This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 09/15/2020 at 09:16:17 (UTC).

Akins v. United States Trotting Association ("USTA") et al

Case Summary

On 07/17/2020 Akins filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against United States Trotting Association USTA. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Middle District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Christopher C. Conner. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01226

  • Filing Date:

    07/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Christopher C. Conner

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Mark Akins

Defendants

United States Trotting Association ("USTA")

Anthony Salerno

Michael Tanner

T.C. Lane

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Alan Pincus

4330 Evergreen Place

Las Vegas, NV 89107

Defendant Attorneys

Jason G. Benion

Attorney at Saxton & Stump, LLC

4250 Crums Mill Road, Suite 201

Harrisburg, PA 17112

Kathleen D. Bruder

Attorney at Saxton & Stump

4250 Crums Mill Road, Suite 201

Harrisburg, PA 17112

Morgan S. Hays

Attorney at Saxton & Stump

4250 Crums Mill Rd., Suite 201

Harrisburg, PA 17112

Jessica S. Davis

Attorney at Office of Attorney General

15Th Floor, Strawberry Square

Harrisburg, PA 17120

 

Court Documents

#18

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#10

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

#2

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Anthony Salerno. Anthony Salerno waiver sent on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (Davis, Jessica) (Entered: 09/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Conference call set for 8/11/2020 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle to discuss the merits of the case and to schedule a settlement conference. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the telephone call to Chambers at (570) 323-9881 once counsel for all the parties are on the line. Signed by Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle on 8/4/2020. (caw) (Entered: 08/04/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) ORDER REFERRING CASE Magistrate Judge William I. Arbuckle for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. (See order for complete details.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 8/3/20. (ki) (Entered: 08/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) ORDER REFERRING case to Chief Magistrate Judge Schwab for referral of matters to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/30/2020. (ktt) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) Order approving re #12 Stipulation. Akins motion (Doc. #2 ) for a preliminary injunction is DENIED as moot without prejudice. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/30/2020. (ktt) (Entered: 07/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) STIPULATION by Anthony Salerno. (Davis, Jessica) (Entered: 07/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketReceipt of payment from ALAN PINCUS in the amount of $400.00 for CIVIL FILING FEE. Transaction posted on 7/23/2020. Receipt number 111025763 processed by aarlidge. (jjs) (Entered: 07/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen D. Bruder on behalf of T.C. Lane, Michael Tanner, United States Trotting Association ("USTA") (Bruder, Kathleen) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Appearance by Morgan S. Hays on behalf of T.C. Lane, Michael Tanner, United States Trotting Association ("USTA") (Hays, Morgan) (Entered: 07/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica S. Davis on behalf of Anthony Salerno (Davis, Jessica) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States Trotting Association ("USTA"). (Benion, Jason) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Jason G. Benion on behalf of T.C. Lane, Michael Tanner, United States Trotting Association ("USTA") (Benion, Jason) (Entered: 07/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDERED that: 1. Akins' motion (Doc. #2 ) for temporary restraining order and preliminary injunction is DENIED as to the request for a temporary restraining order but DEFERRED as to the request for a preliminary injunction. 2. A telephonic conference call concerning Akins' motion (Doc. #2 ) for preliminary injunction is scheduled for Thursday, July 23, 2020, at 9:30 a.m.. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/18/2020. (ktt) (Entered: 07/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER Re: Case Assignment and Procedures - Signed by Honorable Christopher C. Conner on 7/17/2020. (ktt) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Mark Akins re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order. (mfa) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Mark Akins.(mfa) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against All Defendants, filed by Mark Akins. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(mfa) (Entered: 07/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United States Department of Homeland Security is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alan Pincus