This case was last updated from PACER on 12/27/2020 at 09:45:29 (UTC).

AHMED v. COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 AHMED filed a Government Benefit - Social Security Disability lawsuit against COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Pennsylvania Eastern District. The Judge overseeing this case is TIMOTHY R. RICE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-05399

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Government Benefit - Social Security Disability

  • Court:

    U.S. District Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pennsylvania Eastern District

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

TIMOTHY R. RICE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOHAMMAD SALAH AHMED

Philadelphia, PA 19124

Defendant

COMMISSIONER OF SOCIAL SECURITY

 

Court Documents

#7

RESTRICTED

6 #1

CONSENT

#6

(#6) ORDERED THAT, HAVING SERVED NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF MOHAMMAD AHMED ON OCTOBER 26, 2020, TO FILE A FORM CONSENTING OR DECLINING THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DOC. 2) WITHIN 21 DAYS, AND PLAINTIFF HAS FAILED TO FILE THE FORM WITHIN THAT TIME PERIOD, PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE FORM WITHIN 10 DAYS. FAILURE TO COMPLETE AND FILE THE FORM AS ORDERED SHALL BE DEEMED CONSENT TO THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND THE ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL EXERCISE JURISDICTION FOR ALL PURPOSES.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 CONSENT) 12/2/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

#4

(#4) ORDER THAT IF AHMED SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER (1) PAY THE $400 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $50 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE AHMED WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THE CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 11/2/20. 11/2/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO PRO SE ALONG WITH FORMS.(JL ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

#3

RESTRICTED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) Social Security Magistrate Consent by MOHAMMAD SALAH AHMED. *ENVELOPE ATTACHED* (rf, ) (Entered: 12/03/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) ORDERED THAT, HAVING SERVED NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF MOHAMMAD AHMED ON OCTOBER 26, 2020, TO FILE A FORM CONSENTING OR DECLINING THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE (DOC. 2) WITHIN 21 DAYS, AND PLAINTIFF HAS FAILED TO FILE THE FORM WITHIN THAT TIME PERIOD, PLAINTIFF IS DIRECTED TO FILE THE FORM WITHIN 10 DAYS. FAILURE TO COMPLETE AND FILE THE FORM AS ORDERED SHALL BE DEEMED CONSENT TO THE JURISDICTION OF A MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND THE ASSIGNED MAGISTRATE JUDGE WILL EXERCISE JURISDICTION FOR ALL PURPOSES.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 12/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 CONSENT) 12/2/2020 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg, ) (Entered: 12/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) Procedural Order 11/10/2020 Entered and copies e-mailed. (Attachments: #1 SUPPLEMENTAL PROCEDURAL ORDER)(sg, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2020
  • DocketSummons issued electronically as to Commissioner of Social Security pursuant to Acceptance of Service Agreement dated July 6, 2020. (sg, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2020
  • DocketFiling fee: $ 400.00, receipt number PPE220796 (dmc, ) (Entered: 11/10/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • DocketDOC.4 AND IFP APPLICATION MAILED TO PRO SE. (sg, ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) ORDER THAT IF AHMED SEEKS TO PROCEED WITH THIS CASE, HE MUST, WITHIN 30 DAYS OF THE DATE OF THIS ORDER, EITHER (1) PAY THE $400 (THE $350 FILING FEE AND $50 ADMINISTRATIVE FEE) TO THE CLERK OF COURT, OR (2) FILE A MOTION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL PROVIDE AHMED WITH AN APPROPRIATE NON PRISONER APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BEARING THE CIVIL ACTION NUMBER OF THE CASE; ETC.. SIGNED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE TIMOTHY R. RICE ON 11/2/20. 11/2/20 ENTERED AND E-MAILED, NOT MAILED TO PRO SE ALONG WITH FORMS.(JL ) (Entered: 11/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less