This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 01/13/2020 at 08:18:00 (UTC).

Akeem et al v. Dasmen Residential, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Akeem filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Dasmen Residential, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Louisiana Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Janis van Meerveld, Martin L.C. Feldman, Barry W Ashe and Dana Douglas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-13650

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Referral Judges

Janis van Meerveld

Dana Douglas

Presiding Judges

Martin L.C. Feldman

Barry W Ashe

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Laquinta Carter

Brandy Wilson

Duplessis Dareranica

Joshua Akeem

Dwayne Pierce

Janis Morgan

Dareranica Duplessis

Defendants

Eastlake Development, LLC

Dasmen Residential, LLC

RH Copper Creek, LLC

RH Eastlake, LLC

KFK Development, LLC

Wilshire Insurance Company

Unidentified Party

KFK Group, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Suzette Peychaud Bagneris

Attorney at Bagneris Firm, LLC

2714 Canal Street, Suite 403

New Orleans, LA 70119

Matthew Landry

Attorney at Leger & Shaw (New Orleans)

935 Gravier Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70112

Walter John Leger, Jr.

Attorney at Leger & Shaw (New Orleans)

935 Gravier Street, Suite 2150

New Orleans, LA 70112

Emile Anthony Bagneris, III

Attorney at The Bagneris Firm

2714 Canal Street, Suite 403

New Orleans, LA 70119

Defendant Attorneys

Nicholas Stephen Bergeron

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Cassie E. Preston

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

Jonathan M. Walsh

Attorney at Deutsch Kerrigan & Stiles LLP (New Orleans)

755 Magazine Street

New Orleans, LA 70130

David F. Waguespack

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

Victoria J. Cvitanovic

Attorney at Louisiana Department of Justice (1450 Poydras)

1450 Poydras Street, Suite 900

New Orleans, LA 70112

Andrew J Brien

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

Emily E. Eagan

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Ernest Paul Gieger, Jr.

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Tucker Tyler Bohren

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

Michael Edward Hill

Attorney at Gieger, Laborde & Laperouse, LLC (New Orleans)

One Shell Square, 701 Poydras St., Suite 4800

New Orleans, LA 70139-4800

David Scotton

Attorney at Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux,

1100 Poydras Street, Suite 3100

New Orleans, LA 70163

Mary Kerrigan Dennard

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Dakota Kyle Chenevert

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (New Orleans)

400 Poydras St, Suite 1300

New Orleans, LA 70130

Tabitha Robertson Durbin

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Lafayette)

100 E. Vermillion St., Suite 300

Lafayette, LA 70501

Jennifer E. Michel

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP (Lafayette)

100 E. Vermillion St., Suite 300

Lafayette, LA 70501

 

Court Documents

43 #2

Proposed Pleading

43 #1

Proposed Order

#43

42 #2

Proposed Order

42 #1

Proposed Pleading

#42

#41

40 #1

Proposed Order

#40

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

State Court Pleadings

#1

79 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#43) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal by Dasmen Residential, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Proposed Pleading)(Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 01/09/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#42) **DEFICIENT**EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal by Dasmen Residential, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Pleading, #2 Proposed Order)(Bergeron, Nicholas) Modified text on 1/8/2020 (am). (Entered: 01/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#41) ORDER granting #40 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. IT IS ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED, and defendants KFK Group, Inc. and KFK Development, LLC shall have an additional twenty-one (21) days, or up to and including January 23, 2020, to respond to the First Amended Petition for Damages filed by Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 1/3/2020. (mm) (Entered: 01/06/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • (#40) EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by KFK Group, Inc., KFK Development, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney David F. Waguespack added to party KFK Group, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney David F. Waguespack added to party KFK Development, LLC(pty:dft).(Waguespack, David) (Entered: 01/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#39) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #38 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer **Document has been marked filed in error as filing party does not appear as party to this matter.** (clc) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#38) **FILED IN ERROR** EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by Wilshire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)Attorney Tabitha Robertson Durbin added to party Wilshire Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Durbin, Tabitha) Modified on 12/23/2019 (clc). (Entered: 12/20/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#37) ORDER granting #32 Motion to Enroll as Counsel of Record for Attorney Jonathan M. Walsh,Cassie E. Preston,Victoria J. Cvitanovic for Eastlake Development, LLC. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/18/2019. (clw) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#36) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED, that the #31 Motion is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the new submission date for Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand [Doc. #23 ] is January 30, 2020. Opposition memoranda shall be filed in accordance with the Local Rules. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/18/2019.(am) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#35) ORDER: IT IS ORDERED that the #30 motion is GRANTED, and Defendant, Eastlake Development, L.L.C., shall have an additional twenty-one (21) days, or up to and including January 7, 2020, to respond to the First Amended Petition for Damages filed by by Plaintiffs, Joshua Akeem, Brandy Wilson, Janis Morgan, Laquinta Carter, Dwayne Pierce, and Dareranica Duplessis. Signed by Judge Barry W Ashe on 12/18/2019. (am) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#34) REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Eastlake Development, LLC re #10 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively MOTION for Summary Judgment . (am) (Entered: 12/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 11/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim or, Alternatively, MOTION for Summary Judgment by Eastlake Development, LLC. Motion(s) will be submitted on 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, #5 Notice of Submission)(Waguespack, David) (Entered: 11/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) Notice of Compliance by Dasmen Residential, LLC, RH Copper Creek, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC re #4 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by RH Eastlake, LLC (Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by RH Copper Creek, LLC (Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Dasmen Residential, LLC (Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) ANSWER to #1 Notice of Removal,, with Jury Demand by Dasmen Residential, LLC, RH Copper Creek, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC.(Bergeron, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/21/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) DIRECTIVE of the Clerk regarding compliance with 28:1447(b) re #1 Notice of Removal, filed by RH Copper Creek, LLC, Dasmen Residential, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. (clw) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re #1 Notice of Removal. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. Additionally, attachment 1 was imaged as 8-1/2" x 14". All documents should be 8-1/2" x 11". Clerk has corrected the image. (clw) (Entered: 11/15/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • (#2) Initial Case Assignment to Judge Martin L.C. Feldman and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (ess) (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court Orleans Parish, case number 2019-10207 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ALAEDC-7974379) filed by RH Copper Creek, LLC, Dasmen Residential, LLC, RH Eastlake, LLC. (Attachments: #1 State Court Pleadings, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party Dasmen Residential, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party RH Copper Creek, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Nicholas Stephen Bergeron added to party RH Eastlake, LLC(pty:dft).(Bergeron, Nicholas) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/15/2019) (clw). (Attachment 2 replaced on 11/15/2019) (clw). Modified text on 11/15/2019 (clw). (Entered: 11/14/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KFK Development, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Dasmen Residential LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where WILSHIRE INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant