This case was last updated from PACER on 12/01/2020 at 09:18:45 (UTC).

Ahrem v. Smith & Nephew, Inc.

Case Summary

On 10/02/2020 Ahrem filed a Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability lawsuit against Smith Nephew, Inc. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Maryland District. The Judge overseeing this case is Catherine C. Blake. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    1:20-CV-02863

  • Filing Date:

    10/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical/Pharmaceutical Product Liability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Maryland District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Catherine C. Blake

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walter Ahrem

Defendant

Smith & Nephew, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew Yezierski

Attorney at Johnson Law Group

2925 Richmond Ave. Ste. 1650

Houston, TX 77098

 

Court Documents

19 #4

Exhibit B

19 #3

Exhibit A

19 #2

Memorandum in Support

19 #1

Text of Proposed Order

19 #2388

(#19) MOTION Smith & Nephew, Inc's Motion to Exclude the Opinion Tesimony of Plaintiff's Expert Witness Yadin David by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

18 #5

Exhibit C

18 #2

Memorandum in Support

18 #1

Text of Proposed Order

18 #2387

(#18) MOTION to Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness L. Scott Marshall by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

20 #1

Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases)

20 #2340

(#5) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

#23

(#4) STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for October 28, 2020 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

#2

RESTRICTED

20 #2

Exhibit B (THA Track Cases)

20 #1

Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases)

20 #2318

(#2) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

1 #1

Civil Cover Sheet

#1

(#1) COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8892058.), filed by Walter Ahrem. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yezierski, Matthew) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

56 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#19) MOTION Smith & Nephew, Inc's Motion to Exclude the Opinion Tesimony of Plaintiff's Expert Witness Yadin David by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#18) MOTION to Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness L. Scott Marshall by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#17) MOTION to Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Dr. Jeffrey Shapiro by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 12/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#16) MOTION to Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Mari Truman by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#15) Memorandum re (2383 in 1:17-md-02775-CCB) MOTION to Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Larry Spears filed by Smith & Nephew, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#14) MOTION to Exclude the Opinion Testimony of Plaintiffs' Expert Witness Larry Spears by Smith & Nephew, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#13) STIPULATION To Extend BHR Case Specific Expert Deadlines by In re: Smith & Nephew Birmingham Hip Resurfacing (BHR) Hip Implant Products Liability Litigation Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Jenner, Robert) (Entered: 11/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#12) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/24/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (410) 962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 16. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/15/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/28/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2021.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter) (Entered: 11/24/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#11) STATUS REPORT Parties Proposed Agenda for November 24, 2020 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 11/20/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#10) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) ORDER in all Tracks re: Discovery Dispute. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 11/16/2020. Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(cags, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 11/10/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number (410) 962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 12. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/1/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/8/2021.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Walter Ahrem. Smith & Nephew, Inc. waiver sent on 10/12/2020, answer due 12/11/2020.(Yezierski, Matthew) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/28/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, Telephone number (410) 962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 40. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/30/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/27/2021.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter) (Entered: 10/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 10/26/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) STATUS REPORT Parties' Proposed Agenda for October 28, 2020 Status Conference by Smith & Nephew, Inc.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 10/23/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/14/20, before Judge Blake. Court Reporter/Transcriber Douglas J. Zweizig, RDR, CRR, Telephone number 410-962-4474 / douglas_zweizig@mdd.uscourts.gov. Total number of pages filed: 64. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained from the Court Reporter or through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/5/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2021.Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(dz, Court Reporter) (Entered: 10/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) NOTICE by Smith & Nephew, Inc. of Filing Updated Listings of Pending BHR and THA Track Cases (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (BHR Track Cases), #2 Exhibit B (THA Track Cases))Associated Cases: 1:17-md-02775-CCB et al.(Gourley, Sara) (Entered: 10/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. (ko, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) COMPLAINT against Smith & Nephew, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8892058.), filed by Walter Ahrem. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Yezierski, Matthew) (Entered: 10/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less