This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 03/10/2023 at 07:25:48 (UTC).

Aladawi et al v. US Attorney General et al

Case Summary

On 01/09/2023 Aladawi filed an Immigration - Naturalization lawsuit against US Attorney General. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are Gershwin A. Drain and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:23-CV-10058

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Naturalization

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Gershwin A. Drain

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Ban Dyaa Mahmood Aladawi

Lana S Khaleel

Respondents

US Attorney General

US Attorney

US Secretary of State

Federal Bureau of Investigations, Director of

US Citizenship and Immigration Service, Director of

US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary of

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Remond A. Atie

 

Court Documents

#1

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#2

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

#3

DOCUMENT UNAVAILABLE

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/12/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. U.S. Attorney on behalf of US Attorney served on 1/12/2023, answer due 3/13/2023. (Atie, Remond) (Entered: 01/12/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for *Federal Bureau of Investigations, Director of, US Attorney, US Attorney General, US Citizenship and Immigration Service, Director of, US Department of Homeland Security, Secretary of, US Secretary of State* (NAhm) (Entered: 01/10/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Petition for Writ of Mandamus filed by All Plaintiffs against All Defendants. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9189402 - Fee: 402 dollars. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Macomb - County of 1st Defendant: Washington DC. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): None] (Atie, Remond) (Entered: 01/09/2023)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less