This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 12/31/2019 at 07:03:06 (UTC).

Airwair International LTD v. Primark US Corporation et al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 Airwair International LTD filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Primark US Corporation. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, New York Eastern District. The Judges overseeing this case are LaShann DeArcy Hall and Robert M. Levy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:19-CV-06189

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LaShann DeArcy Hall

Referral Judge

Robert M. Levy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Airwair International LTD

Defendants

Primark US Corporation

Primark Limited

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Ari M. Berman

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

31 West 52Nd Street

New York, NY 10019

Kenneth E. Keller

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94611

Vijay K Toke

Attorney at Pillsbury Winthrop Shaw Pittman LLP

Four Embarcadero Center, 22Nd Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Defendant Attorney

Thomas P. Lane

Attorney at Winston & Strawn LLP

200 Park Avenue

New York, NY 10166

 

Court Documents

#11

(#11) Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for February 6, 2020 by Airwair International LTD. (Berman, Ari) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

10 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

10 #1

Affidavit Vijay K. Toke

#10

(#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Vijay K. Toke) Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12186809. by Airwair International LTD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Vijay K. Toke, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Toke, Vijay) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

9 #2

Certificate of Good Standing

9 #1

Affidavit Kenneth E. Keller

#9

(#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Kenneth E. Keller) Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12186760. by Airwair International LTD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kenneth E. Keller, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Keller, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

8 #2

Individual Rules

8 #1

IC Questionnaire

#8

(#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 IC Questionnaire, #2 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

#7

(#7) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint, by Primark Limited, Primark US Corporation. (Lane, Thomas) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

6 #1

complaint

#6

(#6) Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

5 #1

Summon

#5

(#5) Summons Issued as to Primark Limited, Primark US Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#4

(#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#3

(#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

#2

(#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Airwair International LTD identifying Corporate Parent Dr. Martens AirWair Group Ltd. for Airwair International LTD. (Berman, Ari) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) Letter MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for February 6, 2020 by Airwair International LTD. (Berman, Ari) (Entered: 12/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Vijay K. Toke) Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12186809. by Airwair International LTD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Vijay K. Toke, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Toke, Vijay) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Kenneth E. Keller) Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-12186760. by Airwair International LTD. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Kenneth E. Keller, #2 Certificate of Good Standing) (Keller, Kenneth) (Entered: 12/23/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Conference set for 2/6/2020 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 11B South before Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy.Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 IC Questionnaire, #2 Individual Rules) (Marino, Janine) (Entered: 12/09/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to 1/6/20. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy on 11/30/2019. (Levy, Robert) (Entered: 11/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint, by Primark Limited, Primark US Corporation. (Lane, Thomas) (Entered: 11/26/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) Notice of Report on the filing of an action regarding a Patent or Trademark. (Attachments: #1 complaint) (Rocco, Christine) (Entered: 11/04/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Summons Issued as to Primark Limited, Primark US Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Summon) (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link: #http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf. You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Case Assigned to Judge LaShann DeArcy Hall and Magistrate Judge Robert M. Levy. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our #website. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Davis, Kimberly) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Corporate Disclosure Statement by Airwair International LTD identifying Corporate Parent Dr. Martens AirWair Group Ltd. for Airwair International LTD. (Berman, Ari) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Primark Limited, Primark US Corporation filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-12003324 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Airwair International LTD. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Footwear Design, #2 Exhibit 2 Footwear Design, #3 Exhibit 3 Footwear Design, #4 Exhibit 4 Footwear Design, #5 Exhibit 5 Footwear Design, #6 Exhibit 6 Receipts for the purchase of the Primark Infringing Footwear, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Proposed Summons Primark Limited, #9 Proposed Summons Primark US Corp) (Berman, Ari) (Entered: 11/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Primark US Corp. is a litigant

Latest cases where AirWair International Ltd. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vijay K. Toke

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kenneth E Keller