This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/24/2020 at 09:00:21 (UTC).

Alaska Wildlife Alliance et al v. Bernhardt et al

Case Summary

On 08/25/2020 Alaska Wildlife Alliance filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against Bernhardt. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Alaska District. The Judges overseeing this case are Timothy M. Burgess and Sharon L. Gleason. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00209

  • Filing Date:

    08/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

  • Courthouse:

    Alaska District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Timothy M. Burgess

Sharon L. Gleason

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Alaska Wilderness League

Copper Country Alliance

Alaska Wildlife Alliance

Wilderness Watch

Sierra Club

The Humane Society of the United States

Defenders of Wildlife

Northern Alaska Environmental Center

Center for Biological Diversity

Alaskans for Wildlife

Denali Citizens Council

Coalition to Protect America's National Parks

National Parks Conservation Association

Defendants

George Wallace

David Bernhardt

U.S. Department of the Interior

National Park Service

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Katherine G. Strong

Attorney at Trustees for Alaska

1026 W. 4Th Avenue Suite 201

Anchorage, AK 99501

Brian Litmans

Attorney at Trustees for Alaska

1026 W. 4Th Avenue Suite 201

Anchorage, AK 99501

Defendant Attorney

Michael S. Sawyer

Attorney at U.S. Department of Justice

P.O. Box 7611

Washington, DC 20044-7611

 

Court Documents

9 #1

Proposed Order

#9

(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Administrative Record by David Bernhardt, National Park Service, U.S. Department of the Interior, George Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sawyer, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

8 #4

Receipt of Service AUSA

8 #2

Affidavit National Park Service Summons

8 #1

Affidavit Department of the Interior Summons

#8

(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaskans for Wildlife, Denali Citizens Council, Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Coalition to Protect America's National Parks, Copper Country Alliance, The Humane Society of the United States, National Parks Conservation Association, Alaska Wilderness League, Sierra Club, Wilderness Watch, Defenders of Wildlife, Center for Biological Diversity, Northern Alaska Environmental Center. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Department of the Interior Summons, #2 Affidavit National Park Service Summons, #3 Affidavit Wallace Summons, #4 Receipt of Service AUSA)(Strong, Katherine) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

#6

(#6) Unissued summons re Defendant National Park Service, (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

5 #2

Unissued Summons re Defendant Wallace

5 #1

Unissued Summons re Defendant Bernhardt

#5

(#5) Unissued summons re Defendant Department of Interior, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Bernhardt, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Wallace)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#3

(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Wilderness League, Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Alaskans for Wildlife, Center for Biological Diversity, Coalition to Protect America's National Parks, Copper Country Alliance, Defenders of Wildlife, Denali Citizens Council, National Parks Conservation Association, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Sierra Club, The Humane Society of the United States, Wilderness Watch. (Strong, Katherine) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

2 #1

Civil Cover Sheet Attachment

#2

(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Strong, Katherine) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2928469.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Strong, Katherine) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading and Administrative Record by David Bernhardt, National Park Service, U.S. Department of the Interior, George Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Sawyer, Michael) (Entered: 10/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Alaskans for Wildlife, Denali Citizens Council, Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Coalition to Protect America's National Parks, Copper Country Alliance, The Humane Society of the United States, National Parks Conservation Association, Alaska Wilderness League, Sierra Club, Wilderness Watch, Defenders of Wildlife, Center for Biological Diversity, Northern Alaska Environmental Center. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Department of the Interior Summons, #2 Affidavit National Park Service Summons, #3 Affidavit Wallace Summons, #4 Receipt of Service AUSA)(Strong, Katherine) (Entered: 09/25/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2020
  • Docket(#7) TMB TEXT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE: By agreement of the judges, the above referenced case is hereby reassigned to the Honorable Sharon L. Gleason for all further proceedings. Please use the following case number on all future filings: 3:20-cv-00209-SLG. (JDS, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 09/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to National Park Service (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Unissued summons re Defendant National Park Service, (LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • DocketSummons Issued as to U.S. Department of the Interior, George Wallace, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (LMH, COURT STAFF) Modified on 8/26/2020 to remove plaintiff's name and regenerate(LMH, COURT STAFF). (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Unissued summons re Defendant Department of Interior, (Attachments: #1 Unissued Summons re Defendant Bernhardt, #2 Unissued Summons re Defendant Wallace)(LMH, COURT STAFF) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Related Cases by Alaska Wilderness League, Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Alaskans for Wildlife, Center for Biological Diversity, Coalition to Protect America's National Parks, Copper Country Alliance, Defenders of Wildlife, Denali Citizens Council, National Parks Conservation Association, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Sierra Club, The Humane Society of the United States, Wilderness Watch (Strong, Katherine) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alaska Wilderness League, Alaska Wildlife Alliance, Alaskans for Wildlife, Center for Biological Diversity, Coalition to Protect America's National Parks, Copper Country Alliance, Defenders of Wildlife, Denali Citizens Council, National Parks Conservation Association, Northern Alaska Environmental Center, Sierra Club, The Humane Society of the United States, Wilderness Watch. (Strong, Katherine) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment)(Strong, Katherine) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT For Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 097--2928469.), filed by All Plaintiffs.(Strong, Katherine) (Entered: 08/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COPPER COUNTRY ALLIANCE is a litigant

Latest cases where NORTHERN ALASKA ENVIRONMENTAL CENTER is a litigant