This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/24/2022 at 08:40:55 (UTC).

White Rhino USA v. Rhyno Distribution

Case Summary

On 02/23/2022 White Rhino USA filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Rhyno Distribution. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Utah District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Daphne A. Oberg. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:22-CV-00126

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Daphne A. Oberg

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

White Rhino USA

Defendant

Rhyno Distribution doing business as Rhyno Supply

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H. Dickson Burton

Attorney at TRASKBRITT PC

230 S 500 E #300, Po Box 2550

Salt Lake City, UT 84110

James C. Watson

Attorney at TRASKBRITT PC

230 S 500 E #300, Po Box 2550

Salt Lake City, UT 84110

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

5 #7

Exhibit G U.S. TM Serial No. 97173348

5 #6

Exhibit F U.S. TM Serial No. 97173341

5 #5

Exhibit E U.S. TM Reg. No. 5,296,594

5 #4

Exhibit D U.S. TM Reg. No. 4,743,949

5 #3

Exhibit C U.S. TM Reg. No. 4,704,123

5 #2

Exhibit B U.S. TM Reg. No. 4,704,122

5 #1

Exhibit A U.S. TM Reg. No. 4,632,780

5 #5

Main Document

#4

(#4) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/24/22. (alf) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

#3

(#3) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mh) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

2 #7

Exhibit F - US TM Serial No. 97173341

2 #5

Exhibit D - US TM Reg No. 4,743,949

2 #4

Exhibit C - US TM Reg. No. 4,704,123

2 #3

Exhibit B - US TM Reg No. 4,704,122

2 #2

Exhibit A - US TM Reg No. 4,632,780

2 #2

Main Document

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT** SUMMONS Returned Executed by White Rhino USA as to Rhyno Distribution served on 3/17/2022, answer due 4/7/2022. (Watson, James) (Entered: 03/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) **RESTRICTED DOCUMENT**Summons Issued Electronically as to Rhyno Distribution. Instructions to Counsel:1. Click on the document number.2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF.3. Print the issued summons for service. (af) (Entered: 03/17/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rhyno Distribution with Jury Demand. New Plaintiffs: WHITE RHINO U.S.A., LLC. Removed Plaintiffs: A.K.A. WORLDWIDE, L.L.C. (DBA WHITE RHINO U.S.A., LLC). filed by A.K.A Worldwide. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A U.S. TM Reg. No. 4,632,780, #2 Exhibit B U.S. TM Reg. No. 4,704,122, #3 Exhibit C U.S. TM Reg. No. 4,704,123, #4 Exhibit D U.S. TM Reg. No. 4,743,949, #5 Exhibit E U.S. TM Reg. No. 5,296,594, #6 Exhibit F U.S. TM Serial No. 97173341, #7 Exhibit G U.S. TM Serial No. 97173348) (Watson, James) (Entered: 03/16/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - Plaintiff must propose a schedule to defendant in the form of a draft Attorney Planning Meeting Report within the earlier of fourteen(14) days after any defendant has appeared or twenty-eight (28) days after any defendant has been served with the complaint. See order for additional instructions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg on 2/24/22. (alf) (Entered: 02/24/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Report on the Filing of an action sent to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (mh) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4257899) filed by A.K.A Worldwide. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - US TM Reg No. 4,632,780, #3 Exhibit B - US TM Reg No. 4,704,122, #4 Exhibit C - US TM Reg. No. 4,704,123, #5 Exhibit D - US TM Reg No. 4,743,949, #6 Exhibit E - US TM Reg No. 5,296,594, #7 Exhibit F - US TM Serial No. 97173341, #8 Exhibit G - US TM Serial No. 97173348) Assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg (Watson, James) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) Case has been indexed and assigned to Magistrate Judge Daphne A. Oberg. Plaintiff A.K.A Worldwide is directed to E-File the Complaint and cover sheet (found under Complaints and Other Initiating Documents) and pay the filing fee of $ 402 by the end of the business day.NOTE: The court will not have jurisdiction until the opening document is electronically filed and the filing fee paid in the CM/ECF system. Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts #PDF version and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance. (mh) (Entered: 02/23/2022)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less