This case was last updated from PACER on 02/26/2021 at 10:48:50 (UTC).

AINLEY et al v. WASHBURN

Case Summary

On 12/28/2020 AINLEY filed a Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation lawsuit against WASHBURN. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, District Of Columbia District. The Judge overseeing this case is Richard J. Leon. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-03825

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Assault/Battery/Defamation

  • Courthouse:

    District Of Columbia District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Richard J. Leon

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MARSHALL AINLEY

BILL VAN LOO

ERIN BERTRAM

Defendant

EDWARD WASHBURN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew D. Watts

Attorney at MOONEY, GREEN, SAINDON, MURPHY & WELCH, P.C.

1920 L Street, Nw, Suite 400

Washington, DC 20036

Defendant Attorney

John Travis Pittman

Attorney at HOLMES PITTMAN & HARAGUCHI, LLP

1140 3Rd St, Ne, 2Nd Floor

Washington, DC 20002

 

Court Documents

8 #1

Text of Proposed Order

#8

(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Transfer Case To The Northern District of California by MARSHALL AINLEY, ERIN BERTRAM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watts, Matthew) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

7 #5

Exhibit Exhibit B to Burgoyne Declaration

7 #4

Exhibit Exhibit A to Burgoyne Declaration

7 #3

Declaration Declaration of Henry Burgoyne

7 #2

Exhibit Exhibit A to Washburn Declaration

#7

(#7) MOTION to Transfer Case To The Northern District of California by EDWARD WASHBURN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Edward Washburn, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Washburn Declaration, #3 Declaration Declaration of Henry Burgoyne, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Burgoyne Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B to Burgoyne Declaration)(Pittman, John) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#6

(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Plaintiff Bill Van Loo (Watts, Matthew) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

#5

(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John Travis Pittman on behalf of EDWARD WASHBURN (Pittman, John) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

3 #1

Notice and Consent

#3

(#3) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to EDWARD WASHBURN. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by MARSHALL AINLEY, BILL VAN LOO, ERIN BERTRAM filed by MARSHALL AINLEY, BILL VAN LOO, ERIN BERTRAM.(Watts, Matthew) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

1 #3

Summons

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against EDWARD WASHBURN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8011569) filed by MARSHALL AINLEY, BILL VAN LOO, ERIN BERTRAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Watts, Matthew) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #7 MOTION to Transfer Case To The Northern District of California by MARSHALL AINLEY, ERIN BERTRAM. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Watts, Matthew) (Entered: 02/25/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) MOTION to Transfer Case To The Northern District of California by EDWARD WASHBURN. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Edward Washburn, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to Washburn Declaration, #3 Declaration Declaration of Henry Burgoyne, #4 Exhibit Exhibit A to Burgoyne Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit B to Burgoyne Declaration)(Pittman, John) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal re Plaintiff Bill Van Loo (Watts, Matthew) (Entered: 02/18/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE of Appearance by John Travis Pittman on behalf of EDWARD WASHBURN (Pittman, John) (Entered: 02/15/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. EDWARD WASHBURN served on 12/30/2020, answer due 1/20/2021 (Watts, Matthew) (Entered: 01/04/2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) SUMMONS (1) Issued Electronically as to EDWARD WASHBURN. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(adh, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Richard J. Leon. (adh, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL COVER SHEET by MARSHALL AINLEY, BILL VAN LOO, ERIN BERTRAM filed by MARSHALL AINLEY, BILL VAN LOO, ERIN BERTRAM.(Watts, Matthew) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ERROR re #1 Complaint; emailed to mwatts@mooneygreen.com, cc'd -1 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Fill in the civil cover sheet under the appropriate Deck (adh, ) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against EDWARD WASHBURN ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8011569) filed by MARSHALL AINLEY, BILL VAN LOO, ERIN BERTRAM. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(Watts, Matthew) (Entered: 12/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer John Travis Pittman