This case was last updated from PACER on 08/24/2021 at 09:43:04 (UTC).

Aityahia v. Westwind School of Aeronautics et al

Case Summary

On 06/25/2021 Aityahia filed a Civil Right - Employment Discrimination lawsuit against Westwind School of Aeronautics. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Arizona District. The Judge overseeing this case is Susan M Brnovich. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:21-CV-01109

  • Filing Date:

    06/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Employment Discrimination

  • Courthouse:

    Arizona District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Susan M Brnovich

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aziz Aityahia

Phoenix, AZ 85085

Defendants

United Airlines Incorporated

Westwind Air Service

Westwind School of Aeronautics

 

Court Documents

#8

(#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/29/2021. (REK) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

#7

(#7) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/28/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#6

(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/28/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#5

(#5) ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/28/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

#4

(#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#3

(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX229825. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01109-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#2

(#2) MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Aziz Aityahia. (BAS) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number PHX229825 filed by Aziz Aityahia.(BAS) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ORDER granting #2 Motion to Allow Electronic Filing. The party is required to complete the Electronic Case File Registration form to register as a user with the Clerk's Office and to register as a subscriber to PACER (Public Access to Electronic Records) within five (5) days of the date of this Order. See document for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M Brnovich on 6/29/2021. (REK) (Entered: 06/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ORDER directing the Clerk of Court to terminate any or all Defendants in this matter, without further notice, that have not been served within the time required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) on September 23, 2021. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/28/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/28/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) ORDER Any motions, responses or replies filed for which a courtesy copy is not delivered to the Court, as required, will be stricken and not considered. Signed by Judge Susan M. Brnovich on 6/28/2021. (ESG) (Entered: 06/28/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketSummons Issued as to United Airlines Incorporated, Westwind Air Service, Westwind School of Aeronautics and provided to plaintiff at case opening. (BAS) This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE TO SELF-REPRESENTED LITIGANT re informational documents attached: (1) Notice to Self-Represented Litigant, (2) Federal Court Self-Service Clinic Flyer, (3) Fed. R. Civ. P. 5.2, and (4) Notice and Request re Electronic Noticing. (BAS) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Filing fee paid, receipt number PHX229825. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Susan M. Brnovich. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-21-01109-PHX-SMB. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (BAS) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) MOTION to Allow Electronic Filing by a Party Appearing Without an Attorney by Aziz Aityahia. (BAS) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 402.00, receipt number PHX229825 filed by Aziz Aityahia.(BAS) (Entered: 06/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Airlines, Inc is a litigant