This case was last updated from PACER on 07/13/2019 at 11:34:55 (UTC).

AIG Property Casualty Company v. Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC

Case Summary

On 04/05/2019 AIG Property Casualty Company filed a Property - Land lawsuit against Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Iowa Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Kelly Mahoney, Linda R Reade and Kelly K.E. Mahoney. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:19-CV-01008

  • Filing Date:

    04/05/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Land

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Iowa Northern District

Judge Details

Referral Judge

Kelly Mahoney

Presiding Judges

Linda R Reade

Kelly K.E. Mahoney

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AIG Property Casualty Company

Defendant

Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Daniel P Kresowik

Attorney at Brick Gentry PC

6701 Westown Parkway, Suite 100, ***Ecf

West Des Moines, IA 50266

Melinda A Davis

Attorney at Denenberg Tuffley PLLC

28411 Northwestern Hwy, Suite 600, Ecf

Southfield, MI 48034

Ben C Lesnick

Attorney at Denenberg Tuffley PLLC

28411 Northwestern Highway, Suite 600, Ecf

Southfield, MI 48034

Defendant Attorney

Matthew G Novak

Attorney at Pickens Barnes & Abernathy

1800 First Avenue Ne Ste 200, Po Box 74170, Ecf

Cedar Rapids, IA 52407-4170

 

Court Documents

#12

(#12) SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 7/31/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 1/31/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2020. Plaintiff's Expert Witness due by 9/12/2019. Defendant's Expert Witnesses due by 12/12/2019. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts due by 1/13/2020. Discovery due by 3/10/2020. Motions due by 3/10/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 8/10/2020. ORDER: Upon consent of the parties AIG Property Casualty Company and Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC, this case is reassigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney for final disposition. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 7/10/2019 and Judge CJ Williams on 7/11/2019. (pac) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

#11

(#11) MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Scheduling Conference held on 7/9/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (jjh) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

10 #1

proposed scheduling order and discovery plan

#10

(#10) ORDER Setting Hearing; Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 1:30 PM (Telephonic Hearing - please see text of Order for dial-in participation instructions) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 07/03/2019. (Attachments: #1 proposed scheduling order and discovery plan) (Gollhofer, Jami) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

#9

(#9) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC (Novak, Matthew) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

#8

(#8) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint by Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC.(Novak, Matthew) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

#7

(#7) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by AIG Property Casualty Company (Lesnick, Ben) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

5 #1

Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing

#5

(#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ben C. Lesnick ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2922142) by Plaintiff AIG Property Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Lesnick, Ben) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

4 #1

Exhibit Cert of Good Standing

#4

(#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Melinda A. Davis ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2922123) by Plaintiff AIG Property Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing) (Davis, Melinda) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

#3

(#3) Summons Returned Executed by AIG Property Casualty Company re #2 Summons Issued. (Kresowik, Daniel) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (mmc). (Entered: 04/11/2019)

2 #1

Civil Case Packet

#2

(#2) Summons Issued as to Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2912673) filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. Scheduling Report Deadline 7/4/2019. (Kresowik, Daniel) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (pac). (Entered: 04/05/2019)

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#12) SCHEDULING Order and Discovery Plan: Initial Disclosures due date of 7/31/2019 but not filed with the court. Add Parties Deadline due by 1/31/2020. Amended Pleadings due by 2/10/2020. Plaintiff's Expert Witness due by 9/12/2019. Defendant's Expert Witnesses due by 12/12/2019. Plaintiff's Rebuttal Experts due by 1/13/2020. Discovery due by 3/10/2020. Motions due by 3/10/2020. Trial Ready Deadline 8/10/2020. ORDER: Upon consent of the parties AIG Property Casualty Company and Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC, this case is reassigned to Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney for final disposition. Signed by Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 7/10/2019 and Judge CJ Williams on 7/11/2019. (pac) (Entered: 07/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#11) MINUTE Entry for proceedings held before Chief Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney: Scheduling Conference held on 7/9/2019. (Official Court Record: FTR Gold) (jjh) (Entered: 07/10/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#10) ORDER Setting Hearing; Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 1:30 PM (Telephonic Hearing - please see text of Order for dial-in participation instructions) before Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney. Signed by Chief United States Magistrate Judge Kelly K.E. Mahoney on 07/03/2019. (Attachments: #1 proposed scheduling order and discovery plan) (Gollhofer, Jami) (Entered: 07/03/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#9) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC (Novak, Matthew) (Entered: 05/29/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Set Deadline: Defendant LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 5/30/2019. (mmc) (Entered: 05/01/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#8) ANSWER with Jury Demand to Complaint by Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC.(Novak, Matthew) (Entered: 04/30/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Case Reassigned to Judge CJ Williams. Judge Linda R Reade no longer assigned to the case due to a conflict. Conflicts check performed as to Judge Williams. No conflicts identified. (mmc) (Entered: 04/25/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#7) PURSUANT to Local Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by AIG Property Casualty Company (Lesnick, Ben) (Entered: 04/24/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#6) TEXT ORDER - This matter is before the Court on the #4 and #5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorneys Melinda A. Davis and Ben C. Lesnick on behalf of Plaintiff AIG Property Casualty Company. Upon a review of the Motions and the Certificates of Good Standing, the Court finds the Motions should be granted. Signed by Clerk on 4/19/2019. (mmc) (Entered: 04/19/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#5) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ben C. Lesnick ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2922142) by Plaintiff AIG Property Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Lesnick, Ben) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#4) MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Melinda A. Davis ( Pro Hac Vice Fee $ 100 receipt number 0862-2922123) by Plaintiff AIG Property Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Cert of Good Standing) (Davis, Melinda) (Entered: 04/18/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#3) Summons Returned Executed by AIG Property Casualty Company re #2 Summons Issued. (Kresowik, Daniel) Modified text on 4/12/2019 (mmc). (Entered: 04/11/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • Set Deadline: Plaintiff's LR 7.1 Disclosure Statement due by 4/26/2019. (pac) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#2) Summons Issued as to Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC. ****PLEASE MAKE COPIES OF SUMMONS FOR EACH DEFENDANT AND FILL IN REMAINING INFORMATION**** (Attachments: #1 Civil Case Packet) (pac) (Entered: 04/08/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • (#1) COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Jeff Kluck Construction, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0862-2912673) filed by AIG Property Casualty Company. Scheduling Report Deadline 7/4/2019. (Kresowik, Daniel) Modified text on 4/8/2019 (pac). (Entered: 04/05/2019)

    Read MoreRead Less