This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/18/2022 at 08:21:02 (UTC).

Al Khateeb v. Secretary of Homeland Security et al

Case Summary

On 02/17/2022 Al Khateeb filed an Immigration - Naturalization lawsuit against Secretary of Homeland Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Roy K. Altman and Patrick M. Hunt. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    0:22-CV-60360

  • Filing Date:

    02/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Immigration - Naturalization

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Roy K. Altman

Referral Judge

Patrick M. Hunt

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mustafa Al Khateeb

Defendants

Secretary of Homeland Security

Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services

Field Office Director, USCIS Oakland Park Field Office

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Barry Todd Lieber

Attorney at Barry Lieber

1001 Brickell Bay Drive, Suite 1712

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Miriam Alinikoff

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

Miami, Fl 33131

Miami, FL 33131

Noticing INS Attorney

 

Court Documents

#4

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#7

RESTRICTED

#8

RESTRICTED

#9

(#9) ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Stay. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. All pending hearings and deadlines are TERMINATED. Closing Case. Motions Terminated: #8 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 90 Days filed by Secretary of Homeland Security, Field Office Director, USCIS Oakland Park Field Office, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER granting #8 Joint Motion to Stay. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. All pending hearings and deadlines are TERMINATED. Closing Case. Motions Terminated: #8 Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 90 Days filed by Secretary of Homeland Security, Field Office Director, USCIS Oakland Park Field Office, Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/13/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) (Entered: 04/13/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Joint MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 90 Days by Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director, USCIS Oakland Park Field Office, Secretary of Homeland Security. Attorney Miriam Alinikoff added to party Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Miriam Alinikoff added to party Field Office Director, USCIS Oakland Park Field Office(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/22/2022 (Alinikoff, Miriam) (Entered: 04/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Miriam Alinikoff on behalf of Secretary of Homeland Security. Attorney Miriam Alinikoff added to party Secretary of Homeland Security(pty:dft). (Alinikoff, Miriam) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (jas) (Entered: 02/22/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Mustafa Al Khateeb (Lieber, Barry) (Entered: 02/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE by Mustafa Al Khateeb (Lieber, Barry) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docket(#3) Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (mab) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • Docket(#2) Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mab) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Secretary of Homeland Security , Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Field Office Director, USCIS Oakland Park Field Office. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15408667, filed by Mustafa Al Khateeb. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)Case restricted pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5.2. (Lieber, Barry) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SECRETARY OF HOMELAND SECURITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Director, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is a litigant