This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 06/14/2021 at 16:15:00 (UTC).

Aida, et al v. Boeing Company, The

Case Summary

On 03/13/2020 Aida filed a Personal Injury - Airplane Product Liability lawsuit against Boeing Company, The. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Illinois Northern District. The Judges overseeing this case are Manish S. Shah and Thomas M. Durkin. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-01775

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Airplane Product Liability

  • Courthouse:

    Illinois Northern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judges

Manish S. Shah

Thomas M. Durkin

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AIDA et. al.

Enrico Gerri Tua

Aida

Aldi Radyanto

Rachma Putri Nariswari

Sutarno

Bambang Supriyadi

Mochamad Fajar Ardiyono Putra

Tju Lian Sin

Devina Oktavia Tjandayu

Santun

Bambang Subagyo

Surtiyem

Puji Lestari

Yulmahdi

Stevando Magara Haposan Sihombing

Slamet

Kartini

Defendants

THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation

Boeing Company, The

21 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

Xiaoyin Cao

Attorney at Carmen D. Caruso Law Firm

77 West Washington Stree, Suite 1900

Chicago, IL 60602

Carmen David Caruso

Attorney at Carmen D. Caruso Law Firm

77 W. Washington Street, Suite 1900

Chicago, IL 60602

 

Court Documents

#30

(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal, this case is dismissed, with prejudice and without costs to any party. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

#29

(#29) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk8, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

#28

(#28) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

#27

(#27) ORDER: All claims of Plaintiffs: SYAMSIR SAMSUDIN, as Personal Representative of the Estate of VICKY ARDIAN, and individually; DEBBY CASSANDRA, individually, and as next friend of her minor children, A.A., R.A.A., and M.Z.A.; and, RASMI SORA,IN RE: LION AIR FLIGHT JT 610 CRASHSYAMSIR SAMSUDIN, as Personal Representative of the Estate of VICKY ARDIAN, and individually; DEBBY CASSANDRA, individually, and as nextfriend of her minor children, A.A., R.A.A., and M.Z.A.; and, RASMI SORA, individually; in Consolidated Case No. 1:18-cv-07686, which was originally filed under cause number 20-cv-01775; are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. This fully resolves these Plaintiffs' claims. All of these Plaintiffs' claims are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

#26

(#26) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

#25

(#25) ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims With PRejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Sutarni and Sutarno (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/22/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#24

(#24) ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims With Prejuice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Yenti Sulastri terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/22/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

#23

(#23) ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement. Tjhin Nyuk Hen (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#22

(#22) ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Aldi Radyanto (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

#9

(#9) ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#8

(#8) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Manish S. Shah no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/30/2020. (pj, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

#7

(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Enrico Gerri Tua, Stevando Magara Haposan Sihombing, Syamsir Samsudin, Sutarno, Siharman, Budi Setiawan, Yulmahdi, Aida, Aldi Radyanto, Yenti Sulastri, Slamet, Bambang Subagyo, Tjhin Nyuk Hen, Thong Kon Ngo, Rachma Putri Nariswari, Debby Cassandra, Susiyani Budhihardjo, Sumsima, Puji Lestari, Tju Lian Sin, Wiwik Dwi Handayani, Angga Bramantya Wirabuana Putra, Mochamad Fajar Ardiyono Putra, Tjhin Ai Nit, Devina Oktavia Tjandayu, Dermawan Riama Siregar, Sariyoso, Santun, Indah Juliana Purwaningtyas, Bambang Supriyadi, Otong Edi Budaya, Kartini, Mardiyem Nur Rahman, Dhani Dwi Raharjo, Surtiyem, Debora Christy Tjandayu, Sutarni, Rasmi Sora, Sulastri, Nurmala Ramelan as to The Boeing Company on 3/13/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Cao, Xiaoyin) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 3/23/2020) (pj, ). (Entered: 03/17/2020)

#6

(#6) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#5

(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lma, ) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

#4

(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff AIDA et. al. by Xiaoyin Cao (Cao, Xiaoyin) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#3

(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff AIDA et. al. by Carmen David Caruso (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#2

(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT filed by AIDA et. al.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16828216.(Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

