This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/14/2020 at 08:55:29 (UTC).

ALAUZEN v. CROWN CASTLE CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 07/16/2020 ALAUZEN filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against CROWN CASTLE CORPORATION. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is William S. Stickman. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-01064

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William S. Stickman

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ROBERTA A. ALAUZEN

Defendant

CROWN CASTLE CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Samuel J. Cordes

Attorney at Rothman Gordon, P.C.

310 Grant Street, 3Rd Floor, Grant Building

Pittsburgh, PA 15219

Defendant Attorney

Philip K. Kontul

Attorney at Ogletree, Deakins, Nash, Smoak & Stewart, P.C.

One Ppg Place, Suite 1900

Pittsburgh, PA 15222

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

RESTRICTED

#4

#5

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE re #3 Waiver of Service Executed. ERROR: Service date on entry did not match date on the document, which generated wrong documented answer due date. CORRECTION: Removed entry from public view since court filed correctly as #5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERTA A. ALAUZEN. CROWN CASTLE CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. This message is for informational purposes only. (jv) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERTA A. ALAUZEN. CROWN CASTLE CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (jv) (Entered: 07/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Philip K. Kontul on behalf of CROWN CASTLE CORPORATION. (Kontul, Philip) (Entered: 07/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERTA A. ALAUZEN. CROWN CASTLE CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Cordes, Samuel) Modified on 7/29/2020 by removing from public view since court filed correctly as #5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by ROBERTA A. ALAUZEN. CROWN CASTLE CORPORATION waiver sent on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (jv). (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Summons Issued as to CROWN CASTLE CORPORATION (jv) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against CROWN CASTLE CORPORATION (Filing fee, including Administrative fee, $400, receipt number APAWDC-5767100), filed by ROBERTA A. ALAUZEN. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (jv) (Entered: 07/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CROWN CASTLE USA INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Samuel J. Cordes