This case was last updated from PACER on 11/29/2019 at 09:24:24 (UTC).

Akram v. USA

Case Summary

On 09/30/2019 Akram filed a Prisoner - Vacate Sentence lawsuit against USA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Elizabeth A. Wolford. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-01337

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Vacate Sentence

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    New York Western District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Elizabeth A. Wolford

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Mohammed W. Akram

Philipsburg, PA 16866

Respondent

USA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

Laura A. Higgins

Attorney at U.S. Attorney's Office

138 Delaware Avenue

Buffalo, NY 14202

 

Court Documents

#1

(#1) MOTION for An Order Finding Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege and Motion for Extension of Time to File the Government's Response to the Defendant's Motion by USA.(Higgins, Laura) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • E-Filing Notification: re #1 Motion by USA, Attorney is directed to only file documents on the related criminal case 15cr113. (SG) (Entered: 10/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) MOTION for An Order Finding Waiver of Attorney-Client Privilege and Motion for Extension of Time to File the Government's Response to the Defendant's Motion by USA.(Higgins, Laura) (Entered: 10/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Motion to vacate sentence filed related to 15-cr-113. All docketing will be done in criminal action. (SG) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Elizabeth A. Wolford. (SG) (Entered: 10/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less