This case was last updated from PACER on 10/21/2019 at 07:23:30 (UTC).

Al-Rahman v. American Sugar Refining, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 08/22/2019 a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination case was filed by Al-Rahman against American Sugar Refining, Inc in the jurisdiction of U.S. District Courts, New York Southern District.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07886

  • Filing Date:

    08/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Southern District

Judge Details

Denise L. Cote

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Yusuf Al-Rahman

Defendants

American Sugar Refining, Inc.

Dennis Angone

Kevin Ramsey

Jori Cloud

Michael Burchell

 

Court Documents

#16

(#16) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Dennis Angone served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

#3

(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dennis Angone, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#8

No Description Available

#20

(#20) NOTICE of OF SERVICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND INDIVIDUAL RULES OF PRACTICE. Document filed by American Sugar Refining, Inc., Dennis Angone, Michael Burchell, Jori Cloud, Kevin Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sivitz, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#6

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin Ramsey, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#19

(#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca J Sivitz on behalf of American Sugar Refining, Inc., Dennis Angone, Michael Burchell, Jori Cloud, Kevin Ramsey. (Sivitz, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

#5

(#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jori Cloud, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#21

(#21) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Michael Burchell served on 9/21/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. Service was accepted by Betty Kestin. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Correa, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

#10

No Description Available

#14

(#14) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. American Sugar Refining, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Service was accepted by Michael Newman. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

#7

(#7) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#1

(#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin Ramsey, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

#9

No Description Available

20 #1

Exhibit A

#12

(#12) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Burchell. (pc) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

#17

(#17) ORDER granting #15 Defendants Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/25/2019) (gr) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

#15

(#15) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Rebecca J. Sivitz dated 9/24/2019. Document filed by American Sugar Refining, Inc., Dennis Angone, Michael Burchell, Jori Cloud, Kevin Ramsey.(Sivitz, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#21) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Michael Burchell served on 9/21/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. Service was accepted by Betty Kestin. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Correa, Stephanie) (Entered: 10/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#20) NOTICE of OF SERVICE OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE NOTICE AND INDIVIDUAL RULES OF PRACTICE. Document filed by American Sugar Refining, Inc., Dennis Angone, Michael Burchell, Jori Cloud, Kevin Ramsey. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sivitz, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#19) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Rebecca J Sivitz on behalf of American Sugar Refining, Inc., Dennis Angone, Michael Burchell, Jori Cloud, Kevin Ramsey. (Sivitz, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#18) NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE (Notice) Initial Conference set for 12/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 18B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Denise L. Cote. (Please follow the procedures set forth in the Notice.) (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/26/2019) (gr) (Entered: 09/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#17) ORDER granting #15 Defendants Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. (Signed by Judge Denise L. Cote on 9/25/2019) (gr) (Entered: 09/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#16) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Dennis Angone served on 9/16/2019, answer due 10/7/2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#15) LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Denise L. Cote from Rebecca J. Sivitz dated 9/24/2019. Document filed by American Sugar Refining, Inc., Dennis Angone, Michael Burchell, Jori Cloud, Kevin Ramsey.(Sivitz, Rebecca) (Entered: 09/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#14) AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. American Sugar Refining, Inc. served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Service was accepted by Michael Newman. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 09/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#13) NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Stephanie Rose Correa on behalf of Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Correa, Stephanie) (Entered: 08/28/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Michael Burchell. (pc) (Entered: 08/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2019
  • Case Designated ECF. (pc) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2019
  • CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Denise L. Cote. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc) (Entered: 08/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kevin Ramsey, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jori Cloud, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Michael Burchell, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Dennis Angone, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to American Sugar Refining, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman. (Sells, Derek) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against American Sugar Refining, Inc., Dennis Angone, Michael Burchell, Jori Cloud, Kevin Ramsey. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17477457)Document filed by Yusuf Al-Rahman.(Sells, Derek) (Entered: 08/22/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.