This case was last updated from PACER on 02/11/2020 at 07:45:09 (UTC).

Alam v. Barr et al

Case Summary

On 12/13/2019 Alam filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Barr. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Pamela K. Chen and Rachel P. Kovner. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07005

  • Filing Date:

    12/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Pamela K. Chen

Rachel P. Kovner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MD Morshed Alam

Defendants

Attorney General William Barr

United States Bureau of Consular Affairs

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

Jane Does 1-10

John Does 1-10

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Ken Cuccinelli

Kevin McAleenan

ABC Agency 1-10

USCIS Texas Service Center

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Khagendra Gharti-Chhetry

Attorney at Chhetry & Associates,P.C.

363 Seventh Avenue Suite 1500

New York, NY 10001

Defendant Attorney

Matthew Mailloux

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office, E.D.N.Y.

271-A Cadman Plaza East, 7Th Flr.

Brooklyn, NY 11201

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 2/6/2020. (Liss, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

#7

(#7) CLERK'S JUDGMENT: An Order of Honorable Rachel P. Kovner, United States District Judge, having been filed on February 6, 2020, dismissing this action with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and fees; it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and fees. Signed by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 2/7/2020. (Love, Alexis) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#4

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CLERK'S JUDGMENT: An Order of Honorable Rachel P. Kovner, United States District Judge, having been filed on February 6, 2020, dismissing this action with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and fees; it is ORDERED and ADJUDGED that this action is dismissed with prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and fees. Signed by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on behalf of Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court on 2/7/2020. (Love, Alexis) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Ordered by Judge Rachel P. Kovner on 2/6/2020. (Liss, Jeremy) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice, respectfully submitted for the Court's endorsement by ABC Agency 1-10, William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, USCIS Texas Service Center, United States Bureau of Consular Affairs (Mailloux, Matthew) (Entered: 02/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2020
  • DocketCase Reassigned to Judge Rachel P. Kovner. Judge Pamela K. Chen no longer assigned to the case. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Mahoney, Brenna) (Entered: 01/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Mailloux on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Mailloux, Matthew) (Entered: 12/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • FILING FEE: $ 400.00, receipt number 4653146395 (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to William Barr, Ken Cuccinelli, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, USCIS Texas Service Center, United States Bureau of Consular Affairs, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -no,, filed by Morshed Alam. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Bowens, Priscilla) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.