This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/08/2022 at 07:53:42 (UTC).

Ajpacaja v. Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC et al

Case Summary

On 02/07/2022 Ajpacaja filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District Court. The Judge overseeing this case is Lee H Rosenthal. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    4:22-CV-00402

  • Filing Date:

    02/07/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Lee H Rosenthal

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Santos Ajpacaja

Houston, TX 77006

Defendants

Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC

Brosnan Risk Consultants, Ltd.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Sambar Kumar Mukerji

Attorney at Mukerji Law Firm, PC

2405 Smith St

Houston, TX 77006

Defendant Attorneys

Stephanie Briggs Donaho

Attorney at Bush & Ramirez, PLLC

5615 Kirby, Suite 90

Houston, TX 77005

John A. Ramirez

Attorney at Bush Ramirez, LLC

5615 Kirby Dr, Ste 900

Houston, TX 77005

Deborah A Greenleaf

Attorney at Tribble Ross

6371 Richmond Ave

Houston, TX 77057

Wesson Hardy Tribble

Attorney at Tribble Ross Wagner

6371 Richmond Rd.

Houston, TX 77057

Monica Celeste Vaughan

Attorney at Tribble Ross

6371 Richmond Ave.

Houston, TX 77057

 

Court Documents

19 #2

Proposed Order

19 #1

Complaint

19 #19

Main Document

#18

(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah A. Greenleaf on behalf of Brosnan Risk Consultants, Ltd., filed. (Greenleaf, Deborah) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

17 #4

Exhibit

17 #3

Exhibit

17 #2

Exhibit

17 #1

Exhibit

17 #17

Main Document

#16

(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury. Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2022. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 5/20/2022. Deft Expert Witness List due by 6/24/2022. Discovery due by 7/29/2022. Mediation due by 7/29/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/19/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2022. Docket Call set for 10/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

#14

(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Abraham "Abe" Carreon on behalf of Santos Ajpacaja, filed. (Mukerji, Sambar) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

#13

(#13) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Brosnan Risk Consultants, Ltd., filed.(Vaughan, Monica) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#12

(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brosnan Risk Consultants, Ltd., filed.(Vaughan, Monica) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#11

(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Fallin Schwartz on behalf of Brosnan Risk Consultants, Ltd., filed. (Vaughan, Monica) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

#10

(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Santos Ajpacaja, filed.(Mukerji, Sambar) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

#9

(#9) Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling and Docket Control Order, filed.(Donaho, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#8

(#8) Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Donaho, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

#7

(#7) NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Donaho, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

19 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Santos Ajpacaja, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/15/2022. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Proposed Order)(Mukerji, Sambar) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah A. Greenleaf on behalf of Brosnan Risk Consultants, Ltd., filed. (Greenleaf, Deborah) (Entered: 03/25/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) Unopposed MOTION to Designate Responsible Third Party by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. Motion Docket Date 4/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Donaho, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/24/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) SCHEDULING ORDER. Jury. Amended Pleadings due by 4/29/2022. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 5/20/2022. Deft Expert Witness List due by 6/24/2022. Discovery due by 7/29/2022. Mediation due by 7/29/2022. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 8/19/2022. Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/21/2022. Docket Call set for 10/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 11B before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal(Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) Parties notified.(ShoshanaArnow, 4) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • Docket(#15) Minute entry for proceedings before the Hon. Lee H. Rosenthal. Initial conference held on March 18, 2022. The court will separately enter a scheduling and docket control order, as stated in detail on the record. Appearances: Abe Carreon for Pltf. Stephanie Donaho for Deft. Wal-Mart and Fallin Schwartz for Deft. Brosnan. (Court Reporter: D. Smith), filed.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 03/21/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) NOTICE of Appearance by Abraham "Abe" Carreon on behalf of Santos Ajpacaja, filed. (Mukerji, Sambar) (Entered: 03/18/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Brosnan Risk Consultants, Ltd., filed.(Vaughan, Monica) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Brosnan Risk Consultants, Ltd., filed.(Vaughan, Monica) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) NOTICE of Appearance by Fallin Schwartz on behalf of Brosnan Risk Consultants, Ltd., filed. (Vaughan, Monica) (Entered: 03/15/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Santos Ajpacaja, filed.(Mukerji, Sambar) (Entered: 03/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) Agreed PROPOSED ORDER Scheduling and Docket Control Order, filed.(Donaho, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Agreed JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Donaho, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/04/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of Initial Disclosures by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Donaho, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/03/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie B. Donaho on behalf of Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Donaho, Stephanie) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed.(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE IN A REMOVED ACTION by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC, filed. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 02/17/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ORDER Scheduling Rule 16 Conference With the Court and Setting Out the Requirements for Initial Pretrial Work. Initial Conference set for 3/18/2022 at 10:50 AM by video before Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal. A Zoom link will be provided for participation. (Signed by Chief Judge Lee H Rosenthal) (Attachments: #1 Supplement) Parties notified.(leddins, 4) (Entered: 02/16/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 80th District Court, Harris County, case number 2022-00260 (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXSDC-27714723) filed by Wal-Mart Stores Texas, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Original Petition, #3 Exhibit Original Answer - State Court, #4 Exhibit Jury Demand - State Court)(Ramirez, John) (Entered: 02/07/2022)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Brosnan Risk Consultants Ltd is a litigant

Latest cases where Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Briggs Donaho

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Wesson Tribble