide Administrative Services, Citybuzz, Cityline Restoration Inc, Cityscape Engineering, Cityscape Obgyn PLLC, Citysights NY, Citywide Data Inc, Citywide Environmental Services LLC, Citywide Maintenance Svc, Citywide Mobile Response Corp., Citywide Sewer & Drain Co, Civcon LLC, Civetta Cousins, Civic Builders Inc, Civic Entertainment Group LLC, Civil Contracting Corp, Cjs Industries Inc, Ckc Maintenance Corp and Cksk added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Diane Gujarati and Magistrate Judge Ramon E. Reyes, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 04/21/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Chinses American Planning, Choice Products, Chosen People Ministries, Christ Church United Methodist Nyc, Christian Cultural Center, Christian Faith Fellowship and Christie's Inc. added. (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14392728 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Albert E. Percy and Percy Jobs and Careers Corporation an IRC 501(c)(3) non-profit, as Class Representatives. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Attachment 1, #3 Declaration) (Kernan, James) (Entered: 04/20/2021)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less