This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 12:01:43 (UTC).

Alatorre v. Blazin Wings, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/08/2019 Alatorre filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Blazin Wings, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is William H. Orrick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:19-CV-07405

  • Filing Date:

    11/08/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William H. Orrick

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hector Alatorre

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant

Blazin Wings, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Chaim Shaun Setareh

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

315 South Beverly Drive, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

William Matthew Pao

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

315 South Beverly Drive, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Alexandra Rochelle McIntosh

Attorney at Setareh Law Group

315 South Beverly Drive, Suite 315

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant Attorneys

Noah Jacob Woods

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

501 W. Broadway, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101-3577

Khatereh Sage Fahimi

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

501 West Broadway, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101-3577

Stacey Eileen James

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, P.C.

501 W. Broadway, Suite 900

San Diego, CA 92101-3577

 

Court Documents

#20

(#20) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/06/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

19 #1

Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording

#19

(#19) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 01/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

#18

(#18) ORDER RELATING CASE TO 3:19cv4608-WHO. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/02/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#17

(#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byHector Alatorre. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

#16

(#16) Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 19--cv--04608--WHO. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 19, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

#15

(#15) ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar re #14 .(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

14 #1

Proposed Order

#14

(#14) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Permit Plaintiff Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re #7 Stipulation filed by Blazin Wings, Inc. and Hector Alatorre. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Woods, Noah) (Filed on 12/16/2019) Modified on 12/17/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/16/2019)

#2

(#2) Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Blazin Wings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc. for Blazin Wings, Inc.. (Woods, Noah) (Filed on 11/8/2019) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Declaration Declaration of Miller

1 #5

Declaration Declaration of Link

1 #4

Declaration Declaration of Woods

1 #3

Exhibit C (Notice of CMC)

1 #2

Exhibit B (Proof of Service)

1 #1

Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint)

#1

(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL to Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1331, 1332, 1441 and 1446 from Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-19-579520, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13871249). Filed by Blazin Wings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Proof of Service), #3 Exhibit C (Notice of CMC), #4 Declaration Declaration of Woods, #5 Declaration Declaration of Link, #6 Declaration Declaration of Miller, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Noah) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/13/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

20 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER - Case Management Conference set for 2/18/2020 02:00 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom 02, 17th Floor. Case Management Statement due by 2/11/2020. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/06/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Orrick for all further proceedings. Judge Jon S. Tigar no longer assigned to case, Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Signed by the Clerk on 01/03/2020. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(ajsS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/3/2020) (Entered: 01/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) ORDER RELATING CASE TO 3:19cv4608-WHO. Signed by Judge William H. Orrick on 01/02/2020. (jmdS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) AMENDED COMPLAINT Second Amended Complaint against All Defendants. Filed byHector Alatorre. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 1/2/2020) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) Judicial Referral for Purpose of Determining Relationship of Cases re 19--cv--04608--WHO. Signed by Judge Jon S. Tigar on December 19, 2019. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2019) (Entered: 12/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION TO PERMIT PLAINTIFF LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Jon S. Tigar re #14 .(mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2019) (Entered: 12/17/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Permit Plaintiff Leave to File Second Amended Complaint re #7 Stipulation filed by Blazin Wings, Inc. and Hector Alatorre. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Woods, Noah) (Filed on 12/16/2019) Modified on 12/17/2019 (jmlS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 12/16/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) CLERK'S NOTICE SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Case Management Statement due by 3/24/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 3/31/2020 02:00 PM in Oakland, Courtroom 6, 2nd Floor. (mllS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2019) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ORDER, Case Reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Jon S. Tigar for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim no longer assigned to the case. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras.. Signed by The Clerk on 12/6/19. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(haS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • (#11) CLERK'S NOTICE OF IMPENDING REASSIGNMENT TO A U.S. DISTRICT COURT JUDGE: The Clerk of this Court will now randomly reassign this case to a District Judge because either (1) a party has not consented to the jurisdiction of a Magistrate Judge, or (2) time is of the essence in deciding a pending judicial action for which the necessary consents to Magistrate Judge jurisdiction have not been secured. You will be informed by separate notice of the district judge to whom this case is reassigned. ALL HEARING DATES PRESENTLY SCHEDULED BEFORE THE CURRENT MAGISTRATE JUDGE ARE VACATED AND SHOULD BE RE-NOTICED FOR HEARING BEFORE THE JUDGE TO WHOM THIS CASE IS REASSIGNED. This is a text only docket entry; there is no document associated with this notice. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Hector Alatorre.. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 12/5/2019) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT; JURY TRIAL DEMANDED against Blazin Wings, Inc.. Filed by Hector Alatorre. (Setareh, Chaim) (Filed on 12/2/2019) (Entered: 12/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 12/13/2019. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms. (mklS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2019) (Entered: 11/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) STIPULATION to Extend Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 6-1 filed by Blazin Wings, Inc.. (Woods, Noah) (Filed on 11/15/2019) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Pilot Program for Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See #General Order 71. Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Joint Case Management Statement du e by 2/3/2020. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/10/2020 at 1:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (tnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2019) (Entered: 11/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) NOTICE of Appearance by Khatereh Sage Fahimi on behalf of Defendant Blazin Wings, Inc. (Fahimi, Khatereh) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey Eileen James on behalf of Defendant Blazin Wings, Inc. (James, Stacey) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • (#3) Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening.Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. Counsel is required to send chambers a copy of the initiating documents pursuant to L.R. 5-1(e)(7). A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/26/2019. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2019) (Entered: 11/12/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Certification of Interested Entities or Persons filed by Blazin Wings, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Buffalo Wild Wings, Inc. for Blazin Wings, Inc.. (Woods, Noah) (Filed on 11/8/2019) (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL to Federal Court Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Sections 1331, 1332, 1441 and 1446 from Superior Court of California, County of San Francisco. Their case number is CGC-19-579520, (Filing Fee: $400.00, receipt number 0971-13871249). Filed by Blazin Wings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Summons and Complaint), #2 Exhibit B (Proof of Service), #3 Exhibit C (Notice of CMC), #4 Declaration Declaration of Woods, #5 Declaration Declaration of Link, #6 Declaration Declaration of Miller, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Woods, Noah) (Filed on 11/8/2019) Modified on 11/13/2019 (tnS, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 11/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.