This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2020 at 08:20:55 (UTC).

AirFreight.com v. Timothy Merrick

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 AirFreight com filed an Intellectual Property - Trademark lawsuit against Timothy Merrick. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, California Central District. The Judges overseeing this case are James V. Selna and John D. Early. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    8:20-CV-00066

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Intellectual Property - Trademark

  • Courthouse:

    California Central District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

James V. Selna

Referral Judge

John D. Early

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AirFreight.com

Defendants

Timothy Merrick

Joette Peroli

Justin Peroli

Ari Goldstein

Ground Air Expedite Logistics, LLC

Does 1-30, inclusive

Nimax Consulting LLC

Timothy Merrick an individual doing business as World Service Bulletins

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Scott B Lieberman

Attorney at Finlayson Toffer Roosevelt and Lilly LLP

15615 Alton Parkway Suite 250

Irvine, CA 92618

T Kevin Roosevelt

Attorney at Finlayson Toffer Roosevelt and Lilly LLP

15615 Alton Parkway Suite 250

Irvine, CA 92618

Defendant Attorneys

Matthew A Becker

Attorney at Matthew A Becker PC Law Offices

1003 Isabella Avenue

Coronado, CA 92118

Karen M. Beza Hawkes

Attorney at Hawkes Law APLC

11622 El Camino Real Suite 100

San Diego, CA 92130

T. John Fitzgibbons, Jr.

Attorney at Robie and Matthai APC

350 South Grand Avenue Suite 3950

Los Angeles, CA 90071

 

Court Documents

#25

(#25) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ari Goldstein answer now due 3/18/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition #13 filed by defendant Ari Goldstein.(Attorney T. John Fitzgibbons, Jr added to party Ari Goldstein(pty:dft))(Fitzgibbons, T. John) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

#24

(#24) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karen Michelle Beza counsel for Defendant Timothy Merrick. Adding Karen M. Beza Hawkes as counsel of record for Timothy Merrick, individually and dba World Service Bulletins for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney Karen M. Beza Hawkes. (Attorney Karen Michelle Beza added to party Timothy Merrick(pty:dft))(Beza, Karen) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#23

(#23) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff AirFreight.com, upon Defendant Nimax Consulting LLC served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin Peroli, Agent for Service of Process for Nimax Consulting LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#22

(#22) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff AirFreight.com, upon Defendant Justin Peroli served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin Peroli, defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#21

(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff AirFreight.com, upon Defendant Joette Peroli served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin Peroli, husband to Joette Peroli in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#20

(#20) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff AirFreight.com, upon Defendant Ground Air Expedite Logistics, LLC served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ari Goldstein, Agent for Service of Process for Ground Air Expedite Logistics, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

#19

(#19) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff AirFreight.com, upon Defendant Ari Goldstein served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ari Goldstein, defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

13 #1

Exhibit A

#13

(#16) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #13 filed by plaintiff AirFreight.com. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

#9

(#9) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (rrp) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

#8

(#10) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff AirFreight.comto Notice To Counsel Re: Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) - optional html form #8 (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

#7

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Timothy Merrick. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#6

(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

#4

(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff AirFreight.com, identifying Plaintiff, AirFreight.com; Defendant, Timothy Merrick doing business as World Service Bulletins. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#3

(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff AirFreight.com. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff AirFreight.com. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

#1

(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Timothy Merrick. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ari Goldstein answer now due 3/18/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition #13 filed by defendant Ari Goldstein.(Attorney T. John Fitzgibbons, Jr added to party Ari Goldstein(pty:dft))(Fitzgibbons, T. John) (Entered: 03/11/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Karen Michelle Beza counsel for Defendant Timothy Merrick. Adding Karen M. Beza Hawkes as counsel of record for Timothy Merrick, individually and dba World Service Bulletins for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Attorney Karen M. Beza Hawkes. (Attorney Karen Michelle Beza added to party Timothy Merrick(pty:dft))(Beza, Karen) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff AirFreight.com, upon Defendant Nimax Consulting LLC served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin Peroli, Agent for Service of Process for Nimax Consulting LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff AirFreight.com, upon Defendant Justin Peroli served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin Peroli, defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff AirFreight.com, upon Defendant Joette Peroli served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin Peroli, husband to Joette Peroli in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#20) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff AirFreight.com, upon Defendant Ground Air Expedite Logistics, LLC served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ari Goldstein, Agent for Service of Process for Ground Air Expedite Logistics, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff AirFreight.com, upon Defendant Ari Goldstein served on 2/12/2020, answer due 3/4/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ari Goldstein, defendant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 03/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Timothy Merrick answer now due 3/25/2020, re Amended Complaint/Petition #13 filed by Defendant Timothy Merrick.(Attorney Matthew A Becker added to party Timothy Merrick(pty:dft))(Becker, Matthew) (Entered: 03/05/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #13 as to Defendant Ari Goldstein, Ground Air Expedite Logistics, LLC, Timothy Merrick, Nimax Consulting LLC, Joette Peroli, Justin Peroli. (es) (Entered: 02/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition #13 filed by plaintiff AirFreight.com. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 02/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff AirFreight.comto Notice To Counsel Re: Copyright/Patent/Trademark (CV-31) - optional html form #8 (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 01/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) INITIAL ORDER FOLLOWING FILING OF COMPLAINT ASSIGNED TO JUDGE SELNA. (rrp) (Entered: 01/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Timothy Merrick. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge James V. Selna and Magistrate Judge John D. Early. (et) (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff AirFreight.com, identifying Plaintiff, AirFreight.com; Defendant, Timothy Merrick doing business as World Service Bulletins. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff AirFreight.com. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff AirFreight.com. (Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-25111333 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff AirFreight.com. (Attorney Scott B Lieberman added to party AirFreight.com(pty:pla))(Lieberman, Scott) (Entered: 01/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer T. John Fitzgibbons, Jr