This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 04/30/2021 at 10:12:56 (UTC).

AiroFog USA, LLC v. United National Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 AiroFog USA, LLC filed a Contract - Insurance lawsuit against United National Insurance Company. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Florida Middle District. The Judges overseeing this case are Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Christopher P. Tuite. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:21-CV-00487

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Courthouse:

    Florida Middle District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Charlene Edwards Honeywell

Referral Judge

Christopher P. Tuite

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AiroFog USA, LLC

Defendant

United National Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Jeffrey David Feldman

Attorney at Trailblazer

1200 Brickell Avenue, Penthouse 1900

Miami, FL 33131

Layla Nguyen

Attorney at Feldman & Latham LLP d/b/a Trailblazer

1200 Brickell Avenue, Penthouse 1900

Miami, FL 33131

Defendant Attorneys

Gary Khutorsky

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo, LLP

600 Corporate Dr Ste 600

Ft Lauderdale, FL 33334-3611

Stephanie H. Carlton

Attorney at Litchfield Cavo LLP

 

Court Documents

#28

(#28) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on November 17, 2021 before Rodney A. Max. (Feldman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

#27

(#27) NOTICE of supplemental authority re #21 MOTION to Strike #17 Answer to amended complaint by AiroFog USA, LLC. (Nguyen, Layla) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

#25

(#25) MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply by AiroFog USA, LLC. (Nguyen, Layla) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

#24

(#24) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/3/2021, Dispositive motions due by 11/5/2021, Pretrial statement due by 2/15/2022, All other motions due by 2/22/2022, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2022 at 2:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Bench Trial set for term commencing 4/4/2022 in Tampa Courtroom 13 A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/7/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/15/2021. (BGS) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#23

(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Strike #17 Answer to amended complaint filed by United National Insurance Company. (Carlton, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

#22

(#22) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Nguyen, Layla) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

21 #1

Exhibit Exhibit 1 _ Endorsement PSA 1015a

#21

(#21) MOTION to Strike #17 Answer to amended complaint by AiroFog USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 _ Endorsement PSA 1015a)(Nguyen, Layla) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (Entered: 04/05/2021)

#17

(#19) MOTION to Strike #17 Answer to amended complaint by AiroFog USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1_Endorsement PSA 1015a)(Nguyen, Layla) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (Entered: 04/01/2021)

1 #8

Proposed Summons Summons for Issuance as to United National

1 #7

Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet

1 #6

Exhibit 6 - AiroFog's November 23, 2020 Letter

1 #5

Exhibit 5 - UNIC's November 17, 2020 Letter

1 #4

Exhibit 4 - AiroFog's November 12, 2020 Letter

1 #3

Exhibit 3 - UNIC's November 5, 2020 Letter

1 #2

Exhibit 2 - B&G Complaint

1 #1

Exhibit 1 - Commercial General Liability Policy

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against United National Insurance Company, with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17942880) filed by AiroFog USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Commercial General Liability Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - B&G Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - UNIC's November 5, 2020 Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - AiroFog's November 12, 2020 Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - UNIC's November 17, 2020 Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - AiroFog's November 23, 2020 Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet , #8 Proposed Summons for Issuance as to United National)(Feldman, Jeffrey) Modified text on 3/1/2021 (BSN). (Entered: 03/01/2021)

34 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on November 17, 2021 before Rodney A. Max. (Feldman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 04/29/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) NOTICE of supplemental authority re #21 MOTION to Strike #17 Answer to amended complaint by AiroFog USA, LLC. (Nguyen, Layla) (Entered: 04/26/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ENDORSED ORDER denying #25 Plaintiff's Request for Leave to File a Reply to Defendant's Response in Opposition. The Court will advise the parties if it requires any additional briefing on the issue(s) raised in Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Third Affirmative Defense (Doc. #21). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 4/19/2021. (CTB) (Entered: 04/19/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply by AiroFog USA, LLC. (Nguyen, Layla) (Entered: 04/16/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 9/3/2021, Dispositive motions due by 11/5/2021, Pretrial statement due by 2/15/2022, All other motions due by 2/22/2022, Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/15/2022 at 2:30 PM in Tampa Courtroom 13A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell, Bench Trial set for term commencing 4/4/2022 in Tampa Courtroom 13 A before Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell. Conduct mediation hearing by 1/7/2022. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell on 4/15/2021. (BGS) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) RESPONSE in Opposition re #21 MOTION to Strike #17 Answer to amended complaint filed by United National Insurance Company. (Carlton, Stephanie) (Entered: 04/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Nguyen, Layla) (Entered: 04/06/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) MOTION to Strike #17 Answer to amended complaint by AiroFog USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 _ Endorsement PSA 1015a)(Nguyen, Layla) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #19 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Defendant's Third Affirmative Defense. It appears from Plaintiff's motion that counsel has not met the requirements of Local Rule 3.01(g)(2)(B)-(C). Signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite on 4/5/2021. (CTB) (Entered: 04/05/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION to Strike #17 Answer to amended complaint by AiroFog USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1_Endorsement PSA 1015a)(Nguyen, Layla) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. (Entered: 04/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 4 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule by United National Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Global Indemnity for United National Insurance Company.. (Carlton, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 4 Notice to Counsel of Local Rule 3.03 by AiroFog USA, LLC. (Feldman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/08/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by United National Insurance Company. Related case(s): Yes (Carlton, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) NOTICE of a related action Notice of Pendency of Other Actions per Local Rule 1.07(c) by AiroFog USA, LLC. Related case(s): Yes (Feldman, Jeffrey) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie H. Carlton on behalf of United National Insurance Company (Carlton, Stephanie) (Entered: 03/03/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE informing the parties that they may consent to the jurisdiction of a United States magistrate judge by filing Form AO 85 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge using the event Consent to Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • Docket(#4) NOTICE to Counsel of Local Rule 1.07(c), Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), and Local Rule 3.03. -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. -Local Rule 3.03 requires each party to file a disclosure statement with the first appearance that identifies (1) each person that has or might have an interest in the outcome, (2) each entity with publicly traded shares or debt potentially affected by the outcome, (3) each additional entity likely to actively participate, and (4) each person arguably eligible for restitution. The disclosure statement must include this certification - I certify that, except as disclosed, I am unaware of an actual or potential conflict of interest affecting the district judge or the magistrate judge in this action, and I will immediately notify the judge in writing within fourteen days after I know of a conflict. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BGS) (Entered: 03/02/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS issued as to United National Insurance Company. (BSN) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • Docket(#2) NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Charlene Edwards Honeywell and Magistrate Judge Christopher P. Tuite. New case number: 8:21-cv-0487-CEH-CPT. (SJB) (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against United National Insurance Company, with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 113A-17942880) filed by AiroFog USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Commercial General Liability Policy, #2 Exhibit 2 - B&G Complaint, #3 Exhibit 3 - UNIC's November 5, 2020 Letter, #4 Exhibit 4 - AiroFog's November 12, 2020 Letter, #5 Exhibit 5 - UNIC's November 17, 2020 Letter, #6 Exhibit 6 - AiroFog's November 23, 2020 Letter, #7 Civil Cover Sheet , #8 Proposed Summons for Issuance as to United National)(Feldman, Jeffrey) Modified text on 3/1/2021 (BSN). (Entered: 03/01/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNITED NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Stephanie Hope Carlton

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gary Khutorsky