This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2020 at 07:52:11 (UTC).

al-Suyid et al v. Hifter et al

Case Summary

On 02/18/2020 al-Suyid filed an Other lawsuit against Hifter. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Virginia Eastern District Court. The Judges overseeing this case are John F. Anderson and Leonie M. Brinkema. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-00170

  • Filing Date:

    02/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

Judge Details

Referral Judge

John F. Anderson

Presiding Judge

Leonie M. Brinkema

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Abdalla al-Krshiny

Ibrahim al-Krshiny

Mahmud al-Krshiny

Ahmad al-Krshiny

Muna al-Suyid

Defendants

Khalifa Hifter

Khalid Hifter

Saddam Hifter

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kevin Thomas Carroll

 

Court Documents

#22

#21

#20

19 #1

Notice

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) Affidavit of service Returned Executed for Alias Summons by Mahmud al-Krshiny, Abdalla al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny, as to Saddam Hifter served on 3/14/20, answer due 4/6/2020 (Carroll, Kevin) Modified text on 3/23/2020 (klau, ). (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) Affidavit of service Returned Executed for Alias Summons by Mahmud al-Krshiny, Abdalla al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny, as to Khalid Hifter served on 3/14/2020, answer due 4/6/2020 (Carroll, Kevin) Modified text on 3/23/2020 (klau, ). (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Affidavit of service Returned Executed for Alias Summons by Mahmud al-Krshiny, Abdalla al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny, as to Khalifa Hifter served on 3/14/2020, answer due 4/6/2020 (Carroll, Kevin) Modified text on 3/23/2020 (klau, ). (Entered: 03/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) ALIAS Summons Issued for service by SPS as to Khalid Hifter, Khalifa Hifter, Saddam Hifter. NOTICE TO ATTORNEY: Print out two electronically issued summons and one copy of the attachments for each defendant to be served with the complaint. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(klau, ) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) Proposed Summons as to Saddam Hifter by Abdalla al-Krshiny, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny, Mahmud al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid. (Carroll, Kevin) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Proposed Summons as to Khalid Hifter by Abdalla al-Krshiny, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny, Mahmud al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid. (Carroll, Kevin) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Proposed Summons as to Khalifa Hifter by Abdalla al-Krshiny, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny, Mahmud al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid. (Carroll, Kevin) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Mahmud al-Krshiny, Abdalla al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny as to Saddam Hifter. (Carroll, Kevin) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Mahmud al-Krshiny, Abdalla al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny as to Khalid Hifter. (Carroll, Kevin) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Summons Returned Unexecuted by Mahmud al-Krshiny, Abdalla al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny as to Khalifa Hifter. (Carroll, Kevin) (Entered: 03/09/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Proposed Summons as to Defendant Khalid Hifter by Abdalla al-Krshiny, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny, Mahmud al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid. (Cummings, William) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons as to Defendant Khalifa Hifter by Abdalla al-Krshiny, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny, Mahmud al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid. (Cummings, William) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice of Correction re #5 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons, #6 Proposed Summons, The filing user has been notified that document is an incorrectly saved PDF fillable form and has been removed. The filing user was directed to refile the document. (klau, ) (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Document filed in error and removed re Proposed Summons as to Defendant Saddam Hifter by Abdalla al-Krshiny, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny, Mahmud al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid. (Cummings, William) (Main Document 6 replaced on 2/21/2020) (klau, ). Modified text on 2/21/2020 (klau, ). (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Document filed in error and removed re Proposed Summons as to Defendant Khalid Hifter by Abdalla al-Krshiny, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny, Mahmud al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid. (Cummings, William) (Main Document 5 replaced on 2/21/2020) (klau, ). Modified text on 2/21/2020 (klau, ). (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Document filed in error and removed re Proposed Summons as to Defendant Khalifa Hifter by Abdalla al-Krshiny, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny, Mahmud al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid. (Cummings, William) (Main Document 4 replaced on 2/21/2020) (klau, ). Modified text on 2/21/2020 (klau, ). (Entered: 02/21/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Motion for Pro hac vice. Signed by District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema on 2/20/2020. (rban, ) (Entered: 02/20/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice by Joseph George Grasso and Certification of Local Counsel William B. Cimmings Filing fee $ 75, receipt number 0422-7080824. by Abdalla al-Krshiny, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny, Mahmud al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid. (Cummings, William) (Entered: 02/19/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • DocketInitial Case Assignment to District Judge Leonie M. Brinkema and Magistrate Judge John F. Anderson. (klau, ) (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Complaint with Jury Demand against Khlifa Hifter, Khalid Hifter, Saddam Hifter ( Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0422-7078755.), filed by Abdalla al-Krshiny, Ahmad al-Krshiny, Ibrahim al-Krshiny, Mahmud al-Krshiny, Muna al-Suyid, . (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cummings, William) Modified text on 2/19/2020 (klau, ). (Main Document 1 replaced on 2/19/2020) (klau, ). (Entered: 02/18/2020)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less