This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2021 at 07:19:17 (UTC).

AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc. v. Bellapierre Cosmetics, Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/18/2020 AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Bellapierre Cosmetics, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judge overseeing this case is Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-06848

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC.,

AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc.

Defendant

BELLAPIERRE COSMETICS, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Thadford A. Felton

Attorney at Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale, P.C.

200 West Madison Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60606

Courtney A Adair

Attorney at Greensfelder, Hemker & Gale, P.C.

200 W. Madison Street, Suite 3300

Chicago, IL 60606

Defendant Attorneys

Jeffrey Daniel Blake

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices, P.C.

77 West Washington Street, Suite 1220

Chicago, IL 60602

Sharon Harris

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices, P.C.

77 W. Washington St., Suite 1220

Chicago, IL 60602

Matthew C. De Re

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices, P.c.

77 W. Washington St., Suite 1220

Chicago, IL 60602

Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr.

Attorney at Zimmerman Law Offices, P.C.

77 West Washington Street, Suite 1220

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Bellapierre Cosmetics, Inc. (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

#10

(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bellapierre Cosmetics, Inc. by Matthew C. De Re (De Re, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#9

(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bellapierre Cosmetics, Inc. by Jeffrey Daniel Blake (Blake, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#8

(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bellapierre Cosmetics, Inc. by Sharon Harris (Harris, Sharon) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#7

(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bellapierre Cosmetics, Inc. by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

#6

(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc. (Adair, Courtney) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc. (Adair, Courtney) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc. by Courtney A Adair (Adair, Courtney) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#3

(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 1/28/2021, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

#2

(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC., by Thadford A. Felton (Felton, Thadford) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #3

Exhibit Invoices

1 #2

Exhibit Terms of Service

1 #1

Exhibit Credit Agreement

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC.,; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17660934. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Credit Agreement, #2 Exhibit Terms of Service, #3 Exhibit Invoices, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adair, Courtney) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) ANSWER to Complaint by Bellapierre Cosmetics, Inc. (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 12/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bellapierre Cosmetics, Inc. by Matthew C. De Re (De Re, Matthew) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bellapierre Cosmetics, Inc. by Jeffrey Daniel Blake (Blake, Jeffrey) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bellapierre Cosmetics, Inc. by Sharon Harris (Harris, Sharon) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Bellapierre Cosmetics, Inc. by Thomas A. Zimmerman, Jr (Zimmerman, Thomas) (Entered: 12/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS Issued as to Defendant Bellapierre Cosmetics, Inc. (dxb, ) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) Corporate Disclosure Statement by AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc. (Adair, Courtney) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc. (Adair, Courtney) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc. by Courtney A Adair (Adair, Courtney) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: By 1/28/2021, the parties are to file a joint status report. The parties may refer to the format detailed on the Court's website under New and Reassigned cases. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Susan E. Cox. Case assignment: Random assignment. (cm, ) (Entered: 11/19/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC., by Thadford A. Felton (Felton, Thadford) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by AIT WORLDWIDE LOGISTICS, INC.,; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-17660934. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Credit Agreement, #2 Exhibit Terms of Service, #3 Exhibit Invoices, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Adair, Courtney) (Entered: 11/18/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AIT Worldwide Logistics, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where BELLAPIERRE COSMETICS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Jeffrey Daniel Blake

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sharon Harris