This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 08/10/2021 at 08:41:16 (UTC).

Alanis Logistics, Inc. v JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Case Summary

On 06/11/2021 Alanis Logistics, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against JPMorgan Chase Bank, N A. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Micaela Alvarez. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    7:21-CV-00235

  • Filing Date:

    06/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Micaela Alvarez

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alanis Logistics, Inc.

Defendant

JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Harold K Tummel

Attorney at Tummel & Casso

7001 North 10Th Street, Suite 201

Mcallen, TX 78504

Defendant Attorneys

Charles C Murray

Attorney at Atlas & Hall

818 Pecan

Mcallen, TX 78504

Adriana H Cardenas

Attorney at Atlas, Hall & Rodriguez, LLP

Po Drawer 3725

Mcallen, TX 78502

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Exhibit D1

1 #5

Exhibit D2

1 #6

Exhibit D3

1 #7

Exhibit D4

1 #8

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#4

#5

#6

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) SCHEDULING ORDER. (Pltf Expert Report due by 11/29/2021. Deft Expert Report due by 12/29/2021. Discovery due by 1/28/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 2/18/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/19/2022. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2022 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez), (Signed by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(klopez, 7) (Entered: 07/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Cardenas, Adriana) (Entered: 07/09/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., filed.(Cardenas, Adriana) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Alanis Logistics, Inc., filed.(Tummel, Harold) (Entered: 06/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 7/20/2021 at 09:00 AM before Judge Micaela Alvarez(by Judge Micaela Alvarez) Parties notified.(JenniferNogueira, 7) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 464th District Court, case number C-1815-21-L (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0541-26585556) filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D1, #5 Exhibit D2, #6 Exhibit D3, #7 Exhibit D4, #8 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cardenas, Adriana) (Entered: 06/11/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where JPMorgan Chase Bank NA is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Harold Kenneth Tummel