This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/27/2023 at 10:12:25 (UTC).

Alabrash et al v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 11/28/2022 Alabrash filed an Other - Administrative Procedure Act lawsuit against United States Department of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Amos L. Mazzant, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-01004

  • Filing Date:

    11/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Administrative Procedure Act

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Amos L. Mazzant, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MOHAMAD HAZEM ALABRASH

OLA NONA ALABRASH

Defendants

United States Department of Homeland Security

United States Citizenship and Immigration Services

Alejandro Mayorkas

Ted H. Kim

HOUSTON ASYLUM OFFICE

MARIE HUMMERT

MATTHEW D. EMRICH

Director Christopher A. Wray

Ur M. Jaddou

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Lewis G Jubran

 

Court Documents

#23

(#23) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lewis G Jubran on behalf of Mohamad Hazem Alabrash, Ola Nona Alabrash. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9245646. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

22 #1

*Restricted*

22 #22

Main Document Public Docket Sheet

#21

(#21) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MOHAMAD HAZEM ALABRASH, OLA NONA ALABRASH (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 11/23/2022)

#20

(#20) MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying #19 Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/15/22. (lcckk3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 11/15/2022)

#19

(#20) MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying #19 Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/15/22. (lcckk3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 11/15/2022)

1 #12

Summons

1 #11

Summons

1 #10

Summons

1 #9

Summons

1 #8

Summons

1 #7

Summons

1 #5

Summons

1 #4

Summons

1 #3

Summons

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Main Document

25 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance - Pro Hac Vice by Lewis G Jubran on behalf of Mohamad Hazem Alabrash, Ola Nona Alabrash. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number ATXEDC-9245646. (Jubran, Lewis) (Entered: 11/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketNote: Pursuant to Local Rule CV 7(j), any motions pending in another federal or state court made by any party will be considered moot at the time of transfer or removal unless they are re-urged in this court. (mmc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket***ATTORNEY PATRICIA K MCBRIDE NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN TXED - ATTORNEY ADMISSION INFORMATION SENT VIA EMAIL*** Notified Attorney, PATRICIA K. MCBRIDE, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. (mmc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • Docket***ATTORNEY LEWIS JUBRAN NOT ADMITTED TO PRACTICE IN TXED - ATTORNEY ADMISSION INFORMATION SENT VIA EMAIL*** Notified Attorney, LEWIS JUBRAN, Per GO 04-12, this court no longer accepts pleadings in paper form. The Clerk will no longer mail or fax notices or orders to parties. All notices and orders generated by this court shall be sent electronically. (mmc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketIn accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form #Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge. (mmc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to District Judge Amos L. Mazzant, III. (mmc) (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Case transferred in from District of District of Columbia; Case Number 1:22-cv-01875. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/28/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by MOHAMAD HAZEM ALABRASH, OLA NONA ALABRASH (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 11/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketSet/Reset Deadlines: Transfer due by 11/28/2022. (dot) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 11/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) MEMORANDUM OPINION accompanying #19 Order. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/15/22. (lcckk3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 11/15/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. ALEJANDRO MAYORKAS served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TED H. KIM served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UR M. JADDOU served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MARIE HUMMERT served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. MATTHEW D. EMRICH served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF HOMELAND SECURITY served on 7/5/2022 (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 07/05/2022. (Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 07/06/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS (11) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zmh) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (zmh) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/30/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-9340241) filed by OLA NONA ALABRASH, MOHAMAD HAZEM ALABRASH. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Jubran, Lewis) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 11/28/2022.] (Entered: 06/29/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less