This case was last updated from PACER on 01/17/2020 at 07:09:37 (UTC).

Aina v. Commissioner of Social Security

Case Summary

On 11/18/2019 Aina filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against Commissioner of Social Security. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Texas Southern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Diana Song Quiroga, Marina Garcia Marmolejo and John A Kazen. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    5:19-CV-00153

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Texas Southern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Marina Garcia Marmolejo

Referral Judges

Diana Song Quiroga

John A Kazen

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Cynthia Lynn Aina

Defendant

Commissioner of Social Security

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Melissa A Palmer

250 South Clinton Street, Suite 210

Syracuse, NY 13202

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

#6

RESTRICTED

#5

RESTRICTED

#4

RESTRICTED

#3

RESTRICTED

#2

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) ADVISORY. The parties are ADVISED that a magistrate judge may conduct all proceedings in a civil matter and order an entry of judgment only if all parties have provided their "specific written request" consent. If Defendant intends to consent to the Magistrate Judge, they should do so promptly. (Signed by Magistrate Judge John A Kazen) Parties notified. (JessicaGRodriguezadi, 5) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) CONSENT to Proceed Before a Magistrate Judge by Cynthia Lynn Aina, filed.(bwhite, 4) (Entered: 12/13/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) RETURN of Service of SUMMONS Executed as to Commissioner of Social Security served on 12/3/2019, answer due 2/3/2020, filed.(jguajardo, 4) (Entered: 12/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) Summons Issued as to Defendant ( United States Attorney's Office ), filed.(mxperez, 5) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Issued as to Defendant ( United States of Attorney General), filed.(mxperez, 5) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Defendant (Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region VI), filed.(mxperez, 5) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Cynthia Lynn Aina. (Attachments: #1 IFP granting)(mxperez, 5) (Entered: 11/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.