This case was last updated from PACER on 02/03/2020 at 07:09:30 (UTC).

Al Amiri v. Dedvukaj et al

Case Summary

On 12/05/2019 Al Amiri filed an Other lawsuit against Dedvukaj. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Robert M. Dow, Jr. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-07960

  • Filing Date:

    12/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Robert M. Dow, Jr

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Raed Al Amiri

Defendants

Director Christopher A. Wray

Attorney General William Barr

Director Kenneth T. Cuccinelli

Director Mirash Dedvukaj

Acting Secretary Kevin McAleenan

Mirash Dedvukaj

United States of America, The

Kenneth T. Cuccinelli

United States Department Homeland Security, Citizenship and Immigrant Services

Kevin McAleenan

William Barr

Christopher A. Wray

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Justin Giles Randolph

Attorney at Randolph & Holloway, LLC

53 W. Jackson Blvd, Suite 1234

Chicago, IL 60604

Defendant Attorneys

AUSA - Chicago

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (NDIL - Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Craig Arthur Oswald

Attorney at United States Attorney's Office (NDIL - Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

Elizabeth Inez Treacy

Attorney at United States Attorney''s Office (NDIL-Chicago)

219 South Dearborn Street

Chicago, IL 60604

 

Court Documents

#6

(#6) DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mirash Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan, United States Department Homeland Security, Citizenship and Immigrant Services, United States of America, The, Christopher A. Wray (Treacy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Raed Al Amiri by Justin Giles Randolph (Randolph, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

#7

(#7) DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mirash Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan, United States Department Homeland Security, Citizenship and Immigrant Services, United States of America, The, Christopher A. Wray (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Raed Al Amiri; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16502125.(Randolph, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

#5

(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for2/20/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Randolph, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) DESIGNATION of Craig Arthur Oswald as U.S. Attorney for Defendants William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mirash Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan, United States Department Homeland Security, Citizenship and Immigrant Services, United States of America, The, Christopher A. Wray (Oswald, Craig) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) DESIGNATION of Elizabeth Inez Treacy as U.S. Attorney for Defendants William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mirash Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan, United States Department Homeland Security, Citizenship and Immigrant Services, United States of America, The, Christopher A. Wray (Treacy, Elizabeth) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2019
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to William Barr, Kenneth T. Cuccinelli, Mirash Dedvukaj, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Attorney. (daj, ) (Entered: 12/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr: Initial status hearing is set for2/20/2020 at 9:00 a.m. and parties are to report the following: (1) Possibility of settlement in the case; (2) If no possibility of settlement exists, the nature and length of discovery necessary to get the case ready for trial. Plaintiff is to advise all other parties of the Courts action herein. Lead counsel is directed to appear at this status hearing. The parties are requested to file a joint status report at least two days prior to the initial status. For further details see the Court's website available at www.ilnd.uscourts.gov. Mailed notice (cdh, ) (Entered: 12/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (ph, ) (Entered: 12/06/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Robert M. Dow, Jr. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable M. David Weisman. Case assignment: Random assignment. (kl, ) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Raed Al Amiri by Justin Giles Randolph (Randolph, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Randolph, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by Raed Al Amiri; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16502125.(Randolph, Justin) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.