This case was last updated from PACER on 10/23/2021 at 05:48:42 (UTC).

Al Sormi et al v. Chad Wolf et al

Case Summary

On 10/12/2021 Al Sormi filed an Immigration - Other Immigration lawsuit against Chad Wolf. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are Cormac J. Carney and Douglas F. McCormick. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-01661

  • Filing Date:

    10/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Other Immigration

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Cormac J. Carney

Referral Judge

Douglas F. McCormick

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Ali Al Sormi

Abeer Al Sormi

Respondents

Chad Wolf

Kenneth Cuccinelli

Acting Director Lee Bowles

Director Susan Quintana

Alejandro Mayorkas

Director Ur Jaddou

Kathy Baran

California Service Center

U.S. Department of Homeland Security

U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Merrick Garland

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Julie A Goldberg

Attorney at Goldberg & Associates

5586 Broadway, Third Floor

Bronx, NY 10463

Eric Hisey

Attorney at Goldberg & Associates

5586 Broadway, Third Floor

Bronx, NY 10463

Respondent Attorneys

Kirti Vaidya Reddy

U.S. Attorney'S Office, Sdny (Chambers Street), 86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

Joshua Evan Kahane

Attorney at U.S. Attorney Office SDNY

86 Chambers Street

New York, NY 10007

 

Court Documents

#1

#2

RESTRICTED

#3

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from New York Southern (Entered: 10/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketCASE TRANSFERRED OUT ELECTRONICALLY from the U.S.D.C. Southern District of New York to the United States District Court - District of Central District of California.(ama) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) TRANSFER ORDER: granting #6 Motion to Change Venue. The Court respectfully directs the Clerk of Court to transfer this action to the United States District Court for the Central District of California and to terminate the motion, Doc. 6. A summons shall not issue from this Court. This order closes this action in this Court. The Court also respectfully directs the Clerk of Court to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket.The Court certifies, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a)(3), that any appeal from this order would not be taken in good faith, and therefore in forma pauperis status is denied for the purpose of an appeal. See Coppedge v. United States, 369 U.S. 438, 444-45 (1962). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 10/06/2021) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 10/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CONSENT MOTION to Change Venue . Document filed by Abeer Al Sormi, Ali Al Sormi..(Goldberg, Julie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 10/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Evan Kahane on behalf of Kathy Baran, California Service Center, Merrick Garland, Ur Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, U.S. Department of Homeland Security..(Kahane, Joshua) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Alejandro Mayorkas, Ur Jaddou, Kathy Baran, California Service Center, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Merrick Garland.Document filed by Ali Al Sormi, Abeer Al Sormi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - F, #2 Exhibit G- M).(Goldberg, Julie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 09/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER granting #2 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Granted. Plaintiffs' deadline to file an amended complaint is now September 17, 2021, and Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to the complaint is now November 18, 2021. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion. Doc. 2. So ordered. Amended Pleadings due by 9/17/2021. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 8/2/2021) (vfr) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 08/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Edgardo Ramos from Julie Goldberg dated July 30, 2021. Document filed by Abeer Al Sormi, Ali Al Sormi..(Goldberg, Julie) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/30/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketCase Designated ECF. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketMagistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf. (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ORDER (SEE ORIGINAL ORDER IN CASE 18-CV-508 DOC #100)The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to sever the instant suit into three actions: the Altowaiti Family (Jamal Altowaiti, Amani Tahir Altowaiti, M.A (1), J.A. (1), J.A. (2), and J.A. (3)); the Assaidi Family (Wejdan Assaidi and Majed Al-Saidi); and the Al Sormi Family (Ali Al Sormi and Abeer Al Sormi). Plaintiffs in each action are directed to file an amended complaint by August 3, 2021, asserting only claims arising from the I-130 petitions submitted on behalf of their respective family members. Defendants are directed to file an answer or otherwise respond to those amended complaints by October 4, 2021. (Signed by Judge Edgardo Ramos on 7/12/2021) (Entered: 07/13/2021) (gp) [Transferred from New York Southern on 10/13/2021.] (Entered: 07/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where US Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases where US Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kirti Vaidya Reddy

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Joshua Kahane Esq.