This case was last updated from U.S. District Courts on 10/12/2020 at 08:54:57 (UTC).

Ahern Rentals, Inc. v. Wade et al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 Ahern Rentals, Inc filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against Wade. This case was filed in U.S. District Courts, Missouri Western District. The Judge overseeing this case is Beth Phillips. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    2:20-CV-04144

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

Beth Phillips

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Ahern Rentals Inc

Counter Claimants and Defendants

Keith Wade

Jessie Wade

Equipmentshare.com, Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorneys

Patrick H. Hicks

Attorney at Littler Mendelson, PC

3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89109

Amy L Thompson

Attorney at Littler Mendelson

3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 300

Las Vegas, NV 89169

Counter Claimant and Defendant Attorneys

Aviva Y Gordon

Attorney at Gordon Law

2850 W. Horizon Ridge Parkway, Suite 200

Henderson, NV 89052

Emily Anne Ellis

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Shreck

100 North City Pkwy., Ste. 1600

Las Vegas, NV 89106

Mitchell J. Langberg

Attorney at Brownstein Hyatt Farber Schreck, LLP

100 City Parkway, Suite 1200

Las Vegas, NV 89106

Michael E. Brewer

Attorney at Baker & McKenzie LLP

Two Embarcadero Center, 11Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Colton Long

Attorney at Baker McKenzie

300 East Randolph Street

Chicago, IL 60601

 

Court Documents

54 #1

*Restricted*

#54

#53

52 #1

MDL Minute Order

#52

#51

#50

31 #5

Exhibit 4

31 #3

Exhibit 2

#7

#6

#5

#4

3 #1

Exhibit A and B

#3

1 #2

Civil Cover Sheet

1 #1

Exhibit A and B

#1

64 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#54) CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Nevada; Case Number 2:20-cv-00094. (Entered: 08/13/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#53) CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Western District of Missouri. Signed by MDL on 8/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 08/12/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#52) MDL TRANSFER ORDER transferring case to the Western District of Missouri. Signed by MDL on 8/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 MDL Minute Order) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 08/07/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#51) ORDER granting #50 STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) Early Neutral Evaluation #41 Order. The Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/30/2020 is VACATEDd and will be reset if necessary. Parties to file a stipulation 7 days after ruling on #31 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/2/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/02/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#50) Joint STIPULATION TO CONTINUE (First Request) Early Neutral Evaluation re #41 Order, by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc. (Thompson, Amy) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 06/01/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#49) TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 47 Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/29/2020 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Court (Reporter) Transcriber: Amber McClane, AM@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 6/20/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 6/30/2020. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 8/28/2020. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the court reporter. The Transcript Order Form is available on the court website. After that date, the transcript may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (AMM) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 05/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2020
  • Docket(#48) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/28/2020. This case is set for an early neutral evaluation on June 30, 2020. Docket Nos. 20, 41. The order setting the early neutral evaluation is hereby MODIFIED as follows. First, evaluation statements must be emailed to njk_chambers@nvd.uscourts.gov. Hard copies of the evaluation statements will not be accepted. The evaluation statements must also include an email address for each participant. Second, the early neutral evaluation will be conducted remotely by video and there will be no personal attendance required. Further instructions will be provided at a later date regarding the video appearances. IT IS SO ORDERED.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 05/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#47) MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Hearing re motion to stay discovery #32 held on 4/29/2020 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries; Pla Counsel: Patrick Hicks and Amy Thompson; Def Counsel: Aviva Gordon and Michael Brewer; Recording start and end times: 2:55 - 3:24; Courtroom: 3D; This hearing was conducted via telephonic conferencing. The court canvasses and hears representations and arguments from the parties. ORDERED motion to stay discovery #32 is GRANTED, as stated on the record. FURTHER ORDERED status conference is set for 11/19/20 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 3D. If a decision is reached on the motion to dismiss #31 and the ruling does not dispose of this case, the parties are to submit a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order two weeks after decision. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 04/30/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#46) ORDER granting #43 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Colton Long and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Mitchell J. Langberg. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/28/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 04/29/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#45) NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #43 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Langberg, Mitchell) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 04/28/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
35 More Docket Entries
  • 01/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#9) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jessie Wade, Keith Wade. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gordon, Aviva) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/22/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#8) ANSWER re #3 Petition for Removal, to Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief filed by Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/6/2020.(Ellis, Emily) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/21/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#7) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ahern Rentals, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Thompson, Amy) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#6) CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ellis, Emily) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/17/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#5) DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Ahern Rentals, Inc.. (Thompson, Amy) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#4) MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/15/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/30/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • DocketCase randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (SLD) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#3) PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-807330-B, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5846939) by Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B) (Langberg, Mitchell) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#2) CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #1 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #1 using the appropriate docket entry title "Petition Removal" located under the Commencement of an Action category and pay the $400.00 filing fee. (no image attached) (DKJ) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/15/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • Docket(#1) ERROR: Incorrect event selected and filing fee not paid. Counsel is advised to refile correctly and pay the $400.00 filing fee. Document #1 is terminated as filed in error. STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Equipmentshare.com, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A and B, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Langberg, Mitchell) [Transferred from nvd on 8/13/2020.] (Entered: 01/14/2020)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Equipmentshare.com, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where AHERN RENTALS INC. (DOE 2) is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Amy L Thompson

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Patrick H. Hicks