This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/24/2022 at 07:45:05 (UTC).

Alani Trade, LLC v. Blackboard Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 Alani Trade, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against Blackboard Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Paul G. Byron and Embry J. Kidd. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00600

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Paul G. Byron

Referral Judge

Embry J. Kidd

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Alani Trade, LLC

Defendant

Blackboard Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jacob Douglas

908 W. Horatio Street

Tampa, FL 33606

Barbara M. Hernando

Attorney at Makris & Mullinax, P.A.

908 W. Horatio St..

Tampa, FL 33606

Jacob Paul Douglas

Attorney at Makris & Mullinax, P.A.

908 W. Horatio St.

Tampa, FL 33606

Matthew Kenneth Mullinax

Attorney at Makris & Mullinax, P.A.

908 W. Horatio St.

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorneys

Gabrielle Mercadante

Attorney at Robinson & Cole, LLP

777 Brickell Ave., Ste 680

Miami, FL 33131

Eugene P. Murphy

Attorney at Robinson & Cole LLP

777 Brickell Avenue, Suite 680

Miami, FL 33131

 

Court Documents

#15

(#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of Court for the Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida. Thereafter, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/10/2022. (CPH) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

#14

(#14) RESPONSE and Non-Objection to #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Blackboard Insurance Company. (Murphy, Eugene) Modified on 4/28/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#13

(#13) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Alani Trade, LLC. (Hernando, Barbara) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

#12

(#12) ORDER for Jacob Douglas to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/1/2022. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 04/01/2022)

11 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 Policy

#11

(#11) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Blackboard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Policy)(Murphy, Eugene) Modified on 4/4/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 04/01/2022)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Order by Blackboard Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Blackboard US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Rafid Al Ani, Other Affiliate Ban Al Qadhi, Other Affiliate Mohammed Rafid Has Al Ani, Other Affiliate Ahmed Rafid Hasan Al Ani for Blackboard Insurance Company. (Mercadante, Gabrielle) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Blackboard Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Mercadante, Gabrielle) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Alani Trade, LLC. Related case(s): No (Hernando, Barbara) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#7

(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Order by Alani Trade, LLC. (Hernando, Barbara) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

#6

(#6) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/28/2022. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#5

(#5) ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/28/2022. (PML) ctp (Entered: 03/28/2022)

4 #1

State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket sheet

1 #5

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #4

Affidavit Declaration

1 #3

State Court Other Documents

1 #2

State Court Docket Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 9th Judicial Circuit, case number 2022-CA-001462-O filed in State Court on 2/18/22. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19384004 filed by Blackboard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Affidavit Declaration, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mercadante, Gabrielle) Modified on 3/25/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 03/25/2022)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER granting #13 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to send a certified copy of this Order to the Clerk of Court for the Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Orange County, Florida. Thereafter, the Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 5/10/2022. (CPH) (Entered: 05/10/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) RESPONSE and Non-Objection to #13 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Blackboard Insurance Company. (Murphy, Eugene) Modified on 4/28/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) MOTION to Remand to State Court by Alani Trade, LLC. (Hernando, Barbara) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) ORDER for Jacob Douglas to comply with the administrative procedures regarding electronic filing within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 4/1/2022. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Blackboard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Policy)(Murphy, Eugene) Modified on 4/4/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 04/01/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Order by Blackboard Insurance Company identifying Other Affiliate American International Group, Inc., Other Affiliate Blackboard Specialty Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Blackboard US Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Rafid Al Ani, Other Affiliate Ban Al Qadhi, Other Affiliate Mohammed Rafid Has Al Ani, Other Affiliate Ahmed Rafid Hasan Al Ani for Blackboard Insurance Company. (Mercadante, Gabrielle) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Blackboard Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Mercadante, Gabrielle) (Entered: 03/31/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Alani Trade, LLC. Related case(s): No (Hernando, Barbara) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re #6 Order by Alani Trade, LLC. (Hernando, Barbara) (Entered: 03/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) INITIAL ORDER re: Case Management and Deadlines. Signed by Judge Paul G. Byron on 3/28/2022. (GNB) ctp (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER ON DISCOVERY MOTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd on 3/28/2022. (PML) ctp (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Filing State Court Docket Sheet by Blackboard Insurance Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (Attachments: #1 State Court Docket Sheet State Court Docket sheet)(Murphy, Eugene) Modified on 3/28/2022 (RDO). (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE to counsel Jacob Douglas of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Paul G. Byron and Magistrate Judge Embry J. Kidd. New case number: 6:22-cv-0600-PGB-EJK. (SJB) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 9th Judicial Circuit, case number 2022-CA-001462-O filed in State Court on 2/18/22. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19384004 filed by Blackboard Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 State Court Complaint, #2 State Court Docket Sheet, #3 State Court Other Documents, #4 Affidavit Declaration, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mercadante, Gabrielle) Modified on 3/25/2022 to correct docket text (BD). (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BLACKBOARD INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gabrielle R Mercadante

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EUGENE P MURPHY