This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 05/07/2022 at 09:03:16 (UTC).

AK MEETING IP LLC v. ADOBE INC.

Case Summary

On 03/08/2022 AK MEETING IP LLC filed an Intellectual Property - Patent lawsuit against ADOBE INC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Alan D Albright. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:22-CV-00247

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Patent

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AK MEETING IP LLC

Defendant

ADOBE INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

William P. Ramey, III

Attorney at Ramey & Schwaller, LLP

5020 Montrose Blvd., Suite 800

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

Eugene Y. Mar

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel, LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

James L. Day

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kelsey Danielle Mollura

Attorney at Farella Braun + Martel LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

Deron R Dacus

Attorney at The Dacus Firm, P.C.

821 Ese Loop 323, Suite 430

Tyler, TX 75701

Winston Liaw

Attorney at Farella Braun & Martel, LLP

235 Montgomery Street, 17Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94104

 

Court Documents

#13

(#13) ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelsey Danielle Mollura. Attorney added for ADOBE INC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot4) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

#12

(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Winston Liaw "Kelsey Danielle Mollura's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice" ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15974243) by on behalf of ADOBE INC.. (Liaw, Winston) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ADOBE INC. (Mar, Eugene) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

#10

(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eugene Y. Mar on behalf of ADOBE INC.. Attorney Eugene Y. Mar added to party ADOBE INC.(pty:dft) (Mar, Eugene) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#9

(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Winston Liaw on behalf of ADOBE INC.. Attorney Winston Liaw added to party ADOBE INC.(pty:dft) (Liaw, Winston) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#8

(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L. Day on behalf of ADOBE INC.. Attorney James L. Day added to party ADOBE INC.(pty:dft) (Day, James) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

#7

(#7) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by ADOBE INC. re #1 Complaint, (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

#5

(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AK MEETING IP LLC. ADOBE INC. served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

#4

(#4) Summons Issued as to ADOBE INC.. (jc5) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit F US8627211

1 #5

Exhibit E US10963124

1 #4

Exhibit D US10180765

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #1

Exhibit A

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15792323), filed by AK MEETING IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D US10180765, #5 Exhibit E US10963124, #6 Exhibit F US8627211, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kelsey Danielle Mollura. Attorney added for ADOBE INC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot4) (Entered: 04/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Winston Liaw "Kelsey Danielle Mollura's Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice" ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-15974243) by on behalf of ADOBE INC.. (Liaw, Winston) (Entered: 04/27/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by ADOBE INC. (Mar, Eugene) (Entered: 04/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Eugene Y. Mar on behalf of ADOBE INC.. Attorney Eugene Y. Mar added to party ADOBE INC.(pty:dft) (Mar, Eugene) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Winston Liaw on behalf of ADOBE INC.. Attorney Winston Liaw added to party ADOBE INC.(pty:dft) (Liaw, Winston) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by James L. Day on behalf of ADOBE INC.. Attorney James L. Day added to party ADOBE INC.(pty:dft) (Day, James) (Entered: 04/20/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Standing Order Regarding Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (Entered: 04/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketReset Deadlines: ADOBE INC. answer due 5/16/2022. (lad) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Agreed Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by ADOBE INC. re #1 Complaint, (Dacus, Deron) (Entered: 03/28/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) SUMMONS Returned Executed by AK MEETING IP LLC. ADOBE INC. served on 3/9/2022, answer due 3/30/2022. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/14/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketParties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated #standing orders and # COVID-19 standing order available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows:1. #Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722,2. #Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722,3. #Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722,4. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings,5. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722,6. #Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722. (jkda) (Entered: 03/10/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Summons Issued as to ADOBE INC.. (jc5) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketCase assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (jc5) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketAll parties shall flatten all documents before e-filing. All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/(jc5) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by AK MEETING IP LLC. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15792323), filed by AK MEETING IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D US10180765, #5 Exhibit E US10963124, #6 Exhibit F US8627211, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ramey, William) (Entered: 03/08/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ADOBE INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Winston Liaw

Latest cases represented by Lawyer James L. Day Esq. Jr.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Eugene Y. Mar