This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/11/2021 at 07:08:16 (UTC).

Ajtzoc Morales v. Puerto Rico Restaurant & Pizza Inc. et al

Case Summary

On 05/12/2021 Ajtzoc Morales filed a Labor - Labor Standard lawsuit against Puerto Rico Restaurant Pizza Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Brian M. Cogan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:21-CV-02664

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Labor Standard

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Brian M. Cogan

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santiago Ignacio Ajtzoc Morales

Defendants

Tito Perez

Dario Perez

Puerto Rico Restaurant & Diner Inc.

Puerto Rico Restaurant & Pizza Inc.

Ramon Bautista

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Gabriel Paul Harvis

Attorney at Elefterakis Elefterakis & Panek

80 Pine Street, 38Th Floor

New York, NY 10005

Defendant Attorneys

Ge Qu

Attorney at Hang & Associates PLLC

136-20 38Th Avenue, Suite 10G

Flushing, NY 11354

Jian Hang

Attorney at Hang & Associates, PLLC

136-20 38Th Avenue, Suite 10G

Flushing, NY 11354

 

Court Documents

#19

#18

#17

#16

#15

#14

#13

#12

#11

#9

#8

#7

#6

#5

#4

#3

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketMinute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held before Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/29/2021. Counsel for both sides present by telephone. The Court set the following discovery schedule: the parties shall exchange Rule 26(a)(1) disclosures by 7/6/2021; serve written discovery requests by 7/20/2021; produce written discovery by 8/19/2021; and complete depositions by 10/18/2021, the date fact discovery ends. The last day for filing a letter requesting a pre-motion conference to file dispositive motions shall be 10/25/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2021
  • DocketNOTICE of Hearing: Initial Status Conference set for 12:30 pm on 6/29/2021 is reset to 5:15 pm. Parties will use the toll-free number 888-684-8852, access code 6427877# and security code 2664#. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 06/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) Letter jointly submitted in advance of the initial conference scheduled for June 29, 2021 by Santiago Ignacio Ajtzoc Morales (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Civil Case Management Plan) (Harvis, Gabriel) (Entered: 06/24/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER granting in part #19 . Defendants can have until 7/22/2021 to answer because the answer will be of little to no use in planning discovery in this case, but defendants have demonstrated insufficient grounds to adjourn the Initial Status Conference. This is a straightforward FLSA case and by the time of the conference, defense counsel will have had five weeks to investigate the case. That should be more than sufficient. As far as settlement, if they want to settle, they can do it in the same time frame. The parties are expected to comply with the requirements for the Initial Status Conference and they can expect to be placed on a prompt discovery and trial schedule at the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 6/2/2021. (Weisberg, Peggy) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, through July 22, 2021, First MOTION to Adjourn Conference by Ramon Bautista, Dario Perez, Tito Perez, Puerto Rico Restaurant & Pizza Inc.. (Qu, Ge) (Entered: 06/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Jian Hang on behalf of Ramon Bautista, Dario Perez, Tito Perez, Puerto Rico Restaurant & Pizza Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Hang, Jian) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) NOTICE of Appearance by Ge Qu on behalf of Ramon Bautista, Dario Perez, Tito Perez, Puerto Rico Restaurant & Pizza Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Qu, Ge) (Entered: 05/27/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santiago Ignacio Ajtzoc Morales. Tito Perez served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Harvis, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santiago Ignacio Ajtzoc Morales. Ramon Bautista served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Harvis, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) SUMMONS Returned Executed by Santiago Ignacio Ajtzoc Morales. Puerto Rico Restaurant & Pizza Inc. served on 5/17/2021, answer due 6/7/2021. (Harvis, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Brian M. Cogan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 05/13/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Santiago Ignacio Ajtzoc Morales (Harvis, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Santiago Ignacio Ajtzoc Morales (Harvis, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Santiago Ignacio Ajtzoc Morales (Harvis, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Santiago Ignacio Ajtzoc Morales (Harvis, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Proposed Summons. Re #1 Complaint, by Santiago Ignacio Ajtzoc Morales (Harvis, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) Civil Cover Sheet.. Re #1 Complaint, by Santiago Ignacio Ajtzoc Morales (Harvis, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Ramon Bautista, Dario Perez, Tito Perez, Puerto Rico Restaurant & Diner Inc., Puerto Rico Restaurant & Pizza Inc. filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-14464187 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -No,, filed by Santiago Ignacio Ajtzoc Morales. (Harvis, Gabriel) (Entered: 05/12/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ge Qu