This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 07/13/2019 at 10:28:38 (UTC).

Aire Serv LLC v. Beltre

Case Summary

On 04/02/2019 Aire Serv LLC filed a Contract - Franchise lawsuit against Beltre. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Western District. The Judges overseeing this case are Alan D Albright and Jeffrey C. Manske. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    6:19-CV-00238

  • Filing Date:

    04/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Franchise

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Alan D Albright

Referral Judge

Jeffrey C. Manske

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Aire Serv LLC

Defendant

Evaristo Beltre

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

James R. Dunnam

Attorney at Dunnam, Dunnam, etal

4125 W. Waco Dr., P.O. Box 8418

Waco, TX 76714-8418

Andrea Michelle Mehta

Attorney at Dunnam & Dunnam, LLP

4125 West Waco Drive

Waco, TX 76710

 

Court Documents

#1

1 #1

Exhibit A

1 #2

Exhibit B

1 #3

Exhibit C

1 #4

Civil Cover Sheet

#2

#3

#5

#6

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Substitute Service. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (mc5) (Entered: 07/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) Order Sealing all the exhibits attached to both the Complaint #1 and the Motion for Substituted Service #4 . Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad) (Entered: 06/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION to Substitute Service by Aire Serv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Proposed Order). Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (Dunnam, James) (Entered: 06/07/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Evaristo Beltre. (lad) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE.(lad) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Aire Serv LLC. (Dunnam, James) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0542-11949366), filed by Aire Serv LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Dunnam, James) (Entered: 04/02/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Andrea Michelle Mehta