18 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#30) MINUTE entry before the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin: Pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal, this case is dismissed, with prejudice and without costs to any party. Civil case terminated. Mailed notice. (ecw, ) (Entered: 09/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#29) ORDER Fifth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on July 10, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. No motions may be noticed for in-person presentment; the presiding judge will notify parties of the need, if any, for a hearing by electronic means or in-court proceeding. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 7/10/2020: Mailed notice. (Clerk8, Docket) (Entered: 07/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#28) ORDER ORDER Fourth Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on May 26, 2020. This Order does not extend or modify any deadlines set in civil cases. For non-emergency motions, no motion may be noticed for presentment on a date earlier than July 15, 2020. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 5/26/2020: Mailed notice. (docket10, ) (Entered: 05/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#27) ORDER: All claims of Plaintiffs: SYAMSIR SAMSUDIN, as Personal Representative of the Estate of VICKY ARDIAN, and individually; DEBBY CASSANDRA, individually, and as next friend of her minor children, A.A., R.A.A., and M.Z.A.; and, RASMI SORA,IN RE: LION AIR FLIGHT JT 610 CRASHSYAMSIR SAMSUDIN, as Personal Representative of the Estate of VICKY ARDIAN, and individually; DEBBY CASSANDRA, individually, and as nextfriend of her minor children, A.A., R.A.A., and M.Z.A.; and, RASMI SORA, individually; in Consolidated Case No. 1:18-cv-07686, which was originally filed under cause number 20-cv-01775; are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. This fully resolves these Plaintiffs' claims. All of these Plaintiffs' claims are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice and without costs. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 5/14/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 05/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#26) ORDER Third Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on April 24, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Third Amended General Order. Parties are must carefully review all obligations under this Order, including the requirement listed in paragraph number 5 to file a joint written status report in most civil cases. See attached Order. Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 4/24/2020: Mailed notice. (docket9, ) (Entered: 04/27/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#25) ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims With PRejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Sutarni and Sutarno (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/22/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#24) ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims With Prejuice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Yenti Sulastri terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/22/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 04/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#23) ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlement. Tjhin Nyuk Hen (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#22) ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudice and Approval of Minor Settlements. Aldi Radyanto (as Personal Representative) terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#21) ORDER Approving Joint Motion for Dismissal of Plaintiffs' Claims with Prejudixe and Approval of Minor Settlements. Stevando Magara Haposan Sihombing terminated. Signed by the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin on 4/10/2020:Mailed notice(srn, ) (Entered: 04/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER Seconded Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 30, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Second Amended General Order. Amended General Order 20-0012, entered on March 17, 2020, and General Order 20-0014, entered on March 20, 2020, are vacated and superseded by this Second Amended General. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/30/2020: Mailed notice. (docket8, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE ORDER: Case reassigned to the Honorable Thomas M. Durkin for all further proceedings, pursuant to Local Rule 40.4. Honorable Manish S. Shah no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 3/30/2020. (pj, ) (Entered: 03/31/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE returned executed by Enrico Gerri Tua, Stevando Magara Haposan Sihombing, Syamsir Samsudin, Sutarno, Siharman, Budi Setiawan, Yulmahdi, Aida, Aldi Radyanto, Yenti Sulastri, Slamet, Bambang Subagyo, Tjhin Nyuk Hen, Thong Kon Ngo, Rachma Putri Nariswari, Debby Cassandra, Susiyani Budhihardjo, Sumsima, Puji Lestari, Tju Lian Sin, Wiwik Dwi Handayani, Angga Bramantya Wirabuana Putra, Mochamad Fajar Ardiyono Putra, Tjhin Ai Nit, Devina Oktavia Tjandayu, Dermawan Riama Siregar, Sariyoso, Santun, Indah Juliana Purwaningtyas, Bambang Supriyadi, Otong Edi Budaya, Kartini, Mardiyem Nur Rahman, Dhani Dwi Raharjo, Surtiyem, Debora Christy Tjandayu, Sutarni, Rasmi Sora, Sulastri, Nurmala Ramelan as to The Boeing Company on 3/13/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (Cao, Xiaoyin) (Docket Text Modified by Clerk's Office on 3/23/2020) (pj, ). (Entered: 03/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDER Amended General Order 20-0012 IN RE: CORONAVIRUS COVID-19 PUBLIC EMERGENCY Signed by the Chief Judge Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on March 16, 2020. All open cases are impacted by this Amended General Order. See attached Order for guidance.Signed by the Honorable Rebecca R. Pallmeyer on 3/16/2020: Mailed notice. (tg, ) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP). The key features and deadlines are set forth in this Notice which includes a link to the (MIDP) Standing Order and a Checklist for use by the parties. In cases subject to the pilot, all parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the Standing Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the Standing Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the following documents (Notice of Mandatory Initial Discovery and the Standing Order) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (lma, ) (Entered: 03/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff AIDA et. al. by Xiaoyin Cao (Cao, Xiaoyin) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff AIDA et. al. by Carmen David Caruso (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Manish S. Shah. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (daj, ) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CIVIL Cover Sheet (Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT filed by AIDA et. al.; Jury Demand. Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-16828216.(Caruso, Carmen) (Entered: 03/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE BOEING COMPANY, a Delaware Corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Xiaoyin Cao

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Carmen David Caruso