This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/03/2021 at 09:26:49 (UTC).

AKEME v. DELTA-T GROUP, INC.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 AKEME filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against DELTA-T GROUP, INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-03469

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TIA AKEME

Defendant

DELTA-T GROUP, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBERT H. GRAFF

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF ERIC A. SHORE, P.C.

1500 Jfk Blvd, Suite 1240

Philadelphia, PA 19102

 

Court Documents

1 #1

Main Document

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #2

Designation Form

1 #3

Case Management Track Form

#2

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by TIA AKEME. DELTA-T GROUP, INC. waiver sent on 8/4/2021, answer due 10/4/2021. (GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/17/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to DELTA-T GROUP, INC.. Forwarded To: EMAILED TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL on 8/5/2021 (sg, ) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDEMAND for Trial by Jury by TIA AKEME. (JL ) (Entered: 08/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against DELTA-T GROUP, INC. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-15314689.), filed by TIA AKEME. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Designation Form, #3 Case Management Track Form)(GRAFF, ROBERT) (Entered: 08/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Delta T, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ROBERT H. GRAFF