This case was last updated from PACER on 03/06/2020 at 07:27:22 (UTC).

Al-Pine v. U.S. Supreme Court Clerk

Case Summary

On 01/06/2020 Al-Pine filed a Prisoner - Mandamus lawsuit against U S Supreme Court Clerk. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are William Alsup and PSLC JNE. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    3:20-CV-00125

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Mandamus

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    California Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

William Alsup

Referral Judge

PSLC JNE

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Charles Al-Pine

Iowa Park, TX 76367

Respondent

U.S. Supreme Court Clerk

 

Court Documents

#4

(#4) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 01/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#3

(#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 01/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#6

(#6) Received Document: Affidavit by Charles Al-Pine. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

4 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Charles Al-Pine. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

#2

(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 2/13/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

3 #1

Certificate/Proof of Service

#1

(#1) PETITION against U.S. Supreme Court Clerk ( Filing fee $400 DUE ). Filed byCharles Al-Pine. (Attachments: #1 exhibits, #2 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

1 #2

Envelope

6 #1

Envelope

5 #1

Envelope

1 #1

exhibits

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Received Document: Affidavit by Charles Al-Pine. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2020) (Entered: 02/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Charles Al-Pine. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2020) (Entered: 01/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 01/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 01/23/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(tmiS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2020) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 2/13/2020. (amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) PETITION against U.S. Supreme Court Clerk ( Filing fee $400 DUE ). Filed byCharles Al-Pine. (Attachments: #1 exhibits, #2 Envelope)(amgS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2020) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.