This case was last updated from PACER on 02/02/2020 at 07:37:23 (UTC).

Al-Jamal v. Juul Labs, Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 12/04/2019 Al-Jamal filed a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit against Juul Labs, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Michigan Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Arthur J. Tarnow and Anthony P. Patti. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13571

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Michigan Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Arthur J. Tarnow

Referral Judge

Anthony P. Patti

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Malik Al-Jamal

Defendants

Juul Labs, Inc.

PAX Labs, Inc.

Altria Group, Inc.

Philip Morris USA, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Michael N. Hanna

Attorney at Morgan and Morgan, P.A.

2000 Town Center, Suite 1900

Southfield, MI 48075

 

Court Documents

#3

(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Altria Group, Inc.* (DAll) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Transfer to the Northern District of California for MDL 2913 (SSch) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#5

(#5) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-16) to Northern District of California for MDL # 2913. (SSch) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

#2

(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

#4

(#4) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-16) for MDL # 2913. [Informational Copy] (SSch) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Malik Al-Jamal against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7510723 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: San Francisco. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): US District Court, ND California, MDL 2913 19-md-029, Judge Hon. William Orrick III] (Hanna, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCase transferred from Michigan Eastern has been opened in California Northern District as case 3:20-cv-00147, filed 01/07/2020. (VLun) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • DocketCase transferred to Northern District of California. (SSch) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Transfer to the Northern District of California for MDL 2913 (SSch) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-16) to Northern District of California for MDL # 2913. (SSch) (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MDL Certified Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-16) for MDL # 2913. [Informational Copy] (SSch) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS Issued for *Altria Group, Inc.* (DAll) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAddition of Parties to CM/ECF: Defendant Altria Group, Inc.. Reason: The party was not added to CM/ECF when e-filing #1 Complaint,, Plaintiff requests summons issued. (Hanna, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • DocketA United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at #http://www.mied.uscourts.gov (NAhm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) SUMMONS Issued for * All Defendants * (NAhm) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Malik Al-Jamal against All Defendants with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7510723 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Wayne - County Where Action Arose: Wayne - County of 1st Defendant: San Francisco. [Previously dismissed case: No] [Possible companion case(s): US District Court, ND California, MDL 2913 19-md-029, Judge Hon. William Orrick III] (Hanna, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less