This case was last updated from PACER on 08/30/2020 at 14:40:52 (UTC).

AKEL v. UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

Case Summary

On 07/01/2020 AKEL filed a Prisoner - Civil Right lawsuit against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Randolph D. Moss. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01651

  • Filing Date:

    07/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Prisoner - Civil Right

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Randolph D. Moss

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANTONIO U. AKEL

Inez, KY 41224

Defendant

UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE

 

Court Documents

6 #1

Statement

#6

(#6) PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTONIO U. AKEL (ztd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2020: #1 Statement) (ztd). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

#5

(#5) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/8/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $39.16 from Prison Account of ANTONIO U. AKEL and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/7/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTONIO U. AKEL (adh, ) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

1 #2

Summons

1 #1

Exhibit

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by ANTONIO U. AKEL. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) PRISONER ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTONIO U. AKEL (ztd) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/14/2020: #1 Statement) (ztd). (Entered: 07/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) STANDING ORDER: The parties are hereby ORDERED to comply with the directives set forth in the Standing Order. See document for details. Signed by Judge Randolph D. Moss on 7/8/2020. (lcrdm1) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Randolph D. Moss. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER directing an initial partial filing fee in the amount of $39.16 from Prison Account of ANTONIO U. AKEL and granting MOTION for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (see order for full details). Pro Se party has been notified by first class mail. Signed by Judge James E. Boasberg on 7/7/2020. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/08/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT for period of six months by ANTONIO U. AKEL (adh, ) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by ANTONIO U. AKEL (adh, ) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES DEPARTMENT OF JUSTICE filed by ANTONIO U. AKEL. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit, #2 Summons)(adh, ) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2020
  • DocketInitiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 7/1/2020. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (adh, ) (Entered: 07/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less