This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/22/2022 at 12:15:18 (UTC).

ALBAZ v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY et al

Case Summary

On 08/23/2022 ALBAZ filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Amy Berman Jackson. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:22-CV-02533

  • Filing Date:

    08/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amy Berman Jackson

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mohammed Jamal Albaz

Defendants

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY

UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES

ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS

UR M. JADDOU

HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE

Irvin Gadson

MATTHEW D. EMRICH

TED H. KIM

CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lewis Jubran

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY served on 9/6/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#12

(#12) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#11

(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/2/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/1/2022. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#10

(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#9

(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TED H. KIM served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#8

(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#7

(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#6

(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. IRVIN GADSON served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#5

(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW D. EMRICH served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#4

(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

#3

(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/2/2022. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

2 #1

Notice and Consent

2 #2

Main Document

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

14 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. CHRISTOPHER A. WRAY served on 9/6/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 9/2/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 11/1/2022. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TED H. KIM served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. IRVIN GADSON served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW D. EMRICH served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 9/1/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 9/2/2022. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 09/07/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/24/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Amy Berman Jackson. (znmg) (Entered: 08/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9462462) filed by Mohammed Jamal Albaz. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 08/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less