This case was last updated from PACER on 11/21/2021 at 07:08:41 (UTC).

Maria Alarcon v. C R Bard Incorporated et al

Case Summary

On 09/22/2021 Maria Alarcon filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against C R Bard Incorporated. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Otis D. Wright, II, Jacqueline Chooljian, Michael W. Fitzgerald and Maria A. Audero. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-07582

  • Filing Date:

    09/22/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Otis D. Wright, II

Michael W. Fitzgerald

Referral Judges

Jacqueline Chooljian

Maria A. Audero

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Maria Alarcon

Defendants

Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated

C R Bard Incorporated

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Ben C. Martin

Attorney at Martin Baughman PLLC

3141 Hood Street, Suite 600

Dallas, TX 75219

Defendant Attorneys

Richard B. North, Jr.

Attorney at Nelson Mullins Riley and Scarborough LLC

201 - 17Th Street Nw Suite 1700

Atlanta, GA 30363

Daniell K Newman

Attorney at Greenberg Traurig LLP

1840 Century Park East Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2121

 

Court Documents

#19

(#19) ORDER OF DISMISSAL #18 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Defendants are hereby dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above numbered and captioned cause is closed. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

18 #1

Proposed Order

18 #18

Main Document

#17

(#17) ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #14 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The request of C. R. Bard, Inc.; Bard Peripheral Vascular to substitute Daniell K. Newman as attorney of record instead of Richard North is GRANTED. (iv) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

#15

(#15) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-01945 MWF(PJWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07582 MWF(MAAx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

14 #1

Proposed Order Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Counsel

14 #14

Main Document

#13

(#13) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, identifying Becton, Dickinson and Company. (Newman, Daniell) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#12

(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniell K Newman counsel for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Adding Daniell K. Newman as counsel of record for C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Attorney Daniell K Newman added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Daniell K Newman added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Newman, Daniell) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

#11

(#11) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard B North, Jr. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#9

(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#8

(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

#7

(#7) NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:17-cv-00197, from USDC Arizona, Phoenix. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:21-cv-07582 ODW (JCx). (jtil) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

6 #1

*Restricted*

6 #6

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#4

#3

1 #1

Main Document

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ORDER OF DISMISSAL #18 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs claims against Defendants are hereby dismissed with prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the above numbered and captioned cause is closed. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (iv) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Maria Alarcon. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Baughman, Laura) (Entered: 11/10/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) ORDER ON REQUEST FOR APPROVAL OF SUBSTITUTION OR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY #14 by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. The request of C. R. Bard, Inc.; Bard Peripheral Vascular to substitute Daniell K. Newman as attorney of record instead of Richard North is GRANTED. (iv) (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. All motions and hearings previously scheduled, prior to being reassigned to Judge Fitzgerald, are VACATED. This Court will reset the hearing/motions at a later date. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (rs) TEXT ONLY ENTRY (Entered: 10/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 21-01-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:15-cv-01945 MWF(PJWx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Otis D. Wright, II to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:21-cv-07582 MWF(MAAx). Signed by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald (rn) (Entered: 09/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) REQUEST TO SUBSTITUTE ATTORNEY Daniell K. Newman in place of attorney Richard B. North filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Request for Approval of Substitution of Counsel) (Newman, Daniell) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated, identifying Becton, Dickinson and Company. (Newman, Daniell) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniell K Newman counsel for Defendants Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated, C R Bard Incorporated. Adding Daniell K. Newman as counsel of record for C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants C. R. Bard, Inc. and Bard Peripheral Vascular, Inc.. (Attorney Daniell K Newman added to party Bard Peripheral Vascular Incorporated(pty:dft), Attorney Daniell K Newman added to party C R Bard Incorporated(pty:dft))(Newman, Daniell) (Entered: 09/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Richard B North, Jr. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Ben C Martin. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (jtil) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (jtil) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:17-cv-00197, from USDC Arizona, Phoenix. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:21-cv-07582 ODW (JCx). (jtil) (Entered: 09/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from Arizona (Entered: 09/23/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketRemark: Transferring Case to the Central District of California by electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/23/2021.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) TRANSFER ORDER Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a), the Clerk of this District is directed to transfer Alarcon v. C. R. Bard, Inc., No. CV-17-00197, to the Central District of California, Los Angeles Division, for further proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/22/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/23/2021.] (Entered: 09/22/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Vacating the Court's Order in part, Doc. #3 (Doc. 21461, in lead MDL-15-2641) as it relates to member case CV-17-0197-PHX-DGC. The Clerk's Office is directed to reopen member case: CV-17-197-PHX-DGC.re: #3 Order Dismissing Case. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 9/20/21. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/23/2021.] (Entered: 09/20/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER Addressing Cases with Service of Process and Plaintiff Profile Form Issues, Cases for Which No Federal Jurisdiction Exists, and Duplicate Cases. FURTHER ORDERED Dismissing this Case as Duplicative. Signed by Senior Judge David G Campbell on 3/4/20. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/23/2021.] (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • Docket(#2) This case has been assigned to the Honorable David G. Campbell, with member case number: CV-17-197-PHX-DGC. This case is included in MDL-2641. All future pleadings or documents should be filed in the Lead Case: 2:15-md-2641-DGC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) [Transferred from Arizona on 9/23/2021.] (Entered: 01/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) *COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-13832296 filed by Maria Alarcon. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MAP) *Modified on 1/23/2017 to correct file date (MAP)*. [Transferred from Arizona on 9/23/2021.] (Entered: 01/23/2017)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BARD PERIPHERAL VASCULAR, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C.R. Bard, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Daniell K Newman

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Richard B North, Jr